October 9, 2009 |
Disbursement made in accordance with 321 Order on Motion to Exonerate, payable to XCENTRIC VENTURES LLC in the amount of $500.37, check number 00573196. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGE, )
|
October 9, 2009 |
Disbursement made in accordance with 321 Order on Motion to Exonerate, payable to XCENTRIC VENTURES LLC in the amount of $5,187.55, check number 00573197. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGE, )
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing 322
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Attempted - Not Known/ Unable to Forward. Document number 321. (REK)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing 321
ORDER granting 320 Plaintiff's Motion to Exonerate and Release Bonds; the $5,000.00 balance remaining from the cash bond originally posted on May 17, 2007 shall be exonerated and released. The $500.00 balance remaining from the cash bond posted on November 14, 2008 shall be exonerated and released. Directing the Clerk to send a warrant/check for the above amounts, made payable to Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/22/09.(LSP)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 320
MOTION to Exonerate Bonds by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing 319
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender. Document number 318. (MHA)
|
June 30, 2009 |
Filing 318
JUDGMENT ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment be entered in favor of the Plas Ed Magedson and Xcentric Ventures, LLC and against the Dfts William "Bill" Stanley, William "Bill" Stanley d/b/a defamationaction.com; William "Bill" Stanley d/b/a complaintremover.com; William "Bill" Stanley aka Jim Rickson; and William "Bill" Stanley aka Matt Johnson, jointly and severally, as follows: For actual damages in the principal amount of $479,740.51; For interest on the actual, compensatory and punitive damages at the federal legal rate of 2.08% per annum from the date of this Judgment until paid in full; For Plas' taxable costs in the principal amount of $561.84; and For interest on Plas' taxable costs at the federal legal rate of 2.08% per annum from the date of this Judgment until paid in full. Said Dfts are permanently enjoined (see attached order for details). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this permanent injunction applies to William Stanley regardless of the name or names he uses or goes by or may in the future use or go by. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 06/30/09. (NOTE: See attached pdf for full details) (ESL)
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing 317
Notice re of Filing Proposed Judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Judgment)(Speth, Maria)
|
June 18, 2009 |
Filing 316
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Moved - Left No Address/ Unable to Forward. Document number 314. (REK)
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 315
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved left no address. Document number 313. (CMH, )
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 314
ORDER Plaintiffs shall file a revised Proposed Final Judgment before 5:00 p.m. on June 26, 2009. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/16/09. (LSP)
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 313
ORDER pursuant to 312 Stipulation: dismissing with prejudice only the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Ed Magedson againts Defendants QED Media Group, L.L.C.; Robert Russo; and Internet Defamation League and counterclaims by Defendants Robert Russo and QED Media Group against Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Ed Magedson each party to bear its own fees and costs. This stipulation does not affect the claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendant William Stanley or any other named Defendant. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/12/09. (LSP)
|
June 5, 2009 |
Filing 312
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Robert Russo, QED Media Group, LLC, and Internet Defamation League, LLC Only by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Robert Russo, QED Media Group LLC and Internet Defamation League. (Speth, Maria) Modified on 6/8/2009 (LAD). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO IDENTIFY ADDITIONAL FILERS.
|
June 3, 2009 |
Filing 311
MOTION for Judgment Final Motion for Entry of Final Judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rogal, Laura)
|
May 19, 2009 |
Filing 310
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Moved - Left No Address/ Unable to Forward. Document number 309. (REK)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing 309
ORDER Upon joint request of the parties, the court grants an extension of up until June 5, 2009 for the parties to finally document their dismissal. This case will be dismissed with prejudice on that date. Nor further extensions will be granted. Directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on June 5 without further leave of Court. Ordered by Judge G Murray Snow on May 15, 2009. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, )
|
April 27, 2009 |
Filing 308
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender. Document number 307. (MHA)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 307
ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Vacating any pending hearings. Denying all pending motions as moot ( 261 , 304 denied as moot). Directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter 30 days from the date of this Order without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 04/17/09. (ESL)
|
April 16, 2009 |
Filing 306
NOTICE of Settlement by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson (Sbaiti, Mazin)
|
March 28, 2009 |
Filing 305
SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: 304 MOTION to Seal re Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Related Documents.. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Statement of Disputed Facts and Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Michael K. Dana, # 3 Exhibit to Dana Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Robert Russo, # 5 Exhibit 1-4 to Russo Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5-10 to Russo Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 11-18 to Russo Declaration)(Hutcherson, Kenton)
|
March 28, 2009 |
Filing 304
MOTION to Seal re Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Related Documents. by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutcherson, Kenton)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing 303
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender. Moved Left No Address. Unable to forward. Return to Sender. Document number 300. (HLA)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 302
Notice re Service of Special Interrogatories by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League (Hutcherson, Kenton)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 301
Notice re Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC (Rogal, Laura)
|
March 19, 2009 |
Filing 300
ORDER granting 298 Motion for Extension of Time; extending the time in which the Defendants/Counterclaimants may respond to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims, to and including, 3/27/09. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/19/09.(LSP)
|
March 19, 2009 |
Filing 299
ORDER The Court had a telephonic conference with the parties to resolve disputes pertaining to the Court's previous discovery order (Dkt. # 296). At the conference the Court ruled: 1. Plaintiffs are not entitled to require the QED defendants to place any amount in escrow prior to beginning the process of timely producing documents pertaining to their Corporate Advocacy Program.2. The Parties will cooperate and use the most efficient methods possible in producing the documents. To assist in that process, all of the customer information contained in the produced documents will be treated by all parties as confidential and will be subject to appropriate protection, including, to the extent applicable, the confidentiality order previously entered in this matter. 3. Plaintiffs are further entitled to identify and eliminate from production such documents as are attorney-client privileged. Given that the documents are all in electronic format Plaintiffs should identify such documents through the use of electronic searches that will facilitate the identification and review of documents that are subject to the privilege. Should such privileged documents be inadvertently disclosed they will be returned to the Plaintiffs unexamined by the QED Defendants except to the extent that examination was necessary to identify the document as subject to the attorney-client privilege. 4. The QED defendants will pay the necessary and reasonable expenses of the document production as specified in the previous order. To the extent that the parties are unable to agree on an appropriate amount, the Court will resolve the dispute. To the extent that the Court's assistance is required to resolve the dispute, the Court will enter a fees award and a sanction if one is indicated.. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on March 19, 2009. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, )
|
March 19, 2009 |
Filing 298
MOTION for Extension of Time Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims)(Hutcherson, Kenton)
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing 297
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved left no address; unable to forward. Document number 296. (MHA)
|
March 10, 2009 |
Filing 296
ORDER by the Court upon the parties oral motions to compel made at the telephonic hearing held 3/9/09, and the Court agreeing to consider "those matters raised in Pla's Motion to Compel and the QED Defendants Summary Discovery Issues". Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/10/09. (see order for details and scheduling deadlines). (SAT)
|
March 9, 2009 |
Filing 295
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender/ Moved Left No Address/ Unable to Forward. Document number 293. (REK)
|
March 6, 2009 |
Filing 294
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender/ Moved Left No Address/ Unable to Forward. Document number 291. (REK)
|
March 5, 2009 |
Filing 293
