Rigsby v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Earl Rigsby
Defendant: Arizona, State of, Janet A Napolitano, Janice K Brewer, Terry L Goddard, Thomas C Horne, Dora B Schriro, Charles L Ryan, Robert Stewart, Unknown Parties, Anne Reeder, D Golder, L Garner and Janet F Tabor
Case Number: 2:2011cv01696
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 157 Report and Recommendation, Defendants Anne Reeder and Dora B Schriro are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/13/14. (LSP)
September 5, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's 116 Motion for TRO and a Preliminary Injunction, and it is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/4/2013.(LFIG)
March 28, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's "Motion for a TRO and a Preliminary Injunction with a Request for Three Judge Court and Ultimate Prisoner Release Order" (Doc. 60 ), and it is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/13. (LAD)
January 2, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - Plaintiff's September 21, 2012 Motion to Enlarge Time (Doc. 55) is granted; the Court will consider Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint as timely filed. Plaintiff's October 5, 2012 "Motion for Court Orde r to Renew or Reconsider Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction and the Memo of Law in Support Thereof and Appendix of Exhibits/Motion for Counsel" (Doc. 56) is denied without prejudice. Counts Two and Three of the Third Am ended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Brewer, Napolitano, Horne, Goddard, Johnson, Rollins, Tabor, Paralegal Assistant Unknown, Golder, Garner, Russo, Mendoza, Arbitia, Dassel, Snyder, Capati, Mead, Wilson, Stevwing, Ulibarri, Unknown Security Officers at ASPC-Lewis Barchey Blue Unit and ASPC-Tucson Cimarron and Santa Rita Units, and Unknown Security Officers in the ASPC-Tucson Santa Rita Unit Clothing Room, are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 57), the Supplement (Doc. 58) this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Schriro, Ryan, ASPC-Lewis Warden Unknown, Reeder, Walker, Davenport, Jac obs, Bock, and Bradley. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/2/13. (LAD)
March 6, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; the Court will grant Plaintiff a 30-day (rather than 45-day) extension of time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/12.(TLJ)
January 31, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate (Doc. 7) is denied. (2) Plaintiff's "Petition for Writ of Prohibition" (Doc. 14) is denied. (3) Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first am ended complaint in compliance with the September 8, 2011 Order and this Order. (4) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. (See document for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/31/12.(LAD)
November 1, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Plaintiff's Writ of Prohibition and Request for Appropriate Sanctions. Within 20 days from the filing date of this Order, Defendants must file a response to Plaintiff's Motion 7 . Within 10 days from the filing date of Defendant's response, Plaintiff may file a reply. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time 9 is granted. Plaintiff has 30 days from the time that the Court rules on his Motion to Vacate 7 within which to file a first amended complaint that complies with the Court's 9/8/11 Order 6 . If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/1/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Earl Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet A Napolitano
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L Goddard
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C Horne
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stewart
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Reeder
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Golder
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Garner
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet F Tabor
Represented By: Terrence E Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?