Tran v. Holder et al

Petitioner: Phuong Dien Dang Tran
Respondent: Eric Himpton Holder, Jr., John M Ramirez, Janet A Napolitano and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 2:2010cv01906
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 68 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $14,731.17. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/29/2012.(LFIG)
July 6, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the government's motion to accept late filing (doc. 62). IT IS ORDERED GRANTING petitioner's motion for summary judgment (doc. 56). IT IS ORDERED DENYING the government's motion for reconsideration and f or summary judgment (doc. 59). Our order staying removal proceedings is now vacated. This matter is remanded to CIS for further consideration of petitioner's naturalization application. We acknowledge that CIS is likely to now deny the applicati on under § 1429 and that whether the crime is one ofmoral turpitude will have to be litigated in the removal proceeding with further judicial review in the court of appeals. The clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/6/12.(LAD)
November 9, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 respondent's Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/9/2011.(KAR)
April 25, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Therefore, IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the government's motion for remand(doc. 24). The government shall file with this court no later than June 20, 2011 notice of its decision regarding petitioner's application for naturalization on remand. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/25/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phuong Dien Dang Tran
Represented By: John Martin Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Himpton Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John M Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet A Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?