Allen v. Quest Online LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Allen
Defendant: Unknown Klipstein, Bob Carlson, Jim Haney, Unknown Haney, Willard Olauson, Kelly Olauson, Unknown Olauson, Unknown Wexler, Unknown O'Rourke, Eileen O'Rourke, Quest Online LLC, Greg Wexler, Larry O'Rourke, III, 3000AD Incorporated, Derek Smart, Unknown Smart, Rick Hupp, Larry O'Rourke, Jr. and Greg Klipstein
Case Number: 2:2011cv00138
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 197 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint; denying 200 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment; denying 201 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal; denying 204 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel/Strike Answ er to amended complaint and counterclaim; denying 205 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Proper Answers; granting 207 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims; denying 208 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Counterclaims; denying 234 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Debtor's Exam and Related Interrogatories and denying as moot 215 Defendants' Motion for Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/4/12.(LSP)
February 16, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 176 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, Plaintiff is directed to immediately file his proposed Amended Complaint; and denying 186 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/12.(LSP)
January 17, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Awarding Defendants' reasonable attorneys' fees they have incurred in filing a response (Doc. 141 ) to Plaintiff's Motion To Enforce Settlement, (Doc. 132 ). The Court will calculate the reasonable fees to be awarded upon Defe ndants timely compliance with LRCiv. 54.2. FURTHER granting 161 Motion to Seal Declaration. The motion will be granted to the extent that the Declaration (Doc. 150 ) will be placed under seal. The Motion is in all other aspects denied. FURTHER denying 164 Motion for Court to take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/13/12.(MAP)
November 9, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal for Defendant Gregory Wexler; denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 111 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 114 Motion for Rec onsideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice 116 Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff's Abuses of Process and denying as moot 124 Motion to Strike Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff's Abuses of Process. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/9/11.(LSP)
September 22, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - As to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Smart, QOL, and 3000 AD (Doc. 8), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the motion is DENIED as to Counts 1, 2, and 3. Count 3 is denied only with respect to Defendants Smart and QOL; it is granted with respec t to 3000AD. (2) the motion is GRANTED as to Counts 6, 10, 11 and 12. (3) the motion is GRANTED with leave to amend as to Counts 4, 5, 7, 8 and 9. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint with respect t o Counts 5 and 7. If an amended complaint is not filed by October 21, 2011, Counts 4, 5, 7, 8 and 9 will be terminated consistent with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Gregory and Jane Doe Wexler, Wi llard and Jane Doe Olauson, and Kelly and Janis Doe Olauson (Doc. 30) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate these Defendants from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Partial Summary Judgment (Do c. 54) is DENIED as premature in part and moot in part and Defendant Smarts Rule 56 (d) Motion (Doc. 78) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Larry ORourke, III and Jane Doe O'Rourke, Rick Hupp, Greg Klipstein and Jane Doe Klipst ein, Bob Carlson, Jim Haney and Jane Doe Haney, Eileen O'Rourke, Larry O'Rourke, Jr. and Janis Doe O'Rourke will be dismissed 14 days from the date of this Order if Plaintiff fails to show good cause before that date for his failur e to serve the Summons and Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate Defendants Larry O'Rourke, III and Jane Doe O'Rourke, Rick Hupp, Greg Klipstein and Jane Doe Klipstein, Bob Carlson, Jim Haney and Jane Doe Haney, Eileen ORourke, Larry O'Rourke, Jr. and Janis Doe O'Rourke, without further notice, if Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order within the time stated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs other pending motions, includin g Motion to Strike Response and Motion to Seal (Doc. 76 ) and Motion for Order Directing the Preservation of Documents and Things (Doc. 81) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Rule upon Outstanding Motion for Prelimin ary Injunction originally filed in Superior Court (Doc. 80) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, originally filed in Maricopa County Superior Court, is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Response to, or in the alternative, Motion to Strike Plaintiffs supplemental memorandum and request for expedited ruling on his preliminary injunction motion (Doc. 101) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to strike Doc. 89. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/22/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Quest Online LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Klipstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard Olauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Olauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Olauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Online LLC
Represented By: Michael Cajer Mason
Represented By: Laura Lawless Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry O'Rourke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3000AD Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Hupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Klipstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?