West et al v. Brewer et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Paul West, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Theodore Washington and Todd Smith
Defendant: Janice K Brewer, Charles L Ryan, Ernest Trujillo, Carson McWilliams and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv01409
Filed: July 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2013 Filing 125 MANDATE of USCA, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is dismissed; each party shall bear its own costs on appeal, re: 12-15009 #114 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 NDA) (copies sent to all parties by Ninth Circuit)(REW)
February 28, 2012 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #114 Notice of Appeal. (VAR)
February 13, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial Day Three for dates of 12/7/2011, before Judge Neil V. Wake, re #114 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2012. (VAR)
February 13, 2012 Filing 122 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial Day One for dates of 12/5/2011, before Judge Neil V. Wake, re #114 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2012. (VAR)
February 13, 2012 Filing 121 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing for dates of 9/2/2011, before Judge Neil V. Wake, re #114 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2012. (VAR)
January 12, 2012 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington for proceedings held on 8/3/11, 9/2/11, 11/15/11, 11/22/11, 12/5/11, 12/6/11, 12/7/11 before Judge Wake, (Konrad, Robin)
January 12, 2012 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington for proceedings held on 09/02/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Konrad, Robin)
January 12, 2012 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington for proceedings held on 12/05/2011, 12/07/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Konrad, Robin)
January 11, 2012 Filing 117 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial Day 1 of Proceedings Partial Transcript - Testimony of Charles L Ryan held on 12/05/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2012. (BAS)
January 11, 2012 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 12/05/2011 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Zick, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2012 Filing 115 Ninth Circuit Case Number 12-15009 for #114 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
December 30, 2011 Filing 114 *NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #112 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, #113 Clerk's Judgment by Thomas Paul West, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Baich, Dale) *Modified to add filer on 1/5/2012* (REW).
December 21, 2011 Filing 113 CLERK'S JUDGMENT, that pursuant to the Court's order filed December 21, 2011, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed. (DMT)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER - Based on the foregoing findings of fact and conclusions of law, It Is Ordered that the Clerk of Court enter final judgment against Plaintiffs Thomas Paul West, et al., and in favor of Defendants, Janice K. Brewer, et al. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/21/11. (DMT)
December 12, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial Day 3 of Proceedings - Closing Arguments held on 12/07/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2012. (BAS)
December 12, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial Day 2 of Proceedings held on 12/06/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2012. (BAS)
December 12, 2011 Filing 109 SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings on 12/6/11. (MAP)
December 8, 2011 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 12/07/2011 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Zick, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2011 Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER re: Exhibits returned to respective counsel to retain until case has been completely terminated, including all appeals. (DMT)
December 7, 2011 Filing 107 Witness List by defendants. (DMT)
December 7, 2011 Filing 106 Witness List by plaintiffs(DMT)
December 7, 2011 Filing 105 Exhibit List by defendants(DMT)
December 7, 2011 Filing 104 Exhibit List by plainitffs. (DMT)
December 7, 2011 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Bench Trial completed on 12/7/2011. The Court takes the matter under advisement. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) (NKS)
December 6, 2011 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Bench Trial (Day Two) held on 12/06/11. Trial continues on 12/07/11 at 9:00 a.m. See minutes for details. (Court Reporters Laurie Adams & Merilyn Sanchez.) (NKS)
December 6, 2011 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 12/06/2011 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Zick, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2011 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Bench Trial (Day One) begun on 12/05/11. The Defendants' #97 Notice of Unavailability of a Witness is treated as a motion, and the Court will grant the request. Trial continues on 12/06/11 at 9:00 a.m. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) (NKS)
December 3, 2011 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington for proceedings held on 12/06/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Konrad, Robin)
December 2, 2011 Filing 97 * NOTICE re Unavailability of Witness by Janice K Brewer, Charles L Ryan, Ernest Trujillo, Carson McWilliams . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to Notice)(Zick, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/5/2011 (LAD). * Docket text modified to add filers in addition to Janice K Brewer.
