Gawlik v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Brian Gawlik
Defendant: Delinda Hayes, Unknown Hayes, Arizona, State of, Arizona Department of Corrections, Jeffrey Annis, Unknown Annis, Unknown Duron, Unknown Spouse Duron, Unknown Barden, Unknown Spouse Barden, Ernest Trujillo, Unknown Trujillo, Edwin Lao, Unknown Lao, Unknown Halstead, Unknown Spouse Halstead, Unknown Waits, Unknown Spouse Waits, Arizona State Prison Complex, Florence and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01946
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) The State is dismissed as to Count I; (b) Count II is dismissed; (c) Defendants Trujillo, Lao, Duran, Barden, Halstead, Waits, and Hayes are dismissed; (d) Claims for punitive damages against the State are dismissed; (e) Count VIII for false imprisonment is dismissed; (f) The individual Defendants are dismissed from Counts III through VII; (g) Defendant Curran is dismissed without prejud ice; and (h) The Motion is denied as to the claims for battery and intentional infliction of emotional distress and denied without prejudice as to exhaustion of remedies on the remaining federal claims. (3) Defendants Anniss Motion to Dismiss (Doc. [ 24]) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) denied without prejudice as to dismissal for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; (b) granted as to dismissal of Count II, granted as to his dismissal from the state law claims. (4) The remaining claims are: (a) Count I against Annis for assault, pursuant to § 1983; and (b) Counts III through VII against the State of Arizona. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/30/13. (LAD)
April 25, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Stipulation and extending the deadline for Defendant Annis to file his reply in support of his Motion to Dismiss until April 24, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/24/13. (LAD)
January 31, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4). (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4) is granted in part; all claims in Count I other than the claim for assault are dismiss ed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. (3) Within 15 days of the date of this Order, Defendants must file additional briefing with supporting documentation on the issue of exhaustion of administrative remedies on the assault claim in Count I and the claims in Count II. Plaintiff may file a response within 15 days of Defendants' additional briefing, and Defendants may file a reply within 10 days of Plaintiff's response. (4) The Clerk of Court must ensure that the docket reflects that the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4) is still pending. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/31/13. (LAD)
October 24, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/24/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gawlik v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delinda Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Annis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Annis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse Barden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Trujillo
Represented By: Joseph Dean Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona State Prison Complex, Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gawlik
Represented By: Melinda Mae Sloma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?