Steinman v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Deanna B Steinman
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2023cv00025
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: This action is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/21/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulated Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/21/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration Stipulated by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Justin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David F. Chermol, at docket #4 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT: Defendant to file Answer/Response/Administrative Record w/in 60 days of the filing of complaint; parties to file their briefs w/in 30 days; reply due w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/21/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David F. Chermol. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3523811.) by Deanna B Steinman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermol, David)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Martin, Justin)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Chermol, David)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3517891.), filed by Deanna B Steinman.(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinman v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna B Steinman
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Marie Constance Scheperle
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?