ORDER denying 278 Motion to Disqualify Counsel FURTHER ORDERED granting 279 Holden Willits Murphy PCs Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/5/09.(MAP)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Filing 292
REPLY in Support re 278 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Kenton Hutcherson and Mazin Sbaiti as pro hac vice counsel for Defendants Rob Russo, QED Media Group, LLC and Internet Defamation League, LLC filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Filing 291
ORDER pursuant to the 290 Stipulation : Granting a one-day extension, to and including, March 3, 2009, for Plas to file their Reply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/3/09. (KMG)
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing 290
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
February 27, 2009 |
Filing 289
Notice re of Service of Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson (Speth, Maria)
|
February 23, 2009 |
Filing 288
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to sender. Moved left no address. Unable to forward. Document number 284. (HLA)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing 287
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved left no address, unable to forward. Document number 282. (MHA)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing 286
RESPONSE in Opposition re 278 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Defendants Kenton Hutcherson and Mazin Sbaiti filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mazin Sbaiti in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, C,, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits E, F)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing 285
SEALED OPPOSITION (RESPONSE) re 254 filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League, Robert Russo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MAP)
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing 284
ORDER taking no action on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 254 and Defendants Summary of Discovery Issues 259 FURTHER ORDERED denying 276 Motion to Strike FURTHER ORDERED granting Motion 270 to File Under Seal FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to file under seal the Lodged Proposed Opposition Brief 271 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/19/09.(MAP)
|
February 17, 2009 |
Filing 283
RESPONSE in Opposition re 276 MOTION to Strike Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosure and Summary of Discovery Issues filed by Defendants QED Media Group, LLC, Robert Russo, and Internet Defamation League, LLC filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Dana, Michael)
|
February 13, 2009 |
Filing 282
ORDER granting 280 Emergency Motion to Continue. Dfts shall be relieved of serving a response to plas' motion for summary judgment pending resolution of plas' motion to disqualify counsel. Should plas' motion to disqualify counsel be denied, dfts shall have, in addition to any time remaining before 2/19/09, the number of days between 2/4/09 and the date of resolution; or 15 days if the motion is resolved after 2/19/09. All other associated deadlines shall be accordingly continued. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/12/2009. (LAD)
|
February 13, 2009 |
Filing 281
Notice re of Non-Opposition to Motion for Authorization to File Under Seal Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 270 First MOTION to Seal Document re Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits Thereto (Speth, Maria)
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing 280
Emergency MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Proceedings PENDING RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Continuance)(Sbaiti, Mazin)
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing 279
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Application to Withdraw by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Russo, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Dana, Michael) Modified on 2/12/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. (ESL).
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing 278
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Speth, Maria)
|
February 2, 2009 |
Filing 277
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved Left No Address. Document number 269. (CMH, )
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing 276
MOTION to Strike Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosure and Summary of Discovery Issues filed by Defendants QED Media Group, LLC, Robert Russo, and Internet Defamation League, LLC by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing 275
OBJECTION re QED Parties' Objections to Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosure Statement by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League re 253 Other Notice (Dana, Michael) Modified on 2/2/2009 (TLJ). INCORRECT DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM NOTICE TO OBJECTION.
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing 272
OBJECTION re 257 Other Notice, List of Objections to Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosure Filed by Defendants by Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 274
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender/ Moved, Left No Address/ Unable to Forward. Document number #264 and #265. (REK)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 273
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to Sender/ Moved, Left No Address/ Unable to Forward. Document number 260. (REK)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 271
SEALED LODGED Proposed Opposition Brief re: 270 First MOTION to Seal Document re Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits Thereto. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Dana, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Russo)(Dana, Michael)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 270
First MOTION to Seal Document re Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits Thereto by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 269
ORDER - Upon the Court's own motion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED vacating the 1/30/09 deadline for filing a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plas shall notify the Court that the parties are ready for scheduling of a Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/29/09. (see order for details)(SAT)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 268
ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 266 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 267 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 267
First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mazin A. Sbaiti of Hutcherson Sbaiti LLP by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Hutcherson, Kenton)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing 266
First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kenton J. Hutcherson of Hutcherson Sbaiti LLP by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Hutcherson, Kenton)
|
January 29, 2009 |
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX080370 as to Kenton J Hutcherson, Mazin A Sbaiti. (BAS, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 265
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE - Pursuant to the Court's order filed this date and upon the Court's instruction therein, judgment is entered for the Plaintiffs and against Defendant William Stanley in the amount of $10,327.50 plus interest thereon at the federal rate of.43% per annum. (SAT)
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 264
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dft William Stanley is adjudged to be in civil contempt of court for the second time for having knowingly and willfully violated this Court's Preliminary Injunction dated 6/21/07 (Dkt. # 33). FURTHER ORDERED that Dft William Stanley is civilly fined in the amount of $10,327.50, plus interest thereon at the federal rate of.43% per annum, payable to Plas. The Clerk shall enter a separate jgm against Dft William Stanley in favor of Plas in this amount. FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Section 3.b of the Uniform Domain Name Dispute Resolution Policy domain names are to be transferred to Plaintiff Xcentric Ventures, LLC. as listed in this order. FURTHER ORDERED that Dft William Stanley shall take whatever steps necessary to cooperate with and facilitate the transfer of registration of the listed domain names. FURTHER ORDERED that the domain name registrations transferred to Plas pursuant to this Order shall remain actively registered and shall not be transferred or used by Plas for any purpose without written approval of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Plas not remove or destroy any content from the transferred domain names that this Court has not found to be in violation of the Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 33) or other Orders of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that upon Dft William Stanley's appearance in this matter and upon the Court's determination that he is no longer in contempt and in compliance with court orders, the domain namesregistrations transferred to Plas pursuant to this Order will be transferred back to Dft William Stanley by court order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/27/09. (see order for full details). (SAT)
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing 263
MEMORANDUM re: Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Computation of Actual Damages on Order of Contempt by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura A. Rogal in Support of Attorneys Fees)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 262
STATEMENT of Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims re 261 MOTION for pARTIAL Summary Judgment by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ed Magedson, # 2 Declaration of Ben Smith, # 3 Declaration of Amy Thompson, # 4 Declaration of Kim Smith, # 5 Declaration of Kim Jordan, # 6 Declaration of Devin Willis)(Speth, Maria) Modified on 1/21/2009 (ESL, ).
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 261
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria) Modified on 1/21/2009 TO ADD THE VERBAGE PARTIAL TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ESL, ).
