Hassan v. Maricopa County Sheriffs Office et al

Plaintiff: Said Ali Hassan
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriffs Office, Joe Arpaio and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2009cv02219
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Rehearing 33 and Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint 34 are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/12/12.(DMT)
September 16, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18), Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery (Doc. 21), Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 23), and Plaintiff's Motion/ Application for Waiver (Doc. 24). Denying 21 Motion for Discovery; denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 24 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/14/10.(DMT) Modified on 9/16/2010 to add text as to reference(DMT).
March 11, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Counts 1 and 2 and all Dfts other than Dfts Arpaio, the unnamed Commander/Captain at the Lower Buckeye Jail, and the unnamed transferring Deputy at the Lower Buckeye Jail are dismissed without prejudice. Dft Arpaio must answer Count 3. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the Second 11 Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dft Arpaio. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 03/09/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. Maricopa County Sheriffs Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Said Ali Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?