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: Plaintiffs' #95 motion to continue trial date and motion for settlement conference is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/30/11. (NKS)
November 29, 2011 Filing 95 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Motion for Settlement Conference by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Baich, Dale)
November 28, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE re Information for Court Reporter by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington . (Konrad, Robin)
November 28, 2011 Filing 93 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' #92 Motion to Withdraw Request for Protective Order is granted, and Defendants' #78 Motion to Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Certain Conditions of Confidentiality is withdrawn. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 28, 2011 Filing 92 MOTION to Withdraw #78 MOTION Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality by Janice K Brewer. (Zick, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2011 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #78 MOTION Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality , #87 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality filed by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Baich, Dale)
November 23, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 11/22/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Merilyn A Sanchez. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2012. (BAS)
November 22, 2011 Filing 89 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' #87 Motion to Supplement is granted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 22, 2011 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 11/22/2011 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Zick, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2011 Filing 87 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality by Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B to Supplement)(Zick, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Approved at 11/22/11 Resumed Final Pretrial Conference. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/22/11. (NKS)
November 22, 2011 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington for proceedings held on 11/22/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Konrad, Robin)
November 22, 2011 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Resumed Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/22/2011. The Defendants' #57 Motion to Dismiss Claim as Moot and Motion to Preclude Testimony is denied. The Defendants' #63 Motion to Vacate Bench Trial is denied for the reasons stated on the record. The Court approves the parties' #83 Joint Amended Proposed Final Pretrial Order. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) (NKS)
November 21, 2011 Filing 83 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint Amended) by Janice K Brewer, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Carson McWilliams, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Parties, Theodore Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Konrad, Robin)
November 21, 2011 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality filed by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Baich, Dale)
November 21, 2011 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION to Vacate Bench Trial filed by Janice K Brewer. (Zick, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2011 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Vacate Bench Trial filed by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Baich, Dale)
November 18, 2011 Filing 79 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs respond by noon on November 23, 2011, to Defendants' #78 Motion to Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 18, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION Permit Expert Rebuttal Witness to Testify Under Conditions of Confidentiality by Janice K Brewer. (Todd, John)
November 17, 2011 Filing 77 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having received a written request from the Office of the Federal Public Defender seeking permission for attorneys' David Sepanik and Flora Vigo from the law firm of O'Melveny & Myers to appear telephonically for the 11/22/11 resumed Final Pretrial Conference, ORDERED granting the parties' request. Counsel are directed to call the Court at (602) 322-7640 on one conjoined phone call approximately 5 minutes prior to the start of the proceeding. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 17, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 11/15/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Merilyn A Sanchez. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2012. (BAS)
November 16, 2011 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington for proceedings held on 11/15/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Konrad, Robin)
November 16, 2011 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 11/15/2011 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Zick, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2011 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/15/2011. The Defendants' #58 Motion to Permit Testimony of Medical Team Leader to be Taken by Videoconferencing is discussed. The Court denies the motion with exception(s) as stated on the record. Resumed Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/11 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) (NKS)
November 10, 2011 Filing 72 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT and Conclusions of Law by Defendant Janice K Brewer. (Todd, John)
November 10, 2011 Filing 71 TRIAL BRIEF on All Contested Issues of Law by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Baich, Dale)
November 10, 2011 Filing 70 Proposed Findings of Fact by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Baich, Dale)
November 10, 2011 Filing 69 Respondent's BRIEF by Janice K Brewer on Contested Issues of Law. (Todd, John)
November 9, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 08/03/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2012. (BAS)
November 9, 2011 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West for proceedings held on August 3, 2011 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Konrad, Robin)
November 8, 2011 Filing 66 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' #65 Joint Application for Leave to Submit Modified Form of Proposed Pre-Trial Order or Leave for Additional Time to Submit Corrected Form of Proposed Pre-Trial Order, ORDERED that the parties may submit their charts regarding contested/uncontested facts as requested in their motion. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 8, 2011 Filing 65 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #64 Lodged Proposed Document, by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konrad, Robin)
November 8, 2011 Filing 64 *Proposed (Joint) Final Pretrial Order. Filed by Janice K Brewer, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Carson McWilliams, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Parties, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Konrad, Robin) Modified on 11/9/2011 from Lodged Proposed Document (DMT).
November 8, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION to Vacate Bench Trial by Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Fact Chart with Defendants' Responses)(Todd, John)
November 8, 2011 Filing 62 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' #60 Joint Stipulated Request for Additional Time, ORDERED granting the aforementioned stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have up to and including 11/10/11 at 4:00 PM (Arizona time) to lodge with the Court their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, a short trial brief on all contested issues of law from each party, and their deposition transcript designations. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 8, 2011 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Permit Testimony of Medical Team Leader to be Taken by Videoconferencing filed by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Baich, Dale)
November 8, 2011 Filing 60 STIPULATION /Joint Stipulated Request for Additional Time by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konrad, Robin)
November 7, 2011 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims as Moot and Motion to Preclude Testimony filed by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-16)(Baich, Dale)
November 1, 2011 Filing 58 *MOTION to Permit Testimony of Medical Team Leader to be Taken by Videoconferencing by Janice K Brewer, Ernest Trujillo, Carson McWilliams, Charles L Ryan. (Done, Julie) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 11/2/2011 (CMAL).