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 260
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW RE: CONTEMPT OF DFT WILLIAM STANLEY (SECOND). ORDERED that plas submit by 1/23/09 a form of order finding dft Stanley in civil contempt, with supporting evidence of damages and attorneys' fees. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/16/2009. (LAD)
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing 259
STATEMENT of Summary of Discovery Issues in Dispute Pursuant to Section 6 of the Court's February 15, 2008 Case Management Order by Counter Claimants QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League, Robert Russo, Defendants Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing 258
Notice re of Errata by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) re 254 MOTION to Compel discovery responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 13, 2009 |
Filing 257
Notice re Defendant/counterclaimants' Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., and Internet Defamation League L.L.C.'s Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosure Statement by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association) (Dana, Michael)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 256
Witness List by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (LAD)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 255
Exhibit List by Ed Magedson. (LAD)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 254
MOTION to Compel discovery responses by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 253
Notice re Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Speth, Maria)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 252
Notice re Service by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association) Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Dana, Michael)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 251
MEMORANDUM re: Bench Memorandum of Law in Support of Ordering Transfer of Domain Names to Plaintiff Xcentric Ventures, LLC by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 250
MEMORANDUM re: Bench Memorandum of Law in Support of Finding of Criminal Contempt Against Defendant William Stanley by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 249
ORDER EXTENDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION until 2/9/09 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/9/09. (REW, )
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 247
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Maria Speth and Laura Rogal for plaintiffs. Defendants are neither present nor represented by counsel. Show Cause Hearing held on 1/9/2009. Laura Rogal sworn and testifies. Ex's 1-5 marked for identification. Ex's 2, 3 and 4 admitted. Witness excused. Ed Magedson sworn and testifies. Witness excused. Argument presented. The Court extends the Preliminary Injunction for 30 days as set forth on the record. Order to follow. Plaintiffs' counsel shall serve the order on all of the providers that the preliminary injunction is going to extend to. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing 248
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: RTS - Moved, Left No Address, Unable to Forward. Document number 246 . (entered by HIH)
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing 246
ORDER denying both stipulations, re: 244 , 245 Stipulations to Extend Deadline for Resolution of Discovery Disputes and Submision of Disclosures. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/6/09. (REW, )
|
December 30, 2008 |
Filing 245
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND SUBMISSION OF DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26A3 by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND SUBMISSION OF DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26A3)(Rogal, Laura)
|
December 30, 2008 |
Filing 244
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND SUBMISSION OF DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FRCP 26A3 by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Rogal, Laura)
|
December 29, 2008 |
Filing 243
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward. Document number 242. (MHA)
|
December 23, 2008 |
Filing 242
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt. FURTHER ORDERED setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing for 1/9/2009 at 9:00 AM before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/22/08.(SAT)
|
December 4, 2008 |
Filing 241
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved left no address. Document number 238. (TLJ)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 240
Notice re of Service of Preliminary Injunction by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Speth, Maria)
|
November 25, 2008 |
Filing 239
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Return to sender, moved, left no address, unable to forward. Document number 233. (DNH)
|
November 25, 2008 |
Filing 238
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION that the APPLICATION for a Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED and Dft William "Bill" Stanley or any person acting in concert with him, including non-party Andrea Schurz, his officers, agents, employees, independent contractors, or other persons acting under his supervision and control or at his request are preliminarily enjoined; that the Preliminary Injunction extending the terms of the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # 233) be extended until 01/09/09. Dft Stanley's Response to 235 Motion for Order to Show cause is due on or before 12/04/08 and Pla shall have to and including 12/15/08 in which to file their reply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/24/08. (NOTE: SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FULL DETAILS)(ESL)
|
November 24, 2008 |
Filing 237
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Maria Speth for plaintiffs. No defendants present or represented by counsel. Show Cause Hearing held on 11/24/2008. The Court continues the Temporary Restraining Order as set forth on the record. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 236
Notice re of Service of Third Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Speth, Maria)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 235
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt (Second) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Speth, Maria)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 234
Notice re of Filing Security Bond by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Speth, Maria)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 233
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (granting 231 Ex Parte Motion) ORDERED Plaintiffs shall post security in the amount of $500 within 10 days of the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED Defendant Stanley appear before the Court on 11/24/08 at 9:00 a.m. and show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue extending the temporary orders. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs will provide a copy of this Order to Defendant Stanley as soon as possible but not later than 11/14/08. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/13/08. (MAP)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 232
EX PARTE MINUTE Entry. Proceedings held before Judge G. Murray Snow: Ex Parte hearing held on Plaintiffs Application for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice on 11/13/08. ORDERED granting 213 Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Written Order to follow. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) (cc: Pla's Cnsl) (MAP)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 231
EX PARTE MOTION by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Counsel, # 3 Declaration of Ed Magedson)(Speth, Maria)
|
November 12, 2008 |
Filing 230
ORDER The parties have kindly informed the court telephonically that although their stipulation only refers to the February 19, 2008 scheduling order, Judge Wake later extended some of the deadlines in an August 21, 2008 order. In that August order the court extended the deadlines for defendants expert disclosure and plaintiffs rebuttal disclosure (November 14). The Court further extended the fact discovery deadline until January 9, 2009, the dispositive motion deadline until January 23, 2009, and the deadline for the Joint Proposed Pretrial order until January 30, 2009. As a result, the Court acknowledges that the parties have submitted their extension request prior to the expiration of the relevant deadlines. It further acknowledges that the court's text entry order of this date misstates the deadlines pertaining to the deadlines for factual discovery, the submission of case-dispositive motions, and the date for submission of the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Therefore, the court grants the parties' motion to vacate its previous text entry order of this date. Nevertheless, the parties stipulation would still as a practical matter, require the court to reset the dates for discovery cut-off, the dispositive motion deadline, and the date for the Joint Proposed Pretrial order. The parties stipulation still provides no cause on which to do so. However, because it works no hardship to the Court's other established deadlines, the Court grants up to, and including January 16, 2009 in which to complete the expert depositions in this matter. Should the parties desire to extend the deadline for the completion of expert depositions beyond this date, or extend any of the other remaining deadlines, they must provide cause on which to do so consistent with Judge Wake's February 19, 2008 scheduling order.. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on November 12, 2008. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, )
|
November 12, 2008 |
Filing 229
