Tok Air Service, LLC v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: Tok Air Service, LLC
Defendant: Deb Haaland, Jeff Mow, The National Park Service, Ben Bobowski, Shawn Benge and The United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 4:2021cv00012
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #17 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/30/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Upon Expiration, Conversion To Preliminary Injunction Requiring The National Park Service To Temporarily Grant A Commercial Use Authorization Plaintiff's Reply To Opposition To Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, 9 testimonials from TAS clients)(Kramer, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Upon Expiration, Conversion To Preliminary Injunction Requiring The National Park Service To Temporarily Grant A Commercial Use Authorization. The court will entertain a reply memorandum if served and filed on or before 7/29/2021. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Upon Expiration, Conversion To Preliminary Injunction Requiring The National Park Service To Temporarily Grant A Commercial Use Authorization filed by Shawn Benge, Ben Bobowski, Deb Haaland, Jeff Mow, The National Park Service, The United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perez, Krystal-Rose)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Upon Expiration, Conversion To Preliminary Injunction Requiring The National Park Service To Temporarily Grant A Commercial Use Authorization. The court would appreciate the defendants filing their response 7/28/2021. The court will not entertain a reply memorandum. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/26/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice to Counsel re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #16 Amended Complaint. A review of the documents submitted at dkts 16 and 17 confirms they are over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filings at dkts 16 and 17. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Shawn Benge, Ben Bobowski, Deb Haaland, Jeff Mow, The National Park Service, The United States Department of the Interior re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Upon Expiration, Conversion To Preliminary Injunction Requiring The National Park Service To Temporarily Grant A Commercial Use Authorization (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Upon Expiration, Conversion To Preliminary Injunction Requiring The National Park Service To Temporarily Grant A Commercial Use Authorization by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First & Third Affidavit of Zachary Knaebel, #2 Exhibit 5/11/21 and 6/29/21 NPS letters, #3 Exhibit Policy No. 700-001, #4 Exhibit 10/26/20 Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5/28/21 Motion To Dismiss, #6 Exhibit RHAK Letter, #7 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Michael)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 5.11.21 Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 6.29.21 Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - First and Third Affidavit of Zachary Knaebel)(Kramer, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's petition for a preliminary injunction is denied. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/7/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Zack Knaebel, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Kramer, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice Of Intent To File A Reply Brief by Tok Air Service, LLC re #11 Order (Kramer, Michael)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shawn Benge, Ben Bobowski, Deb Haaland, Jeff Mow, The National Park Service, The United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Bobowski Decl., #4 Maslen Decl.)(Perez, Krystal-Rose)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for response/reply deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/24/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Proposed Joint Scheduling Order by Shawn Benge, Ben Bobowski, Deb Haaland, Jeff Mow, The National Park Service, The United States Department of the Interior re #7 Order (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystal-Rose Perez on behalf of All Defendants (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/22/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Case Status. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/21/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Deb Haaland, Shawn Benge, Jeff Mow, Ben Bobowski, National Park Service, U.S. Department of The Interior on 6/14/21, filed by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Kramer, Michael)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff to effect service as soon as possible, and promptly file proofs of service as to all defendants. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Deb Haaland, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Shawn Benge, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Jeff Mow, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ben Bobowski, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant The National Park Service, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Shawn Benge, Ben Bobowski, Deb Haaland, Jeff Mow, The National Park Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Kramer, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3086931.), filed by Tok Air Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint for Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint for Injunctive Relief)(Kramer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tok Air Service, LLC v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tok Air Service, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Mow
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Park Service
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bobowski
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Benge
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?