Sanchez

Plaintiff: Elaine Munoz Sanchez
Defendant: Joseph M. Arpaio, R. Kent, Woolf, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Maricopa County, Arizona
Case Number: 2:2009cv01150
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion to Substitute ttorney. Attorneys Randall R. Garczynski and Brad Keogh with the Maricopa County Office of General Litigation Services are hereby substituted for attorneys Maria R. Brandon and S. Lee White with the Maricopa County Office of Special Litigation Services as counsel of record for Defendant Deputy Brian Woolf. Attorneys Maria R. Brandon and S. Lee White with the Maricopa County Office of Special Litigation Services remain as couns el of record for Deputy Robert Kent. At this time, Attorneys Randall R. Garczynski and Karen J. Hartman-Tellez represent Maricopa County, doc. 91, but Ms. Hartman-Tellez does not represent Defendant Deputy Brian Woolf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/15/10.(LAD)
October 5, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Motion of Defendants Deputy Woolf, Deputy Kent, Sheriff Arpaio, and Maricopa County for Summary Judgement Based Upon Qualified Immunity 51 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; the Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Defe ndant Arpaio on Count One and Defendants Kent and Woolf on Plaintiff's allegations in Count One that the Deputies lacked reasonable suspicion to conduct a traffic stop; the Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's Fourth Amen dment claims that Defendants Kent and Woolf lacked probable cause to arrest her and used excessive force in effectuating her arrest; the Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot as to Plaintiff's claims asserted against Defendant Maricopa County in Count One. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/5/10.(REW)
September 10, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant Maricopa County's Separate 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Pla's claims asserted in Count One of the Complaint, and DENIED, without prejudice, in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/10/10. (SAT)
August 31, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 75 Motion to Substitute Counsel, re: attorneys Randall Garczynski and Brad Keogh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/31/10.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Munoz Sanchez
Represented By: Daniel R Ortega, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County, Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?