Lege v. City of Ketchikan, Alaska et al
Plaintiff: Alexander J Lege and Alex J Lege
Defendant: Robert Cheatam, Justin Ostler, City of Ketchikan, Alaska, Louis J Boneta, Jr and The City of Ketchikan
Case Number: 5:2020cv00006
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/1/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alex J Lege. Justin Ostler waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Clark, Paul)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alex J Lege. Robert Cheatam waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Clark, Paul)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alex J Lege. The City of Ketchikan waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Clark, Paul)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex J Lege. Louis J Boneta, Jr served on 6/14/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Clark, Paul)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file a proof of service by seven days from the entry of this order or file a report concerning service of the amended complaint on defendant Boneta. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 13, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Alex J Lege. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Clark, Paul) Modified on 6/15/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/8/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Robert Cheatam, City of Ketchikan, Alaska, Justin Ostler. (Eakes, Laura)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Eakes on behalf of Robert Cheatam, City of Ketchikan, Alaska, Justin Ostler (Eakes, Laura)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to Louis J Boneta, Jr, Robert Cheatam, City of Ketchikan, Alaska, Justin Ostler. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Ostler, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ketchikan, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Cheatam, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Boneta)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander J Lege.(KMC, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis J Boneta, Jr, Robert Cheatam, City of Ketchikan, Alaska, Justin Ostler (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Alexander J Lege.(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lege v. City of Ketchikan, Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cheatam
Represented By: Laura Eakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Ostler
Represented By: Laura Eakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ketchikan, Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J Boneta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Ketchikan
Represented By: Laura Eakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander J Lege
Represented By: Paul Alexander Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex J Lege
Represented By: Paul Alexander Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?