v. City of Scottsdale et al

Plaintiff: David Hulstedt
Defendant: City of Scottsdale, Richard Slavin, James Dorer, Deven Fellows, Marcos Garcia, Frank O'Halloran, Hugh Lockerby, Daniel Greene, Michael Hertko, Mark Toschik, Kim Miller and Scott Smith
Case Number: 2:2009cv01258
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 265 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 271 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See PDF document for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 333 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and denying 334 Motion for Certification of Issue for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/6/12.(LSP)
March 2, 2012 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting oral argument on 265 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 271 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 334 Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Issue for interlocutory Appeal: Hearing set for 3/14/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/2/12. (LSP)
January 20, 2012 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Defendants' Motion To Exclude and/or Strike the Opinions, Reports and Testimony of Mike Torres 242 ; granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Pleading Under Seal 258 and directing the Clerk to file the lodged Opposition and Exhibits (Docs. 259-264) under seal; denying Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Evidence Relating to Defendant James Dorer 287 without prejudice to its renewal. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/20/12.(REW)
July 18, 2011 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 236 Defendants' Motion to Clarify the Courts' Previous Orders Regarding Richard Gerry's Role as Guardian Ad Litem for D.H., see PDF document for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that D.H.'s guardian ad litem shall prepare and file under seal on or before Friday, August 12, 2011, a Status Report, see PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/18/11.(LSP)
July 7, 2011 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 207 Motion to Seal and directing the Clerk of the Court to file under seal the lodged Proposed Plaintiffs' 209 Motion to Amend. FURTHER ORDERED denying ([209 lodged, 279 filed) Motion to Amend the Liability Scheduling Order and Plaintiff's Motion to File A Second Amended Complaint FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 237 the Motion to Seal Exhibits C and D FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 274 the Motion to Withdraw (274) FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 208 Stipula tion to Order Permitting the Filing of a Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint as an Exhibit to Their Motion to Amend the Liability Scheduling Order and to File a Second Amended Complaint FURTHER ORDERED granting 251 Stipulation to File Non-Paper Exhibits. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/6/11. (MAP)
March 28, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court appoints Richard M. Gerry, Esq., as guardian ad litem for D.H. in this case. The Clerk is directed to provide Mr. Gerry with a copy of this order and add him as D.H.'s guardian ad litem as if he were, which he is not, D.H.&# 039;s counsel of record in this case. All counsel, parties, and D.H.'s guardian ad litem will hereinafter use the child's initials, rather than the child's full name, in all filings unless the document is filed under seal in compliance with LRCiv 5.6. The Court also directs the Clerk to redact the child's full name in the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and list of parties in the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/28/11. (LSP)
March 15, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Defendants' Amended Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court grants Defendants' motion as to Plaintiffs' counts three, four, five, and six, and denies it as to count 12. As to cou nt 7, the Court grants in part and denies in part. Defendants' motion is granted as to the pre-shooting warrantless entry, but denied as to the post-shooting warrantless entries. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to reassign this case. The above matter has been reassigned by random lot to Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleaidngs in this matter should now list the following complete case number: CV 09-1258 PHX-GMS.. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/15/11.(LSP)
March 1, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Defendants' Rule 60 Motion for Relief from the Court's Order Appointing Eric Hulstedt as Guardian Ad Litem for DH; vacating the Court's 11/10/2010 Order appointing Plaintiff Eric Hulstedt as guardian ad litem of D. H. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 111 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Eric Hulstedt in His Capacity as Purported Guardian Ad Litem for "DH". IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an independent person should be appoint ed as guardian ad litem for D.H. for this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing that the matter of selecting and appointing the guardian ad litem be delegated to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson as he was previously randomly assigned as the Settlement Conference judge. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/1/11.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. City of Scottsdale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Scottsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deven Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hertko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Toschik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hulstedt
Represented By: Alan M Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?