Arizona, State of et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, William Humble and Robert C Halliday
Defendant: Arizona Medical Marijuana Association, Unknown Parties, United States of America, United States Department of Justice, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr., Dennis K Burke, Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated, Joshua Levine, Paula Pennypacker, Jeff Silva, Paula Pollock, Serenity Arizona Incorporated, Holistic Health Management Incorporated, Nicholas Flores and Jane Christensen
Movant: Carl Eric Olsen
Intervenor: Arizona Dispensary Solutions
Case Number: 2:2011cv01072
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 73 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed 1/4/2012, and plaintiffs failure to comply, judgment is entered against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 2/6/2012. (KMG)
January 30, 2012 72 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 12/12/2011, before Judge Susan R Bolton. Court Reporter Elizabeth A Lemke. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2012. (BAS)
January 4, 2012 71 Featured Case ORDER granting the 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed on behalf of all named non-government Defendants by the Arizona Medical Marijuana Association and the 38 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dennis K. Burke, Eric H. Holder, Jr., the United States Department of Justice, and the United States of America and dismissing the Complaint without prejudice; granting Plaintiffs 30 days, including the date of entry of this Order, to file any amended Complaint; denying without prejudice Maricopa County and B. Joy Rich's 31 Motion to Intervene and 60 Motion for Hearing on the Motion to Intervene and for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to the NG Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting Plaintiffs' Motions to Supplement the Record (Docs. 54 , 57 - 58 ). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 01/04/12. (ESL)
January 3, 2012 70 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America for proceedings held on 12/12/2011 before Judge Susan R. Bolton.. (Risner, Scott)
December 30, 2011 69 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 12/12/2011 before Judge Susan Bolton.. (Ray, Kevin)
December 23, 2011 68 *REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa County Planning and Development Department, MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by Intervenor Plaintiffs Maricopa, County of, Joy Rich. (Muthig, Klaus) *Modified to correct event type on 12/28/2011 (SAT).
December 20, 2011 67 NOTICE re Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer . (Ray, Kevin)
December 20, 2011 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Risner, Scott)
December 19, 2011 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa, MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated, Arizona Medical Marijuana Association, Jane Christensen, Nicholas Flores, Holistic Health Management Incorporated, Joshua Levine, Paula Pennypacker, Paula Pollock, Serenity Arizona Incorporated, Jeff Silva. (Edwards, Ezekiel)
December 16, 2011 64 NOTICE re Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to File a Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Arizona, State of . (Ray, Kevin)
December 15, 2011 63 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated, Arizona Medical Marijuana Association, Jane Christensen, Nicholas Flores, Holistic Health Management Incorporated, Joshua Levine, Paula Pennypacker, Paula Pollock, Serenity Arizona Incorporated, Jeff Silva for proceedings held on 12/12/11 before Judge Hon. Susan R. Bolton.. (Edwards, Ezekiel)
December 14, 2011 62 *ERRATA re 60 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Maricopa, County of, Joy Rich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Notice of Errata)(Liddy, Thomas) *Modified to correct event type on 12/19/2011 (SAT).
December 14, 2011 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Liddy on behalf of Maricopa, County of, Joy Rich (Liddy, Thomas)
December 14, 2011 60 *MOTION for Hearing on Motion re 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa County Planning and Development Department, MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by Maricopa, County of, Joy Rich. (Liddy, Thomas). *Modified to add motion type on 12/19/2011 (SAT).
December 12, 2011 59 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2011 re: non-Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim 30 . Argument presented. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement non-Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim 30 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all fictitious defendants are dismissed. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke)(MAW)
November 28, 2011 58 Third MOTION to Supplement the Record by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Davis, Lori)
November 21, 2011 57 Second MOTION to Supplement the Record by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Davis, Lori)
October 18, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER, Upon consideration of the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for a Continuance of the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, and good cause having been shown, this Court hereby ORDERS that: The Motion is GRANTED, and the Motion Hearing is reset for December 12, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. (Doc. 55). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/18/2011.(KMG)
October 18, 2011 55 MOTION to Continue Continuance of Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated, Arizona Medical Marijuana Association, Jane Christensen, Nicholas Flores, Holistic Health Management Incorporated, Joshua Levine, Paula Pennypacker, Paula Pollock, Serenity Arizona Incorporated, Jeff Silva. (Edwards, Ezekiel)
October 18, 2011 54 MOTION to Supplement the Record by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Davis, Lori)
October 12, 2011 53 Minute Order: Set Motion Hearing as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of all named non-government defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 at 03:00PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
October 4, 2011 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Risner, Scott)
September 12, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER that the parties' 50 Stipulation is granted, and Federal Defendants may file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss on or before 10/07/11. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/12/11. (ESL)
September 9, 2011 50 STIPULATION and Request for an Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Risner, Scott)
August 31, 2011 49 RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Davis, Lori)
August 26, 2011 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of all named non-government defendants filed by Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated, Arizona Medical Marijuana Association, Jane Christensen, Nicholas Flores, Holistic Health Management Incorporated, Joshua Levine, Paula Pennypacker, Paula Pollock, Serenity Arizona Incorporated, Jeff Silva. (Edwards, Ezekiel)
August 15, 2011 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa County Planning and Development Department Maricopa County Intervenors' Reply in Support of Moton for Leave to Intervene filed by Maricopa, County of, Joy Rich. (Liddy, Thomas)
August 10, 2011 46 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of all named non-government defendants filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(KMG)
August 10, 2011 45 Featured Case ORDER re 43 that Plaintiffs may file a Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss that totals twenty-one (21) pages, excluding the signature block and certificate of service. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/9/2011.(KMG)
August 9, 2011 44 LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of all named non-government defendants, 43 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Davis, Lori)
August 9, 2011 43 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Davis, Lori)
August 9, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER denying 40 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. Counsel has failed to indicate in the motion the number of pages requested and has failed to comply with ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II (G), specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/9/11.(MAW)
August 8, 2011 41 LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of all named non-government defendants, 40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Davis, Lori)
August 8, 2011 40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Davis, Lori)
August 3, 2011 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa County Planning and Development Department filed by Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Risner, Scott)
August 1, 2011 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Risner, Scott)
August 1, 2011 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Risner on behalf of Dennis K Burke, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, United States of America (Risner, Scott)
July 27, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 27, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX112075 as to Ezekiel Edwards. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 27, 2011 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ezekiel Edwards on behalf of Arizona Medical Marijuana Association. (BAS)
July 27, 2011 34 RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa County Planning and Development Department filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin)
July 27, 2011 33 *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Scott Matthew Michelman (Michelman, Scott) *Modified on 7/28/2011; document not in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(a)* (REW).