ORDER denying 228 Stipulation : On February 19, 2008 the Court entered a Case Management Order. That order, among other things, required that expert depositions be completed by October 10, 2008, and that all discovery be completed by October 31, 2008. It further imposed a dispositive motion deadline of November 14, 2008 and required a Joint Pretrial Order to be filed by November 21. That order further specified that "[t]he parties are advised that the Court intends to enforce the deadlines set forth in this order. The Court will not extend the case processing deadlines because the parties wish to avoid litigation expense." The Case Management Order further stated "absent extraordinary circumstances the court will not entertain expert discovery disputes after the dealine for completion of expert discovery. Delay in presenting discovery disputes is not a basis for extending discovery deadlines." The parties" stipulation, filed on November 12, 2008, requests an extension of time in which to complete expert deposition from October 10, 2008 until February 10, 2009. It offers no reason justifying the extension of the deadline. The court declines to enter such an order for the following reasons. First, the stipulation was not filed until more than a month after the deadline had expired. As the Court previously noted "delay in presenting discovery disputes is not a basis for extending discovery deadlines." It is true that the parties have stipulated to the extension, thus the matter is not technically a "dispute." However, the difference between a "discovery dispute" and a "discovery request" in this context is not material. The parties were advised in the scheduling order that the deadlines would not be extended without good cause and, they were further advised that the court would not extend the deadlines merely to avoid litigation expense for the parties. The parties have not provided any reason to believe that there requested extension is for good cause. Further, although the parties do not acknowledge as much, the Court cannot practically alter the deadlines for completing expert depositions without altering the other deadlines in the case. The dispositive motion cut-off is November 14th and the deadline for filing the Joint Pretrial order is November 21st. Thus, in the absence of a timely request, due to the "domino" affect the request would have on other deadlines, and in the absence of any asserted "good cause" in which to extend the deadlines, the stipulated extension is denied. The other scheduling deadlines remain in place.. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on November 12, 2008. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, )
|
November 12, 2008 |
Filing 228
STIPULATION to Extend the Deadline for Expert Depositions by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
October 31, 2008 |
Filing 227
Notice re Notice of Service by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association) Fourth Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories (Dana, Michael)
|
October 31, 2008 |
Filing 226
Notice re Notice of Service by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association) Third Requests for Production of Documents (Dana, Michael)
|
October 31, 2008 |
Filing 225
Notice re Notice of Service by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association) First Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Dana, Michael)
|
October 23, 2008 |
Filing 224
Notice re Service of Second Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Speth, Maria)
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 223
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward. Document number 222. (LSP)
|
September 4, 2008 |
Filing 222
The court has ORDERED this case reassigned to Judge G. Murray Snow who is newly-appointed to the District of Arizona. The reassignment is effective September 8, 2008. Judge Snow's docket is created from cases randomly-drawn from other judges in the Phoenix Division. As a result of combining cases that have been calendared on the dockets other judges, Judge Snow may be required to make future scheduling adjustments in this case. If, however, the Court does not otherwise provide notice of a change in the date or time of a hearing currently scheduled by the Court to which this matter was previously assigned, the parties should appear in Judge Snow's court for the hearing as scheduled. Any case deadlines remain unaffected by this order. Cases that have previously been referred to Magistrate Judges remain assigned to the Magistrate Judge receiving the referral. Any hearings in such matters scheduled by the Magistrate Judge remain unaffected by this Order. In such cases the parties should appear before the Magistrate Judge as scheduled. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
|
September 2, 2008 |
Filing 221
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: not at this address. Document number 220. (DMT, )
|
August 22, 2008 |
Filing 220
ORDER pursuant to 219 Stipulation: Discovery due by 1/9/2009. Dispositive motions due by 1/23/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2009. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/21/08. (LSP)
|
August 21, 2008 |
Filing 219
STIPULATION To Extend Various Deadlines by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 218
REPORT of Joint Report on Settlement Talks by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 217
TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying 216 Stipulation: THE COURT ORDERS the Stipulation denied, without prejudice. It appears the pending stipulation to extend expert disclosure would also impact the deadline for discovery, dispositive motions, and the pretrial order. Counsel are directed to confer and submit a revised stipulation that accounts for revised deadlines for all deadlines impacted by this extension. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
|
August 19, 2008 |
Filing 216
STIPULATION To Extend Deadline for Disclosure of Expert Testimony by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association), Defamation Action League. (Dana, Michael)
|
July 29, 2008 |
Filing 215
ORDER pursuant to 214 Stipulation: ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiffs full and complete expert disclosures as required by Rule 26(a)(2)(A)-(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Defendants expert disclosure regarding the Second Amended Counterclaim from July 28, 208 to August 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/29/08. (SJF)
|
July 28, 2008 |
Filing 214
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Disclosure of Expert Testimony by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
July 7, 2008 |
Filing 213
TEXT-ONLY ORDER pursuant to 212 Stipulation: ORDERED that the mediation deadline presently set for August 4, 2008, shall be extended until August 14, 2008. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
|
July 7, 2008 |
Filing 212
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Mediation by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association). (Dana, Michael)
|
June 13, 2008 |
Filing 211
ANSWER to 208 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual).(Speth, Maria)
|
May 30, 2008 |
Filing 210
Notice re of Service by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League(an unincorporated association) of Notice of Taking Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Ed Magedson (Dana, Michael)
|
May 27, 2008 |
Filing 209
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: return to sender-moved and left no address. Document number 204. (TLJ)
|
May 27, 2008 |
Filing 208
ANSWER to 193 Amended Complaint and Second Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dana, Michael)
|
May 20, 2008 |
Filing 207
Notice re Notice of Service by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League Second Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Ed Magedson (Dana, Michael)
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 206
ORDER re 205 STIPULATION. ORDERED extending the deadline for the parties to meet in person and engage in good faith settlement talks to August 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/15/08. (SJF)
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 205
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ENGAGE IN GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT TALKS by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
May 15, 2008 |
Filing 204
ORDER that Plaintiff show cause by 5/28/2008. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/14/08. (TLJ)
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 203
Notice re Service of Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents and Things by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League, Defamation Action League (Dana, Michael)
|
April 15, 2008 |
Filing 201
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved and left no address-unable to forward. Document number 198. (TLJ)
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 202
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved and left no address-unable to forward. Document number 200. (TLJ)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 200
PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF ROBERT RUSSO re: stipulation 197 . Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/3/08. (TLJ)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 199
Notice re Withdrawal of Application for Preliminary Injunction by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League re 152 Memorandum, 151 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Application for) (Dana, Michael)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 198
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re: stipulation 196 . ORDER substituting the law firm Holden Willits Murphy, PLC for Snell & Wilmer, LLP as counsel of record for Defendants/counterclaimants Robert Russo, QED Media Group, LLC., and Internet Defamation League, LLC. Michael K. Dana remains counsel of record for the QED parties in this case, along with his new firm Holden Willits Murphy, PLC. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/2/08. (TLJ)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 197
STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Robert Russo by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Robert Russo)(Dana, Michael)
|
April 2, 2008 |
Filing 196
STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
April 1, 2008 |
Filing 195
NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Russo, filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
March 21, 2008 |
Filing 194
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved and left no address. Document number 192. (TLJ)
|
March 11, 2008 |
Filing 193
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants with Jury Demand filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson.(TLJ)
|
March 11, 2008 |
Filing 192
ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to file the Proposed First Amended Complaint 183 . Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/11/08.(TLJ)
|
March 10, 2008 |
Filing 191
Notice re Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League re 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Complaint (Dana, Michael)
|
March 10, 2008 |