November 1, 2011 Filing 57 *MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims as Moot and Motion to Preclude Testimony by Janice K Brewer, Ernest Trujillo, Carson McWilliams, Charles L Ryan. (Done, Julie) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 11/2/2011 (CMAL).
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Stipulated Motion for Privacy Act and Protective Order. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/31/11. (NKS)
October 28, 2011 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baich, Dale)
October 14, 2011 Filing 54 TEXT ONLY ORDER: On the Court's own motion, with no objection from counsel, ORDERED resetting the Bench Trial from 12/06/11 to 12/05/11 (one day earlier) at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 13, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Ann Done on behalf of Janice K Brewer, Carson McWilliams, Charles L Ryan, Ernest Trujillo (Done, Julie)
September 16, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE re Service of ESI Discovery of Unredacted Documents Pursuant to Court's Order by Janice K Brewer . (Zick, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2011 Filing 51 NOTICE re Service of Defendants' Confidential Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories by Janice K Brewer . (Zick, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE re of Service of Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosure by Janice K Brewer . (Zick, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 13, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX113508 as to David J Sepanik. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX113507 as to Flora F Vigo. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 12, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David J Sepanik on behalf of plaintiffs Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, and Thomas Paul West. (BAS)
September 12, 2011 Filing 47 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Flora F Vigo on behalf of plaintiffs Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, and Thomas Paul West. (BAS)
September 12, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by John Pressley Todd on behalf of Charles L Ryan (Todd, John)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2011. Final Pretrial Conference continued from 10/07/11 to 11/15/11 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Bench Trial continued from 10/11/11 to 12/06/11 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 504 before Judge Neil V Wake. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/8/11. (NKS)
September 6, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE re Service of Defendants' Confidential Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Janice K Brewer . (Zick, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2011 Filing 43 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Telephonic Conference held on 9/2/2011. Appearances: Dale Baich for Plaintiffs; Jeffrey Zink for Defendants. Staff Attorney Kristine Fox is also present. Discussion is held. The Court orders Defendants time to respond to the discovery requests extended to 09/16/11. The issue of rescheduling the 10/11/11 Bench Trial is taken under advisement at this time. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
September 2, 2011 Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having been contacted by counsel and informed that it may need an extension regarding the disclosures in this matter, ORDERED setting a Telephonic Conference for 09/02/11 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. The parties are directed to call the Court on one conjoined phone call at (602) 322-7640 approximately 5 minutes prior to the start of the proceeding. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
August 31, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE re Service of Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Baich, Dale)
August 24, 2011 Filing 40 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by Janice K Brewer, (all defendants).(Zick, Jeffrey) *Modified on 8/25/2011 to add text* (DMT).
August 24, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE re Service of Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production by Janice K Brewer. (Zick, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE re Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Charles L Ryan. (Bass, Jonathan)
August 10, 2011 Filing 37 MANDATE of USCA, DENIED as to #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 order, #3 order, #4 order, #5 notice of docket activity)(TLJ)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Stipulation for Proposed Protective Order. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/10/11. (NKS)
August 9, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Proposed Protective Order by Janice K Brewer, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Carson McWilliams, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Parties, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baich, Dale)
August 8, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE re Service of Initial rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure to Plaintiffs by Janice K Brewer. (Zick, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE re Service of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Baich, Dale)
August 8, 2011 Filing 32 * STIPULATION for Proposed Protective Order by Janice K Brewer, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Carson McWilliams, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Parties, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Baich, Dale) Modified on 8/9/2011 (LAD). * Document filed in error. Document is a proposed order. Attorney noticed to refile with correct PDF document.