July 22, 2011 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Pochoda on behalf of Arizona Medical Marijuana Association (Pochoda, Daniel)
July 14, 2011 31 MOTION to Intervene Motion for Leave to Intervene as Co-Plaintiffs by: A. Maricopa County; and B. Joy Rich in her official capacity as Assistant County Manager and Director of Maricopa County Planning and Development Department by Maricopa, County of, Joy Rich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 of 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Liddy, Thomas)
July 11, 2011 Notice of request for e-notices by Barry H. Uhrman. (Uhrman, Barry)
July 7, 2011 30 * MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on behalf of all named non-government defendants by Arizona Medical Marijuana Association. (Michelman, Scott)*Entry modified to lack of jurisdiction on 7/7/2011 (ESL).
July 6, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER denying the 6 Motion to Intervene filed by Carl Eric Olsen. It is further ordered denying as moot Carl Eric Olsen's 23 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. It is further ordered denying the 7 Motion to Intervene filed by Arizona Dispensary Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/06/11.(ESL)
June 28, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 28, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX111049 as to Scott Michelman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 27, 2011 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Scott Michelman on behalf of Arizona Medical Marijuana Association. (BAS)
June 23, 2011 26 REPLY to Response to Motion (Titled: Response to Objection) re 6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Carl Eric Olsen. (ESL)
June 17, 2011 25 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin)
June 17, 2011 24 RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin)
June 16, 2011 23 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Carl Eric Olsen. (REW)
June 15, 2011 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Arizona Medical Marijuana Association waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Jeff Silva waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Holistic Health Management Incorporated waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Serenity Arizona Incorporated waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Paula Pollock waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Jane Christensen waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Nicholas Flores waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Paula Pennypacker waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer. Joshua Levine waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Dennis K. Burke on June 2, 2011, filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin)
June 15, 2011 12 *AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney FOR Eric H. Holder, Jr, on June 2, 2011, filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin) *Modified on 6/16/2011; to reflect service on US Attorney* (REW).
June 15, 2011 11 *AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney FOR United States Department of Justice on June 2, 2011, filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin) *Modified on 6/16/2011; to reflect service on US Attorney* (REW).
June 15, 2011 10 *AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on US Attorney FOR United States of America on June 2, 2011, filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble. (Ray, Kevin) *Modified on 6/16/2011; to reflect service upon US Attorney* (REW).
June 15, 2011 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated. Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated waiver sent on 6/1/2011. (Dean, Thomas)
June 15, 2011 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W Dean on behalf of Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated (Dean, Thomas)
June 6, 2011 7 MOTION to Intervene by Arizona Dispensary Solutions. (LAD)
June 3, 2011 6 MOTION to Intervene by Carl Eric Olsen. (ESL)
May 31, 2011 5 Summons Issued as to Jeff Silva. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 27, 2011 4 Summons Issued as to Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated, Arizona Medical Marijuana Association, Dennis K Burke, Jane Christensen, Nicholas Flores, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Holistic Health Management Incorporated, Joshua Levine, Paula Pennypacker, Paula Pollock, Serenity Arizona Incorporated, Jeff Silva, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 27, 2011 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-5377792. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-01072-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
May 27, 2011 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, Robert C Halliday, William Humble (submitted by Kevin Ray). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(REK)
May 27, 2011 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-5377792, filed by Arizona, State of, Robert C Halliday, William Humble, Janice K Brewer (submitted by Kevin Ray). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona, State of et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Medical Marijuana Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Himpton Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis K Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Association of Dispensary Professionals Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas W Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Pennypacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serenity Arizona Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holistic Health Management Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Carl Eric Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arizona Dispensary Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Represented By: Lori Simpson Davis
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Lori Simpson Davis
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Humble
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Represented By: Lori Simpson Davis
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Halliday
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Represented By: Lori Simpson Davis
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?