Shields v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Candiece Shields
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2009cv01973
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Granting plaintiff's Motion for an award of fees under section 406(b) in the amount of $17,850.00. (Doc. 40 ). It is further ORDERED that upon receipt of this award, plaintiff's counsel shall refund to plaintiff the fee awarded under the Equal Access to Justice Act ($4,461.21)(doc. 37 ). See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 06/15/15. (ATD)
August 22, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART plaintiff's motion for an award of attorney's fees (doc. 30). We grant plaintiff attorney's fees in the amount of $4,461.21. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/22/2011.(KMG)
March 2, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - REVERSING the decision of the ALJ, and REMANDING this case pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration in accordance with this order. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/2/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candiece Shields
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?