Evans v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Amante Gary Evans
Defendant: Joe Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2010cv00952
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's January 24, 2011 Letter (Doc. 12), which the Court has construed as a Motion for Return of Filing Fee, is denied. (See document for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/1/11.(LAD)
August 2, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pla's 2nd 9 Amended Complaint and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for fail ure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/2/10. (LAD)
June 15, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT is dismissed for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/10. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amante Gary Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?