National Labor Relations Board v. Arizona, State of

Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Intervenor_defendant: Tyson Petrie, Jeff Phillips, Shawn Riegle, Daniel Rusch, David Santellano, Roy C Smith, Kelvin L Steffen, Johnnie Teller, III, Marco Teran, Steven R Tulloss, Israel Vargas, Harvey Wietting, Raeleen Kasinec, Save Our Secret Ballot, Joyce McClain, Jose Barraza, R Scott Brooks, Jr., Sandra Brown, Dominic T Drobeck, Rafael Barraza, Jamie Franklin, Ahelardo Garcia, Angelo Granata, Justin Helwig, Jose Hernandez, Raul Hernandez, Reyes Inzunza, Derek Kaiser, Enrique Lara, Jr., Benny P Martinez, Gabriel Mendez, Eleuterio Miguel, Chad A Mullenax, Roger S Myllenbeck and Adalberto Pena Parra
Case Number: 2:2011cv00913
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 29:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING the intervenor-defendants' motion for certification (doc. 53 ). IT IS ORDERED DENYING the NLRB's motion for summary judgment (doc. 49 ). IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the intervenor-defendants' motion for summary judgment (doc. 51 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING the State's motion for summary judgment (doc. 54 ). The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/5/2012.(KMG)
January 13, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the parties' 27 stipulation for plaintiff to file a first amended complaint. Plaintiff shall comply with the filing and service requirements of LRCiv 15.1.re 27 . Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/13/12. (DMT)
October 13, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING defendant's motion to dismiss (doc. 6). IT IS ORDERED GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART intervenor-defendants' motion to intervene (doc. 7). The motion to intervene as of right is DENIED. The motion to intervene permissiv ely is GRANTED subject to the following limitations: (1) intervenor defendants may file motions or oppositions to motions only as to those arguments not asserted by defendant. No duplication will be permitted; (2) all discovery is to be shared. Intervenor-defendants shall not duplicate defendant's discovery requests. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/12/2011.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Tyson Petrie
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jeff Phillips
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Shawn Riegle
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Daniel Rusch
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: David Santellano
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Roy C Smith
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Kelvin L Steffen
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Johnnie Teller, III
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Marco Teran
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Steven R Tulloss
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Israel Vargas
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Harvey Wietting
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Raeleen Kasinec
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Save Our Secret Ballot
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Joyce McClain
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jose Barraza
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: R Scott Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Sandra Brown
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Dominic T Drobeck
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Rafael Barraza
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jamie Franklin
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Ahelardo Garcia
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Angelo Granata
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Justin Helwig
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Raul Hernandez
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Reyes Inzunza
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Derek Kaiser
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Enrique Lara, Jr.
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Benny P Martinez
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Gabriel Mendez
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Eleuterio Miguel
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Chad A Mullenax
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Roger S Myllenbeck
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Adalberto Pena Parra
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Represented By: Christina Maria Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Christopher Arthur Munns
Represented By: Michael King Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Abby Propis Simms
Represented By: Eric Gray Moskowitz
Represented By: Mark Glenn Eskenazi
Represented By: Laura Bandini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?