Torrez v. Corrections Corporation of America et al

Plaintiff: David Torrez
Defendant: James Schomig, Chad Miller, Charles DeRosa, James Young, Tim Chase, R Tapia, Barbara Seidl, Lucibeth Mayberry, Corrections Corporation of America and Muriel Powers
Case Number: 2:2010cv00116
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Reconsideration is granted to the extent that judgment entered on 8/9/10 is vacated; Defendants Mayberry, Chase, Tapia, Schomig, Miller, Seidl, Young, Roberts, Delsordi, and Allridge-Williams a nd Counts I (in part), II (in part), III, IV (in part), V, VI (in part), VII, and VIII are dismissed without prejudice; Defendants CCA, De Rosa, and Powers must answer Counts I (in part), II (in part), IV (in part), and VI (in part), 24 ; the Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint 24 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants CCA, De Rosa, and Powers; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/22/10. (REW)
June 22, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by 7/17/10, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice. Special Prisoner Deadline due by 7/17/2010.Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/17/10.(TLJ)
June 16, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/14/10.(TLJ)
June 9, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Ex Parte Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/6/10. (MAP)
January 21, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is severed into individual actions, one for each pla. The Clerk must assign a new case number to each new individual action. The Clerk must file a copy of the present 1 COMPLAINT and this order in each new case. The Clerk of Co urt must file Pla Torrez's application to proceed in forma pauperis and Torrez's motion for appointment of person to serve process in Pla Torrez's newly assigned case. The individual plas must proceed independently from this point and will not be regarded as co-plas.... All further pleadings, motions or other papers submitted for filing by an individual pla in his separate case must be signed by the individual pla, or they will be stricken. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/15/10. (Originally filed in 2:09cv2298 on 1/20/10)(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrez v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Schomig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles DeRosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Seidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucibeth Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?