WildEarth Guardians v. Salazar

Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Case Number: 2:2009cv00574
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 59 Defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's employee declarations; denying as moot 67 Defendant's Motion to Strike Gunnison County's amicus brief; granting 69 Defendant's Motion to Strike 61 Plai ntiff's Reply to its statement of Facts, see PDF document for details; granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, see PDF document for details and denying 59 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/30/10.(LSP)
November 25, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Arizona and New Mexico Cattle Growers' Associations' 33 motion to intervene; they may participate as amici curiae, if they choose to do so, they shall file one brief by 12/16/09; denying Plaintiff's 41 motion to supp lement the administrative record; denying as moot Cattle Growers' 50 motion to strike; denying as moot Plaintiff's 47 motion for extension of time; denying as moot Plaintiff's 48 motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/24/09.(REW, )
June 24, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ****VACATED PER 31 ORDER DATED 09/04/09*****ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the Board of County Commissioners and the County of Gunnison, Colorado's 14 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/23/09. (SAT) Modified on 9/8/2009 (ESL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians v. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?