Peter Strojnik, P.C., et al. v. Signalife, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik PC and Peter Strojnik
Defendant: Innovative Communications Incorporated, Digitalspeed Communications Incorporated, Unknown Parties, Alla Pasternack, Adam Harris Pasternack, Triple Play Stock Alert, Signalife Incorporated and Unknown Pasternack
Case Number: 2:2008cv01116
Filed: June 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER pursuant to #67 Stipulation of Dismissal: this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/22/09. (LSP)
December 21, 2009 Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Strojnik, Peter)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the docketing of this order unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. All pending hrgs and motions are deemed moot. Finding as moot #62 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/13/09. (SAT)
November 12, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE of Settlement by Signalife, Inc (Eckstein, Timothy)
October 20, 2009 Filing 64 Notice re Service of Discovery by Signalife, Inc (Eckstein, Timothy)
October 19, 2009 Filing 63 Notice re of Non-Receipt of Discovery Referenced in Doc. 61 by Peter Strojnik, P.C. re #61 Other Notice (Strojnik, Peter)
October 19, 2009 Filing 62 AMENDED MOTION to Compel Response to Discovery (Amended) by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter)
October 13, 2009 Filing 61 Notice re of Service of Discovery by Signalife, Inc (Eckstein, Timothy)
October 12, 2009 Filing 60 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter)
May 7, 2009 Filing 59 Notice re of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Non-Party Digitalspeed Communications by Peter Strojnik, P.C., Peter Strojnik (Strojnik, Peter)
April 21, 2009 Filing 58 Notice re Plaintiffs Notice of Service of Discovery Request Set No. 1 and Disclosure Statement by Peter Strojnik, P.C., Peter Strojnik (Strojnik, Peter)
March 31, 2009 Filing 57 Notice re of Service of Discovery by Signalife, Inc (Eckstein, Timothy)
March 30, 2009 Filing 56 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,, by Signalife, Inc.(Eckstein, Timothy)
March 25, 2009 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peter Strojnik, P.C., Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/20/2009. Dispositive motions due by 12/18/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/20/2009. (KAR)
March 20, 2009 Filing 53 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Frederick J Martone: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/20/2009, Ordered dismissing all fictitious parties so that the only remaining defendant is Signalife, Inc. Triple Play Stock Alert and Unidentified Defendants terminated. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/27/2009 as to Peter Strojnik, P.C. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.)(DMT, )
March 17, 2009 Filing 52 REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Peter Strojnik, P.C., Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
March 17, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Strojnik on behalf of Peter Strojnik, P.C. (Strojnik, Peter)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER - IT IT ORDERED GRANTING Alla Pasternack's #21 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING Adam Pasternack's #23 MOTION to Dismiss, and GRANTING DigitalSpeed's #25 MOTION to Dismiss, for lack of personal jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Signalife's #32 MOTION to Dismiss. Parties Alla Pasternack, Digitalspeed Communications, Inc., and Adam Harris Pasternack terminated. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/9/09.(SAT)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying #48 Joint Motion to Continue Rule 16 Pretrial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/5/09.(MAP)
March 4, 2009 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Signalife, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Timothy)
January 28, 2009 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Signalife, Inc. (Eckstein, Timothy)
January 28, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/12/2009 as to Peter Strojnik, P.C. and Signalife, Inc.(KAR)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/20/2009 02:00 PM before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/20/09. (LSP)
January 20, 2009 Filing 44 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Adam Harris Pasternack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vanacour, Jason)
January 20, 2009 Filing 43 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Digitalspeed Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vanacour, Jason)
January 20, 2009 Filing 42 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Jane Doe Pasternack, Alla Pasternack. (Vanacour, Jason)
January 15, 2009 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 First MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT SIGNALIFE INC.S REPLY TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Signalife, Inc. (Eckstein, Timothy)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #31 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. ORDERED that dft Signalife, Inc. will have until 12/31/08 to respond to pla's 1st amended complaint. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/9/2009. (LAD)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Stipulation: ORDERED that the entry of default entered against Signalife, Inc. on 12/1/08 is set aside. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/9/2009. (LAD)
January 9, 2009 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Adam Pasternack, #25 MOTION to Dismiss Party Digital Speed Communications; Innovative Communications filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Strojnik, Peter) Modified on 1/13/2009 DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c) (REW, ).