Filing 190
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: stipulation 187 . Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/10/08. (TLJ)
|
March 6, 2008 |
Filing 189
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved left no address. Document number 176 and 177. (TLJ)
|
March 6, 2008 |
Filing 188
NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Russo, filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
March 6, 2008 |
Filing 187
STIPULATION to File Agreed Protective Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order)(Speth, Maria)
|
February 25, 2008 |
Filing 186
NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Russo, filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
|
February 25, 2008 |
Filing 184
ORDER granting 181 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline to March 21, 2008 for Plaintiffs to amend the complaint for the sole purpose of adding a copyright claim against Defendants. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/25/08.(SJF)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 183
LODGED Proposed First Amended Complaint re: 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 182
MOTION to Amend/Correct re Complaint by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline version of the proposed amended complaint)(Speth, Maria)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 181
MOTION for Extension of Time of time to file a motion to amend the complaint until March 21, 2008 by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 185
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: moved and left no address. Document number 162. (TLJ)
|
February 21, 2008 |
Filing 180
ORDER that the Stipulation to File Agreed Protective Order 178 is denied without prejudice to submission of a further agreed protective order. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/20/08. (TLJ)
|
February 20, 2008 |
Filing 179
NOTICE of Deposition of Ed Magedson, filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
February 20, 2008 |
Filing 178
STIPULATION to File Agreed Protective Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order)(Speth, Maria)
|
February 19, 2008 |
Filing 177
CLERK'S JUDGMENT-IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to this Courts order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant William Stanley in the amount of $34,048.00, plus interest thereon at the federal rate of 2.08% per annum, payable to Plaintiffs. (TLJ)
|
February 19, 2008 |
Filing 176
ORDER that Defendant William Stanley is adjudged to be in civil contempt of court for having knowingly and willfully violated this Court's Preliminary Injunction dated 6/21/07. ORDER that Defendant William Stanley is civilly fined in the amount of $34,048.00, plus interest thereon at the federal rate of 2.08% per annum, payable to Plaintiffs. The Clerk shall enter a separate judgment against Defendant William Stanley in favor of Plaintiffs in this amount. ORDER that Defendant William Stanley shall be civilly fined in the amount of $5,000.00 (U.S.) per week for each week that he fails to fully comply with the following terms of this Order. ORDER that the Clerk of Court mail this order to Defendant Stanley at his last known address. ORDER that Plaintiff e-mail this order to Defendant Stanley at his last known e-mail address. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/15/08. (TLJ)
|
February 19, 2008 |
Filing 175
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 10/31/2008. Dispositive motions due by 11/14/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/21/2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/15/08. (TLJ)
|
February 19, 2008 |
Filing 174
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: granting 144 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to Quash. Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing held on 2/15/08 as to the two Motions to Quash re: 144 and 145 . The court directs the Clerk's Office that, since a default has been entered as to Mr. William Stanley, no further correspondence needs to be mailed to him by the Clerk's Office except as ordered by the court. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.)(TLJ)
|
February 12, 2008 |
Filing 173
REPLY in Support re 144 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ben Smith filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
|
February 12, 2008 |
Filing 172
REPLY to Response to Motion re 145 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Taylor Wingate Group and Rick Gelber and Motion for Protective Order filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
|
February 12, 2008 |
Filing 171
RESPONSE to Motion re 151 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Application for) filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Speth, Maria)
|
February 7, 2008 |
Filing 170
REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 169
RESPONSE in Opposition re 145 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Taylor Wingate Group and Rick Gelber and Motion for Protective Order filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Anderson, Teresa)
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 168
RESPONSE in Opposition re 144 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ben Smith filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Anderson, Teresa)
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 167
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). Amendment to 158 Notice of Deposition FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF TEXAS REDWOOD LUMBER CO.. (Rogal, Laura)
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 166
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). Amendment to 157 Notice of Deposition FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JEFFREY PARNELL. (Rogal, Laura)
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 165
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). Amendment to 159 Notice of Deposition FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF CAROLYN ESTAVILLE. (Rogal, Laura)
|
February 4, 2008 |
Filing 164
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: moved, left no address. Document number 139. (DMT, )
|
February 4, 2008 |
Filing 163
NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Russo, filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
February 4, 2008 |
Filing 162
ORDER re 161 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME - The QED Parties Responses to the Motion to Quash Subpoena to Ben Smith [Doc. #144] and Motion to Quash Subpoena to Taylor Wingate Group and Rick Gelber [Doc. #145] may be extended until Tuesday,February 5, 2008; and Plaintiffs Replies to the Motions to Quash Subpoenas may be extended until Tuesday, February 12, 2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/1/08. (DMT, )
|
February 1, 2008 |
Filing 161
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONSE AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO TAYLOR WINGATE GROUP, RICK GELBER AND BEN SMITH by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
February 1, 2008 |
Filing 160
LODGED Proposed Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
January 30, 2008 |
Filing 159
NOTICE of Deposition of CAROLYN ESTAVILLE, filed by all plaintiffs. (Rogal, Laura)
|
January 30, 2008 |
Filing 158
NOTICE of Deposition of CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF TEXAS REDWOOD LUMBER CO., filed by all plaintiffs. (Rogal, Laura)
|
January 30, 2008 |
Filing 157
NOTICE of Deposition of Jeffrey Parnell, filed by all plaintiffs. (Rogal, Laura)
|
January 29, 2008 |
Filing 156
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: moved, left no address. Document number 148. (DMT, )
|
January 28, 2008 |
Filing 155
Notice re Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo (Dana, Michael)
|
January 24, 2008 |
Filing 154
Notice re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC (Rogal, Laura)
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 153
MOTION for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 151) by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dana, Michael)
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 152
MEMORANDUM re 151 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Application for) by Counter Claimants QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Defendants Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Dana, Michael)
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 151
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Application for) by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 150
ORDER that re 147 LODGED Proposed Order 147) is rejected, without prejudice to submission of a further order with appropriate specificity of curative action that is to be ordered. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/23/08. (DMT, )
|
January 22, 2008 |
Filing 149
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: not known, unable to forward. Document number 128. (DMT, )
|
January 22, 2008 |
Filing 148
ORDER, Hearing set as to 144 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ben Smith, 145 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Taylor Wingate Group and Rick Gelber: Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Any responses to the motions shall be filed by February 1, 2008; replies are due February 8, 2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/22/08. (DMT, )
|
January 22, 2008 |
Filing 147
LODGED Proposed Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 146
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: not known, unable to forward. Document number 135. (DMT, )
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 145
MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Taylor Wingate Group and Rick Gelber and Motion for Protective Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Faith)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 144
MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Ben Smith by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Faith)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 143
DECLARATION of Declaration of Maria Crimi Speth in Support of Attorneys' Fees re 142 Memorandum, by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 142
MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum in Support of Computation of Actual Damages on Order of Contempt re 135 Order, by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
January 18, 2008 |
Filing 141
