Strojnik v. Costar Realty Information, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Defendant: Costar Realty Information, Inc. and Costar Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01276
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2009 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Motion for Sanctions withdrawn 33 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/4/09.(MAW)
February 3, 2009 36 Featured Case ORDER: On February 2, 2008, a Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions was filed. IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Page 11, Section G, specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/3/09. (MAW)
February 2, 2009 35 STIPULATED Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 33 MOTION for Sanctions against The Costar Realty Information, Inc., Costar Group, Inc., 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Costar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gosdis, Shane) Modified on 2/3/2009 (DMT, ). INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION MISC. RELIEF.
January 30, 2009 34 Featured Case ORDER denying 24 Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/30/09.(MAW)
January 30, 2009 33 MOTION for Sanctions against The Costar Realty Information, Inc., Costar Group, Inc. by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 27, 2009 32 Notice re NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COSTS by Peter Strojnik re 31 Taxation of Costs (Strojnik, Peter)
January 27, 2009 31 Taxation of Costs in the amount of $39.00 against Plaintiff. Signed by Michael O'Brien, Chief Deputy Clerk on 1/27/09. (BAR, )
January 22, 2009 30 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Supplemental Affidavit of Shane D. Gosdis in Support of Defendants' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Costar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gosdis, Shane)
January 22, 2009 29 REPLY in Support re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Costar Group, Inc.. (Gosdis, Shane)
January 20, 2009 28 Notice re Defendants' Notice of Filing Invoice Copies in Support of Statement of Taxable Costs by Costar Group, Inc. re 25 Set Deadlines/Hearings, 23 Bill of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gosdis, Shane)
January 12, 2009 27 DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF PETER STROJNIK UNDER THE PENALTY OF PERJURY re 26 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 12, 2009 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
January 9, 2009 25 Minute Order re Defendant has until 1/20/09 to file invoice copies of the costs they are claiming in accordance with Local Rule LRCiv 54.1. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR, )
January 6, 2009 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Costar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ricketts, Cynthia)
January 6, 2009 23 BILL OF COSTS Defendants' Statement of Taxable Costs by Costar Group, Inc.. (Ricketts, Cynthia)
December 23, 2008 22 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed December 23, 2008, defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is granted. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are terminated. (SAT) Modified on 12/30/2008 (TLJ). DOCUMENT FILED WITH INCORRECT CASE NUMBER.
December 23, 2008 21 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting Dfts' 12 Motion to Dismiss Pla's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/23/08.(SAT)
August 21, 2008 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Costar Group, Inc.. (Gosdis, Shane)
August 19, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Stipulation and 18 Stipulation: Defendants shall File its Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss no later than August 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/19/08. (LSP)
August 15, 2008 18 STIPULATION re 14 Response to Motion, 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File its Reply in its Support of Motion to Dismiss by Costar Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gosdis, Shane)
August 15, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER that the 16 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Dfts to File its Reply in Support of 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Page 11, Section G, specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/14/08. (DNH)
August 13, 2008 16 STIPULATION re 14 Response to Motion, 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File its Reply in its Support of Motion to Dismiss by Costar Group, Inc.. (Gosdis, Shane)
August 7, 2008 15 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss Case and alternative motion for a more definite statement. Plaintiffs request for oral argument is denied.. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/7/08.(DMT, )
August 4, 2008 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
August 4, 2008 13 Featured Case ORDER that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-08-1276 PHX SRB. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/4/08. (Judge Susan R Bolton added. Judge David G Campbell no longer assigned to case.)(DMT, )
August 1, 2008 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Costar Group, Inc.. (Gosdis, Shane)
July 18, 2008 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costar Realty Information, Inc., Costar Group, Inc.. (Gosdis, Shane)
July 15, 2008 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
July 15, 2008 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Costar Realty Information, Inc., Costar Group, Inc.;Jury Demand, filed by Peter Strojnik.(Strojnik, Peter) Modified on 7/16/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
July 15, 2008 8 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case or in Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
July 11, 2008 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case or in Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement by Costar Group, Inc.. (Ricketts, Cynthia)
July 11, 2008 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Costar Group, Inc., Costar Realty Information, Inc. Description of deficiency: Incorrect information added to Party Information Screen. (REK)
July 11, 2008 4 Miscellaneous Document: Removal Letter from USDC, District of Arizona (REK)
July 10, 2008 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/25/2008 as to Costar Realty Information, Inc. and Costar Group, Inc.. (REK, )
July 10, 2008 3 Notice re Magistrate Consent Form (REK)
July 10, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 08-1276-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered by REK)
July 10, 2008 *****State Court record received on 7/10/2008*****SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Strojnik. Costar Realty Information, Inc. served and filed in State Court on 6/10/2008, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/10/2008 for case management purposes.***** (REK)
July 10, 2008 2 SUPPLEMENT of Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet re 1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Costar Group, Inc. and Costar Realty Information, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ricketts, Cynthia) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIEDon 7/11/2008 TO IDENTIFY CORRECT FILERS (REK).
July 10, 2008 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Encanto Justice Court, case number CC2008-123579 Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002070510, filed by Costar Group, Inc. and Costar Realty Information, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ricketts, Cynthia) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED on 7/11/2008 TO IDENTIFY CORRECT FILER (REK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strojnik v. Costar Realty Information, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costar Realty Information, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costar Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Represented By: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?