January 5, 2009 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 First MOTION to Dismiss Case ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST LEAVE TO AMEND AND OR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 5, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. Party Innovative Communications, Inc. terminated. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 2, 2009 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Party Digital Speed Communications; Innovative Communications ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND OR REQUEST LEAVE TO AMEND AND OR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Errata 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Errata 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Strojnik, Peter)
January 2, 2009 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Adam Pasternack ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND OR REQUEST LEAVE TO AMEND AND OR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 2, 2009 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Alla Pasternack ALTERNATIVELY REQUEST TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND OR REQUEST LEAVE TO AMEND AND OR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Strojnik, Peter)
December 31, 2008 Filing 32 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Signalife, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Timothy)
December 11, 2008 Filing 31 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re #14 Amended Complaint,, by Signalife, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Timothy)
December 11, 2008 Filing 30 STIPULATION re #19 Clerk's Entry of Default by Signalife, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Timothy)
December 10, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Joel Eckstein on behalf of Signalife, Inc (Eckstein, Timothy)
December 3, 2008 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Communications, Inc.. (Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Digitalspeed Communications, Inc.. (Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM re: of Law re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Party Digital Speed Communications; Innovative Communications by Defendants Digitalspeed Communications, Inc., Innovative Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Party Digital Speed Communications; Innovative Communications by Digitalspeed Communications, Inc., Innovative Communications, Inc.. (Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM re: of Law re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Adam Pasternack by Defendant Adam Harris Pasternack. (Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Adam Pasternack by Adam Harris Pasternack. (Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM re: of Law re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Alla Pasternack by Defendant Alla Pasternack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vanacour, Jason)
December 3, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Alla Pasternack by Alla Pasternack. (Vanacour, Jason)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER pursuant to #17 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Amended Complaint, the defendants shall have through and including 12/3/08 to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/1/08. (TLJ)
December 1, 2008 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Signalife, Inc pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (LSP)
November 25, 2008 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Entry of Default against Signalife, Inc. by Plaintiff Peter Strojnik, P.C. against signalife, Inc.. (Strojnik, Peter)
November 24, 2008 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Digitalspeed Communications, Inc., Innovative Communications, Inc., Adam Harris Pasternack, Jane Doe Pasternack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krueger, Melissa)
November 4, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. Signalife, Inc served on 10/20/2008. (Strojnik, Peter)
October 15, 2008 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Signalife, Inc, Digitalspeed Communications, Inc., Innovative Communications, Inc., Adam Harris Pasternack and Jane Doe Pasternack. (Attachments: #1 Digitalspeed Communications, #2 Innovative Communications, #3 Jane Doe Pasternack, #4 Signalife Inc)(HIH). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
October 7, 2008 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUCTIVE RELIEF AND FOR DAMAGES ARISING OUT OF TRANSMISSION OF UNSOLICITED FAXES-47 USC 227 AND FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND FOR CIVIL CONSPIRACY AND FOR AIDING AND ABETTING against Signalife, Inc, Digitalspeed Communications, Inc., Innovative Communications, Inc., Adam Harris Pasternack, Jane Doe Pasternack, Unidentified Defendants 1-10 ; Party ABC Defendants terminated;Jury Demand, filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons ADAM HARRIS PASTERNACK, #2 Summons DIGITALSPEED, #3 Summons INNOVATIVE COMMUNICATIONS, #4 Summons JANE DOE PASTERNACK, #5 Summons SIGNALIFE)(Strojnik, Peter)
September 29, 2008 Filing 13 Notice re OF WITHDRAWL MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY DIGITALSPEED INC by Peter Strojnik, P.C. re #10 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY DIGITALSPEED COMMUNICATIONS, INC (Strojnik, Peter)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Compel Production of Subpoenaed Documents from Non-Party Signalife, Inc., but without prejudice to the right of plaintiff to apply to the Central District of California.. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/26/08.(DMT, )
September 25, 2008 Filing 11 Notice re RULE 37 CERTIFICATION OF ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER WITH NON PARTY DIGITALSPEED COMMUNICATIONS INC PRECEDING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Peter Strojnik, P.C. re #10 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY DIGITALSPEED COMMUNICATIONS, INC (Strojnik, Peter)
September 25, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY DIGITALSPEED COMMUNICATIONS, INC by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Strojnik, Peter)
September 2, 2008 Filing 9 Notice re OF SERVICE by Peter Strojnik, P.C. re #7 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY SIGNALIFE INC (Strojnik, Peter)
September 2, 2008 Filing 8 Notice re PLAINTIFFS RULE 37 A 1 CERTIFICATION by Peter Strojnik, P.C. re #7 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY SIGNALIFE INC (Strojnik, Peter)
September 2, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY SIGNALIFE INC by Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strojnik, Peter)
August 6, 2008 Filing 6 Letter to the Court from Luan Phan (MAP)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte Motion to Suspend Rule 26(d)(1). This, of course, is without prejudice to the right of any subpoenaed person or entity to seek protection under Rule 45(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. FURTHER ORDERED that this order does not constitute an extension of time under Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., for service of process. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/5/08.(MAP)
June 24, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint filed by Peter Strojnik, P.C., Peter Strojnik. Description of deficiency: Party not added to case - Unidentified Defendants 11-50. (MHA)
June 16, 2008 Filing 3 Notice of Availability MHA) CORRECTION-REMOVED FILERS. Modified on 6/24/2008 (MHA).
June 16, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frederick J. Martone. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-08-1116-PHX-FJM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHA)
June 16, 2008 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION re #1 Complaint by Peter Strojnik, P.C., Peter Strojnik. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter)
June 16, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002012836, filed by Peter Strojnik, Peter Strojnik, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supplement)(Strojnik, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Strojnik, P.C., et al. v. Signalife, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Communications Incorporated
Represented By: Jason Scott Vanacour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digitalspeed Communications Incorporated
Represented By: Jason Scott Vanacour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alla Pasternack
Represented By: Jason Scott Vanacour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Harris Pasternack
Represented By: Jason Scott Vanacour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Play Stock Alert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signalife Incorporated
Represented By: Timothy Joel Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pasternack
Represented By: Jason Scott Vanacour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik PC
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Represented By: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Represented By: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?