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/16/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/4/11. (NKS)
August 4, 2011 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Janice K Brewer, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Carson McWilliams, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Parties, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Konrad, Robin)
August 3, 2011 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE, INJUNCTIVE, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF [42 U.S.C. 1983] against All Defendants, filed by Todd Smith, Charles M Hedlund, Gregory Dickens, Robert Wayne Murray, Thomas Paul West, Theodore Washington. (Attachments: #1 Comparison of Original and Amended Complaints)(Baich, Dale)
August 3, 2011 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Scheduling Conference held on 8/3/2011. Appearances: Dale Baich, Robin Conrad, and Cary Sandman for Plaintiffs; Jeffrey Zick for Defendants. Discussion is held regarding the parties' #27 Joint Scheduling Order. Trial schedule discussed. The Court directs counsel to submit a proposed form or order outlining the details discussed at today's hearing. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
August 2, 2011 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Janice K Brewer, Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Carson McWilliams, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Parties, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Baich, Dale)
August 1, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cary Sandman on behalf of Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West (Sandman, Cary)
July 22, 2011 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Case Management Plan, ORDERED granting the motion. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have up to and including 08/02/11 to file their joint Case Management Plan. The joint Case Managment Plan will need to be filed by 12:00 PM on 08/02/11. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 22, 2011 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File The Joint Case Management Plan by Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zick, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2011 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 350.00 receipt number 0970-5605605 (Baich, Dale)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - (1) Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiffs must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or each file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. (2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #11 is DENIED. (3) The parties shall confer as set forth herein and jointly file their Case Management Plan no later than July 29, 2011. (4) A scheduling conference will be held on Wednesday, August 3, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 504, Sandra Day OConnor United States Courthouse. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/20/11. (LAD)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of USCA, denying Appellant's Emergency Motion for an Injunction, re: 11-16707 #16 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
July 18, 2011 Filing 21 Ninth Circuit Case Number 11-16707 for #16 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
July 18, 2011 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #16 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RETRAINING ORDER OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. ORDERED denying #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction FURTHER ORDERED granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/18/11. (MAP)
July 17, 2011 Filing 17 Appeal Document by Thomas Paul West re #16 Notice of Appeal Notice of Related Case. (Baich, Dale)
July 17, 2011 Filing 16 *NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for TRO by Thomas Paul West. (Baich, Dale) *Modified to remove non-filers on 7/18/2011* (REW).
July 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 *AMENDED By Doc. #18 *ORDER granting Plaintiff West's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2); denying Plaintiff West's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 3). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/17/11.(CAD) *Modified on 7/18/2011 (MAP)*.
July 17, 2011 Filing 14 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #13 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit O through R)(Baich, Dale)
July 17, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Charles L Ryan, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Baich, Dale)
July 17, 2011 Filing 12 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re #11 Answer by Defendant Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Bass, Jonathan) * Modified on 7/18/2011 to correct document linkage* (DMT).
July 17, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Janice K Brewer, Ernest Trujillo, Carson McWilliams, Charles L. Ryan, Unknown Parties .(Bass, Jonathan) *Modified on 7/18/2011 to add additional filers* (DMT).
July 17, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Zick on behalf of Janice K Brewer (Zick, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent E Cattani on behalf of Janice K Brewer (Cattani, Kent)
July 17, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan William Bass on behalf of Janice K Brewer (Bass, Jonathan)
July 17, 2011 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Baich, Dale)
July 16, 2011 Filing 19 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas Paul West (submitted by Dale Baich). (REK)
July 16, 2011 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Janice K Brewer, Carson McWilliams, Charles L Ryan, Ernest Trujillo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(CAD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 16, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (CAD)
July 16, 2011 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Dickens, Charles M Hedlund, Robert Wayne Murray, Todd Smith, Theodore Washington, Thomas Paul West. (Submitted by Dale Baich) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(CAD)
July 16, 2011 Filing 3 *MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Thomas Paul West. (Submitted by Dale Baich) (CAD) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/18/2011) (CMAL). *Modified to correct document header; NEF regenerated on 7/18/2011 (CMAL).
July 16, 2011 Filing 2 *MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Paul West. (Submitted by Dale Baich) (CAD) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/18/2011) (CMAL). *Modified to correct document header; NEF regenerated on 7/18/2011 (CMAL).
July 16, 2011 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT (TRO Requested)filed by Todd Smith, Charles M Hedlund, Gregory Dickens, Robert Wayne Murray, Thomas Paul West, Theodore Washington. (Submitted by Dale Baich) (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CAD) (Main Document 1, Attachment 1, Attachment 2, Attachment 3 replaced on 7/18/2011) (CMAL). *Modified to correct document header; NEF regenerated on 7/18/2011 (CMAL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Paul West
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Dale A Baich - Inactive
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Dickens
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Dale A Baich - Inactive
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M Hedlund
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Dale A Baich - Inactive
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wayne Murray
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Dale A Baich - Inactive
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Washington
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Dale A Baich - Inactive
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Smith
Represented By: David J Sepanik
Represented By: Flora F Vigo
Represented By: Cary Sandman
Represented By: Dale A Baich - Inactive
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Julie Ann Done
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Julie Ann Done
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Trujillo
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Julie Ann Done
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson McWilliams
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Julie Ann Done
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?