Adamson v. Hayes et al

Plaintiff: Gregory K Adamson
Defendant: Michael Hayes, C Watts, D Dollarhide, J John, M Dobson, C Eastman, C Bridges, R Papke, E Campbell, Unknown Gruetzmacher, Unknown Amezquita, T Miller, Unknown Viso, Unknown Parties, Tempe, City of, Joseph M Arpaio and Maricopa, County of
Case Number: 2:2005cv02286
Filed: July 29, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ADOPTING AND APPROVING 246 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 227 Mr. Adamson's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, such that Mr. Mayes and Mr. Telles are relieved from their duty to represent Mr. Adamson ; granting Mr. Eisenberg's Motion to Withdraw, such that he is relieved from his responsibility as guardian ad litem for Mr. Adamson. All remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk will enter a judgment that plaintiff take not hing from any of the defendants based on this order and the orders at (Doc. 201) and (Doc. 203) such that all claims are dismissed with prejudice, except that plaintiff's claims in his Second Cause of Action in the Amended Complaint at (Doc. 4) against defendants Michael Hayes, C. Watts, D. Dollarhide, C. Eastman, R. Papke, E. Campbell, Unknown Gruetzmacher, Unknown Amezquita, and T. Miller are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/17/12. (LSP)
August 16, 2012 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 238 Motion to Seal Notice of Filing E-Mails and Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/16/12. (MAP)
September 13, 2011 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court refer this matter to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Given the age of this case, this court requests that the Magistrate Judge conduct the settlement conference as soon as reasonably convenient to the parties and the Magistrate Judge. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/12/11.(LAD)
July 12, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION - For the reasons above, defendants' motion at docket 176 for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Maricopa County and Joseph M. Arpaio are DISMISSED with prejudice. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/12/11.(LAD)
June 22, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 193 Motion to Substitute Attorney. S. Lee White is hereby substituted for Maria Brandon and Richard Stewart as the attorney for Defendants Maricopa County and Sheriff Arpaio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/22/11.(TLJ)
December 7, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that David Eisenberg, Esq., is hereby appointed as guardian ad litem for Plaintiff in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may file dispositive motions on or after, but not before, Friday, March 4, 2011, but not aft er Friday, March 18, 2011 or such dispositive motions will be deemed untimely and summarily denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court and Defendants shall provide electronic notice to David Eisenberg, Esq., Plaintiff's guardian ad litem, on this order and all future filings herein until further order of the Court. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/6/10. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamson v. Hayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K Adamson
Represented By: David S Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hayes
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Watts
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Dollarhide
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J John
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Dobson
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Eastman
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Bridges
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Papke
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Campbell
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gruetzmacher
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Amezquita
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Miller
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Viso
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempe, City of
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?