Notice re Notice of Service of Discovery Documents for Defendants/Counterclaimants Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., and Internet Defamation League, L.L.C. by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League (Dana, Michael)
|
January 15, 2008 |
Filing 140
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: attempted not know. Document number 134. (DMT, )
|
January 11, 2008 |
Filing 139
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to William Bill Stanley, an individual; William Bill Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William Bill Stanley dba Complaintremover.com: William Bill Stanley aka JimRickson and William Bill Stanley aka Matt Johnson. (DMT, )
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 138
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson against Defendants William "Bill" Stanley; William "Bill" Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William "Bill" Stanley dba Complaintremover.com; William "Bill" Stanley aka Jim Rickson; and William "Bill" Stanley aka Matt Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Speth, Maria)
|
January 7, 2008 |
Filing 137
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: not at this address. Document number 117. (DMT, )
|
January 4, 2008 |
Filing 135
ORDER re 74 Order to Show Cause. That Plaintiffs submit by January 18, 2008, a form of order finding Defendant Stanley in civil contempt, with supporting evidence of the fact and computation of actual damages to be awarded.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/3/08. (DMT, )
|
January 3, 2008 |
Filing 136
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: attempted not known. Document number 124. (DMT, )
|
January 3, 2008 |
Filing 134
ORDER denying 131 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson against Defendants William "Bill" Stanley; William "Bill" Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William "Bill" Stanley dba Complaintremover.com; William "Bill" Stanley aka Jim Rickson; and William "Bill" Stanley aka Matt Johnson without prejudice to filing an application giving sworn evidence of compliance with the court's order allowing alternative service (doc #78). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/2/08. (DMT, )
|
December 28, 2007 |
Filing 133
Reply re 130 Other Notice, to Response Regarding Notice of Continuing Violation of Preliminary Injunction Dated June 21, 2007 by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
December 26, 2007 |
Filing 132
AFFIDAVIT of Maria Speth re 131 Application for Entry of Default,, Against Defendants William "Bill" Stanley; William "Bill" Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William "Bill" Stanley dba Complaintremover.com; William "Bill" Stanley aka Jim Rickson; and William "Bill" Stanley aka Matt Johnson by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
December 26, 2007 |
Filing 131
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson against Defendants William "Bill" Stanley; William "Bill" Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William "Bill" Stanley dba Complaintremover.com; William "Bill" Stanley aka Jim Rickson; and William "Bill" Stanley aka Matt Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
|
December 19, 2007 |
Filing 130
Notice re Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Continuing Violation of Preliminary Injunction Dated June 21, 2007 by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League re 96 Other Notice, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dana, Michael)
|
December 18, 2007 |
Filing 129
Notice re Of Serivce of Discovery Papers by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League (Dana, Michael)
|
December 17, 2007 |
Filing 128
ORDER denying plas' 126 APPLICATION for Entry of Default Against Dfts Stanley without prejudice to filing an application giving evidence of compliance with the Court's Order Allowing Alternative Service. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/17/2007. (LAD)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 127
AFFIDAVIT of Laura Rogal re 126 Application for Entry of Default, by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 126
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson against Defendants William "Bill" Stanley; William "Bill" Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William "Bill" Stanley dba Complaintremover.com; William "Bill" Stanley aka Jim Rickson and William "Bill" Stanley aka Matt Johnson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 125
Notice re of Filing Affidavit of Publication by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rogal, Laura)
|
December 12, 2007 |
Filing 124
ORDER Denying 122 APPLICATION for Entry of Default against William "Bill" Stanley.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/11/07. (DMT, )
|
December 11, 2007 |
Filing 123
AFFIDAVIT of Laura A. Rogal re 122 Application for Entry of Default, by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
December 11, 2007 |
Filing 122
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson against Defendants William Bill Stanley; William Bill Stanley dba Defamationaction.com; William Bill Stanley dba Complaintremover.com, William Bill Stanley aka Jim rickson and William Bill Stanley aka Matt Johnson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
December 7, 2007 |
Filing 121
NOTICE OF CORRECTION BY THE CLERK re 120 Mail Returned. Description of deficiency: Incorrect file date entered. Follow up by Clerks Office: The deficiency indicated above has been addressed by the Clerk. Court use only: LAD. (TLJ)
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 120
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Stanley. Reason for return: "Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender". Document number 116 . (LAD) Modified on 12/7/2007 (TLJ). FILE DATE MODIFIED TO CORRECT FILE DATE.
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 117
ORDER issued: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/4/07. See text of order.(SJF)
|
December 3, 2007 |
Filing 119
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: moved, left no address, unable to forward. Document number 110,112. (DMT, )
|
December 3, 2007 |
Filing 118
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: moved, left no address, unable to forward. Document number 113. (DMT, )
|
November 27, 2007 |
Filing 116
ORDER denying 114 Motion to Quash without prejudice to refiling if necessary, after complying with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(2)(C) and (c) and Rule45(c).. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/26/07.(DMT, )
|
November 26, 2007 |
Filing 115
RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 114
MOTION to Quash SUBPOENA TO GOOGLE INC. DATED OCTOBER 23, 2007 by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Dana, Michael)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 113
ORDER denying as moot re: 100 APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF NE EXEAT.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/21/07. (DMT, )
|
November 19, 2007 |
Filing 112
ORDER granting 111 STIPULATION to extend time to respond. Defendants' deadline to file briefs is extended to 11/26/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/19/2007. (NVW, )
|
November 19, 2007 |
Filing 111
STIPULATION re 106 Memorandum, EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND (Second Request) by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
November 16, 2007 |
Filing 110
ORDER granting 109 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Finding QED Media Group, LLC in Contempt. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/16/2007. (NVW, )
|
November 16, 2007 |
Filing 109
STIPULATION re 97 Memorandum, to Extend Time for Defendants Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., and Internet Defamation League, LLC, to Respond to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Finding QED Media Group, LLC in Contempt by QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
November 15, 2007 |
Filing 108
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: moved, left no address, unable to forward. Document number 86. (DMT, )
|
November 14, 2007 |
Filing 107
MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum of Law in Support of a Finding of Criminal Contempt Against Defendant William Stanley re 101 Notice of Filer of Deficiency, by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
November 14, 2007 |
Filing 106
MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum of Law In Support of Finding QED Media Group, LLC in Contempt re 101 Notice of Filer of Deficiency, by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Rogal, Laura)
|
November 14, 2007 |
Filing 105
Notice re of Continuing Violation of Preliminary Injunction Dated June 21, 2007 by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) re 101 Notice of Filer of Deficiency, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rogal, Laura)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 104
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to W. Stanley. Reason for return: moved, left no address. unable to forward. Document number 87. (DMT, )
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 101
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 96 Other Notice filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, 97 Memorandum, filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, 98 Memorandum, filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Description of deficiency: Documents do not contain a signature. (TLJ)
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 103
TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause Hearing Proceedings held on 11/2/07 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. (BAS, )
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 102
TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause Hearing Proceedings held on 11/1/07 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. (BAS, )
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 100
APPLICATION re: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF NE EXEAT by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Speth, Maria)
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 99
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 98
MEMORANDUM re: OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF A FINDING OF CRIMINAL CONTEMPT AGAINST DEFENDANT WILLIAM STANLEY by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria) Modified on 11/13/2007 (TLJ). DOCUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A SIGNATURE, ATTORNEY NOTICED TO REFILE.
