Osborn v. Bartos, et al.,

Plaintiff: Kevin A Osborn
Defendant: Dora Schriro, Ivan Bartos, Ramos, Palossari, Herb Haley, John Does, Jane Does and Dona Markley
Case Number: 2:2008cv02193
Filed: December 1, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 280 ) is ADOPTED. IT IS ORDERED Defendants Unknown Parties (John Does and Jane Does) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/3/2012. (KMG)
September 20, 2010 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's Motion to Compel Discovery, filed June 3, 2010 (Doc. 161) is GRANTED to the extent of the relief provided herein. FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts Ramos, Bartos, Palossari, and Kaufman are deemed to have admitted the allegations in the Requests for Admissions previously served upon them by Pla. FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts responses ordered herein above shall be served on Pla (or responses to orders to show cause filed) within fourteen days of the filing of this Order. FURTHER ORDERE D, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), that within twenty-one days of the filing of this Order, Dfts shall pay to Pla the sum of $77.50 as the costs of the motion to compel, unless within fourteen days of this Order either party f iles a notice setting forth an alternative calculation of such costs. In the event such a notice is filed, the other part(ies) shall have seven days from the service of such notice to respond thereto. FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civi l Procedure 37(d) granting sanctions against Dfts Palossari and Markley, the nature of such sanctions being taken under advisement. FURTHER ORDERED that within seven days of the filing of this Order, Dfts shall file with the Court a copy of Pla's interrogatories to Dft Palossari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin on 9/17/10. (NOTE: See Order for full details)(KMG)
September 9, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - the Report and Recommendation is (Doc. 143) IS ADOPTED and Defendant Marten IS DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/8/10. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborn v. Bartos, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schriro
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Bartos
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palossari
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Markley
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?