Cottle v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne Cottle
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2023cv00003
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 001 Certification Page, #2 002 Court Transcript Index, #3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, #6 006 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, #7 007 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 3, #8 008 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 4, #9 009 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 5, #10 010 Non Disability Related Development, #11 011 Disability Related Development Part 1, #12 012 Disability Related Development Part 2, #13 013 Medical Records Part 1, #14 014 Medical Records Part 2)(Martin, Justin)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David F. Chermol, at docket #4 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Martin, Justin)
October 9, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David F. Chermol. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3505621.) by Kevin Wayne Cottle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermol, David)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT: Defendant to file Answer/Response/Administrative Record w/in 60 days of the filing of complaint; parties to file their briefs w/in 30 days; reply due w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/2/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2023 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #3 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Chermol, David)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3497999.), filed by Kevin Wayne Cottle.(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottle v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wayne Cottle
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Marie Constance Scheperle
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?