Landrigan v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Timothy Landrigan
Defendant: Janice K Brewer, Charles L Ryan, Ernest Trujillo, Carson McWilliams and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv02246
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motions to intervene filed by John King, Donald Edward Beaty, and Daniel Wayne Cook (Docs. 27 , 28 & 36 ) are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Daniel Wayne Cook's motion to consolidate cases (Doc. 47 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this case as moot. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/22/10. (SAT)
October 25, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order or a Preliminary Injunction 3 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are enjoined from carrying out Plaintiffs sentence of death until further order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Motion for Reconsideration 12 is DENIED. Defendants shall immediately disclose to Plaintiff the documents provided to the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Seal 17 is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court make immediate telephonic notice of this Order to Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections and Carson McWilliams, Warden of the Arizona State Penitentiary at Florence, and that a copy of this Order be served on these individuals by the United States Marshal forthwith. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/25/10.(MAP)
October 23, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeffrey Timothy Landrigan. The hearing set 10/25/2010 before Judge Silver is VACATED. Signed by Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 10/23/2010. (ROS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landrigan v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Trujillo
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson McWilliams
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Timothy Landrigan
Represented By: Karen M Wilkinson
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stone
Represented By: Sylvia Jeanne Lett
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?