Padgett v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Aubrey Gayle Padgett
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections, Freeland, Dora Schariro, Walker, Kirkland and Krumpelman
Case Number: 2:2008cv00617
Filed: March 31, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Pinal
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 77 and Motion for Summary Judgment 78 . ORDER Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 77 is granted and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 78 is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must dismiss this action without prejudice and enter judgment accordingly Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/15/10.(TLJ)
March 26, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, adopting the 63 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as the order of this Court; denying 39 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/24/09. (REW, )
January 26, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Complaint : Recommending that Pla's motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 01/23/09. (ESL)
November 26, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Magistrate Judge's 38 Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety as the Order of the Court; overruling Plaintiff's 41 Objections to the Report and Recommendation; Defendants Walker , Kirkland, and Krumpelman are required to answer Count I of the 6 Amended Complaint; dismissing Count II and Count III of the Amended Complaint and Ordering that all named Defendants except for Walker, Kirkland, and Krumpelman be dismissed. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/24/08. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Gayle Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schariro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krumpelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?