Aros v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Armando Roberto Aros
Defendant: Unknown King, Unknown Savio, Jeffrey Freeland, Byron McDonald, Marvin Shatto, Unknown Valenzuela, Unknown Weisheit, Charles L Ryan, George Herman, Stacey Crabtree, Marvin Jump, Lance R Hetmer, Blanca Ochoa and Unknown Trevino
Case Number: 2:2011cv02565
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, doc. 216 , is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, doc. 217 , is GRANTED in part. The motion is granted in that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a resp onse to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is extended by thirty days. Plaintiff's response must be filed no later than July 23, 2014. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/26/2014.(KMG)
June 12, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint, and Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend Deadlines, 193 and 194 , are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/12/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)
March 11, 2014 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 143 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and to Recalibrate the Deadline for Responding to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/11/2014.(ALS)
January 27, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/27/2014.(ALS)
May 28, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Counts Two through Twelve and Count Fourteen are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Ryan, Herman, Freeland, McDonald, Shatto, Ramos, Valenzuela, Weisheit, Velasco, Cardenas, Dodds, and Plausner are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff sh all serve his Third Amended Complaint on Defendants Savio, Ochoa, Hetmer, Jump, Crabtree, King, Trevino, Heet, and Trujillo by sending a copy to their attorney, along with a copy of this Order. This matter is again referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/28/13. (TLJ)
September 7, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/7/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aros v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Savio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Shatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Weisheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance R Hetmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Roberto Aros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?