Mortenson et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jerry Mortenson and Alexandria E. Mortenson
Defendant: Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Yukon Kuskokwim Delta Regional Hospital, Dental Surgery/Oral Surgery Team Staff and United Sates of America
Case Number: 4:2021cv00026
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WARNING NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF & ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS: Plaintiff has until or before 21 days to file any opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement at Docket #6 . Defendant has until 14 days after service of opposition to file a reply. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 11/12/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by United Sates of America (Attachments: #1 2021 (10) Oct 01 Complaint - Small Claims, #2 2021 (10) Oct 01 Summons, #3 2021 (10) Oct 04 Affidavit of Service, #4 2021 (10) Oct 20 Entry of Appearance Adam Cook, #5 2021 (10) Oct 20 Motion for Extension of Time, #6 2021 (10) Oct 20 Motion for Expedited Consideration, #7 2021 (10) Oct 22 Order Granting Motion 1, #8 2021 (10) Oct 22 Order Granting Motion 2, #9 2021 (11) Nov 02 Notice of Removal)(Fonstad, John)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United Sates of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by United Sates of America (Fonstad, John)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION by United Sates of America re #1 Notice of Removal (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Sates of America from State of Alaska at Bethel, case number 4BE-21-00010 SC., filed by United Sates of America. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortenson et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Mortenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria E. Mortenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yukon Kuskokwim Delta Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Surgery/Oral Surgery Team Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sates of America
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?