Miller v. Aguillar et al

Plaintiff: William Earl Miller
Defendant: David Aguillar and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv02321
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution 46 is granted; all remaining motions are denied as moot; this action is dismissed without prejudice; the Clerk must enter judgment accordinglyp; for the reasons set forth in this order, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), an appeal from the judgment in this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/18/14. (REW)
April 25, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of William Miller. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/22/13. (REW)
December 20, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Court orders pursuant to Rule 41(b). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/20/12. (LAD)
November 21, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of William Miller. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/21/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Aguillar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Earl Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Aguillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?