Thomas v. CHS et al

Plaintiff: Robin Lorenzo Thomas, Jr.
Defendant: CHS and MCSO
Case Number: 2:2009cv00490
Filed: March 10, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case; the Clerk shall dismiss this action without prejudice and enter judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/8/09.(LSP)
May 20, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Defendant Maricopa County is dismissed without prejudice 7 . Defendants Nurses CS833 and CH430 at Lower Buckeye Jail must answer Count I of the First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (doc.# 7), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Nurses CH430 and CS833 at the Lower Buckeye Jail. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court w ithin 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin for all pretrial proceedings authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin added. Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin (PS) no longer assigned to case., Maricopa County terminated. Service Packet due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/20/09. (DMT, )
April 14, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff is required to pay the $350.00 filing fee. The Complaint is dismissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk must enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. CHS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Lorenzo Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?