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 97
MEMORANDUM re: MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF FINDING QED MEDIA GROUP, LLC IN CONTEMPT by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria) Modified on 11/13/2007 (TLJ). DOCUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A SIGNATURE, ATTORNEY NOTICED TO REFILE.
|
November 9, 2007 |
Filing 96
Notice re OF CONTINUING VIOLATION OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION DATED JUNE 21, 2007 by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria) Modified on 11/13/2007 (TLJ). DOCUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A SIGNATURE, ATTORNEY NOTICED TO REFILE.
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 95
Notice by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson of Threat Emails Received from the Email Address "videowebsites@yahoo.com" (Rogal, Laura)
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 94
Notice re of Service by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson of Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendants Russo, QED Media Group, LLC and Internet Defamation League, LLC (Rogal, Laura)
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 93
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League for proceedings held on 11/1/07 and 11/2/07 before Judge Wake. (Dana, Michael)
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 92
Minute Order re exhibits (see document for details) (LAD)
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 91
Exhibit List (LAD)
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 90
Witness List by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (LAD)
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 89
Amended Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake. Continued Show Cause Hearing held on 11/2/2007. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.)(LMR, )
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 88
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) for proceedings held on November 1, 2007 and November 2, 2007 before Judge Wake. (Speth, Maria)
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 87
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake. Continued Show Cause Hearing held on 11/2/2007. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.)(LMR, )
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 86
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/1/2007. Docket ordered updated with Defendant Stanley's address as contained in the minute entry. Hearing continued to 11/2/2007 at 02:15 PM before Judge Neil V Wake. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.)(SJF)
|
October 31, 2007 |
Filing 85
Notice re of Lodging by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Speth, Maria)
|
October 29, 2007 |
Filing 84
ORDER: Plaintiff to file by 5:00 pm on 10/31/2007 proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law re contempt hearing set 11/1/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/29/2007. (NVW, )
|
October 25, 2007 |
Filing 83
NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Russo, filed by all plaintiffs. (Speth, Maria)
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 82
Notice re of Filing Declaration of Thomas Zeeh Regarding Attempted Service of Process Upon Defendant William "Bill" Stanley by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Speth, Maria)
|
October 3, 2007 |
Filing 81
ORDER granting 80 Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Date for Contempt Hearing. Hearing is advanced to 11/1/2007 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiffs' disclosure due 10/16/2007; defendants' disclosure due 10/26/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/3/2007.(NVW, )
|
October 3, 2007 |
Filing 80
MOTION to Continue Contempt Hearing Set For November 9, 2007 by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 79
ORDER re 77 show cause hearing set for 11/9/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/2/2007. (NVW, )
|
October 2, 2007 |
Filing 78
ORDER re 72 alternative service on Defendants Stanley. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/2/2007. (NVW, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 77
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show cause hearing set for 11/9/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/1/2007. (NVW, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 76
ORDER denying request (in doc. #69) to reopen evidence on preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/1/2007. (NVW, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 75
ORDER granting 72 Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service. Proposed form of order due 10/3/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/1/2007.(NVW, )
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 74
LODGED Proposed Order to Show Cause re: 64 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Contempt. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 73
MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum of Law Addressing Service of Order to Show Cause by Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
September 27, 2007 |
Filing 72
MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants Stanley, et al. by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Speth, Maria)
|
September 27, 2007 |
Filing 71
REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
September 26, 2007 |
Filing 70
NOTICE of Deposition of John F. Brewington, filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
September 17, 2007 |
Filing 69
RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Contempt filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
September 12, 2007 |
Filing 68
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 51 Depositions of Magedson. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/12/2007. (NVW, )
|
September 10, 2007 |
Filing 67
LODGED Proposed Protective Order re certain depositions. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order Regarding Depositions of Magedson)(Kunz, Adam)
|
September 6, 2007 |
Filing 66
ORDER granting 64 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/6/2007.(NVW, )
|
September 4, 2007 |
Filing 65
ORDER: Parties shall lodge stipulated form of protective order re deposition issues by 9/10/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/4/2007. (NVW, )
|
August 30, 2007 |
Filing 64
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Contempt by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Index# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20)(Speth, Maria)
|
August 22, 2007 |
Filing 63
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2007 re 51 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.)(SJF)
|
August 16, 2007 |
Filing 62
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Kunz on behalf of all plaintiffs (Kunz, Adam)
|
August 16, 2007 |
Filing 61
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual).(Speth, Maria)
|
August 16, 2007 |
Filing 60
On the court's own motion and after consultation with counsel, IT IS ORDERED resetting the TIME ONLY for the hearing on 51 Motion for Protective Order from 10:00 AM to 2:00 PM on 8/22/2007 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Entered by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/16/2007. (NVW, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 59
ORDER approving 58 STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SCOPE OF AUGUST 22, 2007 HEARING. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/15/2007. (NVW, )
|
August 14, 2007 |
Filing 58
STIPULATION RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND SCOPE OF AUGUST 22, 2007 HEARING by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Defamation Action League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
August 9, 2007 |
Filing 57
ORDER granting 56 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 8/14/2007 FOR QED DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/9/2007. (NVW, )
|
August 9, 2007 |
Filing 56
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR QED DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Defamation Action League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
August 8, 2007 |
Filing 55
Notice re SERVICE OF THIRD SET OF NON-UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT XCENTRIC VENTURES, LLC by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League (Dana, Michael)
|
August 8, 2007 |
Filing 54
ORDER that the Court will take no action on the email received from Mr. Brewington without a proper motion; that the clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Mr Brewington via the email address listed below.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/7/07. (DMT, )
|
July 30, 2007 |
Filing 53
ORDER re 51 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions. Response due 8/10/2007; reply 8/17/2007. Motion hearing set for 8/22/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/30/2007. (NVW, )
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 52
LODGED Proposed Proposed Protective Order Re Depositions re: 51 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 51
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Speth, Maria)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 50
IT IS ORDERED granting 34 Defendants/Counterclaimants' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Entered by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/27/2007.(NVW, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 49
ORDER denying 31 Motion to Disqualify Counsel, denying 45 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/27/2007.(NVW, )
