Guillen v. Owens et al

Plaintiff: Karl Louis Guillen
Defendant: Dora B. Schriro, Unknown Cioni, Richard Fisher, Terry Stewart, Quincy Owens, Charles Ryan, B Roberts, Deleena Carrillo, Unknown Wilson, D Hatfield, Paula Berger, Stacey Crabtree, W White, D Tuersbuns, Michele Obrien, Cristina Renault, Berry Larson, Unknown Mendoza, J Baca, Unknown Sturm, Shannon Aragon, John Yielding, Unknown Putnam, Unknown Smith and Unknown Hauser
Case Number: 2:2010cv00226
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2012 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 237 Plaintiff's Motion for Change of Judge for Cause with Affidavit. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/15/12.(LAD)
March 2, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 175 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/2/2012.(NVO)
December 5, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 173 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive motion deadline is extended to 12/16/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/2/11.(TLJ)
November 23, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion for Sanctions; denying 150 Motion to Strike. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/23/11.(LAD)
June 27, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Request for Deposition of Defendants Owens, Crabrtree, Berger, Renault and Carrillo, doc. 70, is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave to Conduct Deposition of Defendant Ryan, doc. 67, is DENIED. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/27/11.(LAD)
December 2, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Counts I (in part), II (in part), III (in part), IV, V (in part), VI, and VII and Defendants Stewart, Schriro, Tuerbuns, Sturm, Cioni, Smith, and Hauser are dismissed without prejudice; Defendants Ryan, Crabtree, Baca, Larson, Owens, Wilson, Fisher, Yielding, Berger, O'Brien, Putnam, Roberts, Mendoza, Aragon, Hatfield, Renault, White, and Carrillo must answer Counts I (in part), II (in part), III (in part), and V (in part) 17 ; the Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint 17 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Ryan, Crabtree, Baca, Larson, Owens, Wilson, Fisher, Yielding, Berger, O'Brien, Putnam, Roberts, Mendoza, Arag on, Hatfield, Renault, White, and Carrillo; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 20 days; denying Plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Injunctive Relief; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/29/10. (REW)
August 26, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the 7/2/10 order 14 to the extent set forth below. Plaintiff is granted an additional 30 days from the filing date of this Order in which to file a first amended complaint in complianc e with the July 2, 2010 Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment ofdismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/24/10.(LAD)
April 6, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/5/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillen v. Owens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deleena Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Tuersbuns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Obrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Renault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Louis Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?