Dunkin et al v Dorel Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shaun M. Dunkin and Sharlee Dunkin
Defendant: Dorel Industries, Inc., Dorel USA, Inc., Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc., Dorel Asia, Inc., Dorel Asia SRL and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00004
Filed: November 16, 2010
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Ketchikan Office
County: Ketchikan
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion in Limine. Evidence of defendants' compliance with industry standards is permissible. Evidence of collateral source payments is excluded. Evidence of Sharlee Dunkin's criminal history is excluded. Evidence of settlement negotiations is excluded. Evidence of defendants' insurance or self-insurance is excluded. The court reserves ruling on the admissibility of evidence concerning the timing and manner of plaintiffs&# 039; retention of counsel. Defendants may advance the theory that plaintiffs were negligent. Defendants may not reference plaintiffs' failure to attend trial. Evidence of plaintiffs' motion is excluded. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/27/12. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 23, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion in Limine. It is granted with respect to the CPSC spreadsheet. The spreadsheet is excluded. It is denied with respect to the Graco settlement agreement and recall notice. Those items are admissible and will be accompanied by an instruction to the jury regarding their permissible purposes. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/23/12. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 21, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion To Exclude Expert William Kitzes. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/21/12. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 15, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: defendants Motion in Limine 35 is DENIED. The clerk shall please terminate the identical motion 34 . Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/15/12. (NKD, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunkin et al v Dorel Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun M. Dunkin
Represented By: Blake M. Chupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharlee Dunkin
Represented By: Blake M. Chupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel Juvenile Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel Asia, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel Asia SRL
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?