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 48
ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/27/2007.(NVW, )
|
July 20, 2007 |
Filing 47
ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/20/2007.(NVW, )
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing 46
Notice re SERVICE OF DISCOVERY PAPERS by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League, Robert Russo(an individual) (Dana, Michael)
|
July 18, 2007 |
Filing 45
MOTION for Hearing on Motion re FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE QED PARTIES' JUNE 20, 2007 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
July 16, 2007 |
Filing 44
REPLY in Support re 31 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
July 16, 2007 |
Filing 43
REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count 1 and 2 of counterclaim filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
July 13, 2007 |
Filing 42
NOTICE of Deposition of John F. Brewington, filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
July 12, 2007 |
Filing 41
Notice re SERVICE OF DISCOVERY PAPERS BY DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League (Dana, Michael)
|
July 6, 2007 |
Filing 40
RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Count 1 and 2 of counterclaim filed by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo, Internet Defamation League. (Dana, Michael)
|
July 6, 2007 |
Filing 39
RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Speth, Maria)
|
July 5, 2007 |
Filing 38
MOTION for Amend Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson(an individual). (Speth, Maria)
|
June 29, 2007 |
Filing 37
ORDER granting 36 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR COUNTERCLAIMANTS TO RESPOND TO COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/29/2007. (NVW, )
|
June 29, 2007 |
Filing 36
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR COUNTERCLAIMANTS TO RESPOND TO COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by QED Media Group, L.L.C., Robert Russo(an individual), Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dana, Michael)
|
June 26, 2007 |
Filing 35
AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT (SECOND) AND AMENDED, COUNTERCLAIM (SECOND) against Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson by Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Internet Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Dana, Michael)
|
June 26, 2007 |
Filing 34
MOTION to Amend/Correct re MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by Robert Russo. (Dana, Michael)
|
June 21, 2007 |
Filing 33
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting 2 Application for a Preliminary Injunction FURTHER ORDERED Defendants and their officers, agents, employees, independent contractors, or other persons acting under their supervision and control or attheir request are preliminarily enjoined from: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS FURTHER ORDERED that the $5,000 temporary restraining order bond previously posted in this case shall serve as the preliminary injunction bond under Fed.R.Civ. P. 65. This preliminary injunction is effective immediately. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/21/07. (MAP)
|
June 21, 2007 |
Filing 32
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/21/07. (MAP)
|
June 20, 2007 |
Filing 31
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Dana, Michael)
|
June 18, 2007 |
Filing 29
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims: Count 1 and 2 of counterclaim filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Description of deficiency: Case number is listed incompletely as "07-954." See attached for details. (LAD)
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 30
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/07 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie Adams. (REW, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 28
MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims: Count 1 and 2 of counterclaim by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria) Modified on 6/18/2007 (LAD). DOCUMENT FILED WITH INCOMPLETE CASE NUMBER.
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 27
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 24 MOTION for Motion for Decision on Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Description of deficiency: Case number is listed incompletely as "07-954." DO NOT REFILE. See attachment for details. (LAD)
|
June 14, 2007 |
Filing 26
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Robert Russo for proceedings held on 5/17/2007 before Judge Wake. (Dana, Michael)
|
June 14, 2007 |
Filing 25
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson for proceedings held on 05/17/2007 before Judge Wake. (Speth, Maria)
|
June 14, 2007 |
Filing 24
MOTION for Motion for Decision on Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants by Xcentric Ventures, LLC(an Arizona Corporation), Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Speth, Maria) Modified on 6/15/2007 (LAD). DOCUMENT FILED WITH INCOMPLETE CASE NUMBER.
|
June 6, 2007 |
Filing 23
AMENDED ANSWER to AND COUNTERCLAIM 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Xcentric Ventures, LLC by QED Media Group, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Dana, Michael)
|
May 24, 2007 |
Filing 22
Reply re 20 Other Notice in Support of Proposed Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson, Counter Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
|
May 23, 2007 |
Filing 21
RESPONSE re 20 Other Notice of Lodging Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Robert Russo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Dana, Michael)
|
May 21, 2007 |
Filing 20
Notice re of Lodging Preliminary Injunction by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
|
May 17, 2007 |
Filing 19
Witness List by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (LAD)
|
May 17, 2007 |
Filing 18
Exhibit List by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (LAD)
|
May 17, 2007 |
Filing 17
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Preliminary Injunction/Show Cause Hearing held on 5/17/2007. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.)(SJF)
|
May 17, 2007 |
Filing 16
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Robert Russo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A# 2 EXHIBIT B# 3 Declaration of Robert Russo)(Dana, Michael)
|
May 17, 2007 |
Filing 15
Notice re Posting Bond by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 6 Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings (Speth, Maria)
|
May 14, 2007 |
Filing 14
Summons Issued as to Robert Russo, QED Media Group, L.L.C., Defamation Action League, Internet Defamation League, William Stanley.(Attachments: # 1 Summons Internet Defamation League# 2 Summons QED Media Group LLC# 3 Summons Robert Russo# 4 Summons William Stanley)(HLA)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 13
Notice re Summons (Defamation Action League) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 1 Complaint (Speth, Maria)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 12
Notice re Summons (Internet Defamation League) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 1 Complaint (Speth, Maria)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 11
Notice re Summons (QED Media Group) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 1 Complaint (Speth, Maria)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 10
Notice re Summons (Russo) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 1 Complaint (Speth, Maria)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 9
Notice re Summons (Stanley) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 1 Complaint (Speth, Maria)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 8
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Description of deficiency: The following parties were added incorrectly: William "Bill&q Stanley, Robert Russo dba, QED Media Group, LLC dba, (HLA)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 7
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. Description of deficiency: The following required documents were not attached: summons. (HLA)
|
May 11, 2007 |
Filing 6
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER issued. Show cause hearing set for 5/17/2007 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/11/2007. (NVW, )
|
May 11, 2007 |
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CIV-07-954-PHX-NVW. (entered by HLA)
|
May 10, 2007 |
Filing 5
Notice re of Lodging by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Speth, Maria)
|
May 10, 2007 |
Filing 4
Notice re of Errata by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
|
May 10, 2007 |
Filing 3
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake : Apr. Maria Speth for plas Hearing held on 5/10/2007 re: Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order. Plaintiff to submit a revised form of order by 5/11/2007 for the Court's consideration in granting the motion for temporary restraining order.Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/17/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Plaintiffs to make their best efforts to serve the defendants. Court order to follow.(Court Reporter David German.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA, )
|
May 10, 2007 |
Filing 2
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Speth, Maria)
|
May 10, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 1221932 (TRO Requested), filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
|