Riess v. Cordero et al

Plaintiff: Richard Steven Riess
Defendant: Robert Cordero, Keith Acosta, James Schomig, Bruno Stolc, Karl Stansel and Niles Behrens
Case Number: 2:2009cv01760
Filed: August 24, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' 157 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution is granted. Defendants' 158 Motion for a Ruling is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/16/11. (ESL)
September 9, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 145 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 149 Plaintiff's Request for Further Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order. Plaintiff shall file and serve his portions of the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/9/11. (SJF)
June 24, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Non-Uniform Interrogatories 128 , which the court deems to be a motion to suppress, is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff's Resp onse in Opposition to Defendants' Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement 132 , which the court deems to be a motion to suppress, is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Third Supplemental Discl osure Statement 134 , which the court deems to be a motion to suppress, is DENIED without prejudice; Defendants [sic] Motion for Extension of time to File Proposed Joint Pretrial Order 138 is DENIED as moot; and the parties shall lodge a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order in accordance herewith by no later than 6 weeks from the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/24/11. (REW)
May 26, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Defendants' 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 93 Motion for Summary Judgment as follows: (a) granted as to the claim for denia l of congregate services and all official capacity claims; and (b) denied in all other respects; the remaining claims are the free exercise and equal protection claims for damages and injunctive relief regarding denial of a kosher diet, denial of access to the chapel, and denial of a Torah and Siddur. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/24/11. (REW)
March 28, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (Doc. 84 ). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (Doc. 84 ) is granted, the claims against Cordero and Acosta are dismissed with prejudice, and Cordero and Acosta are dismissed. The remaining claims are against Defendants Stansel and Behrens. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/28/11. (SAT)
October 13, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Within 20 days of the date of this Order, the United States Attorney must notify the Court whether he will accept service with the permission of Cordero and Acosta or file, under seal, the last k nown addresses for these Defendants. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including 8 First Amended Complaint, this Order, and summons forms for Defendants Cordero and Acosta, and the United States of America. If Plaintiff does not compl ete service of the Summons and First Amended Complaint on a Defendant within 75 days of the filing of this Order, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/10/10. (LSP)
April 9, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Behrens and Cordero must answer Plaintiff's claims in Counts I through VIII of the First Amended Complaint; Defendants Stansel and Acosta must answer Plaintiff's clai ms in Counts I, II, and IV through VIII of the First Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Cordero and Acosta . That Plaintiff shall complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date this order is filed. That this matter is again referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Local Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/8/10. (LSP)
January 13, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn solely as to Plaintiffs motion to vacate the filing fee 9 FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs motion to vacate the 10/22/09 Order, 5 , requiring that the filing fee be collected from Plaintiffs trust account incrementally is granted as statedbelow 9 . FURTHER ORDERED That the 10/2/209 Order, 5 , directing the Warden of Eloy Detention Center or his designee to collect a $350.00 filing fee from Plaintiffs trust account in connection wi th this case is vacated. The Warden or his designee must promptly restore to Plaintiffs trust account any sums collected in connection with this action that have not yet been forwarded to the Court. FURTHER ORDERED The Clerk of Court must serve by m ail a copy of this Order on the Warden of Eloy Detention Center, 1705 East Hanna Road, Eloy, Arizona, 85231 and to Financial Administration for the Phoenix Division of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/12/10. (MAP)
October 22, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. Defendants James Schomig, Bruno Stolc, Keith Acosta and Robert Cordero are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Behrens a nd Stansel must answer Counts I-VIII. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (doc.# 1), this Order, and summons forms for Defendants Behrens and Stansel. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Cle rk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/21/09. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riess v. Cordero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Steven Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Schomig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruno Stolc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Stansel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niles Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?