Western Watersheds Project et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management

Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project and Sierra Club
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 2:2013cv01028
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 36 is granted to the extent that the case will be remanded to Bureau of Land Management. It is otherwise denied without prejudice to renewal. Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 49 is denied without prejudice to renewal. This case is remanded to the Bureau of Land Management for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Bureau of Land Management shall file a supplemental report by 4/24/2015. Status Hearing is set for 5/18/2015 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Rosenblatt. The parties shall file a joint status report at least fourteen days before the Status Hearing. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/26/2015.(LMR)
March 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to File Amicus Curiae. The ACGA may file an amicus curiae brief in support of neither party, no longer than 17 pages, by 4/4/2014. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/11/2014.(LMR)
November 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment no later than March 28, 2014. See PDF document for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/18/13.(LSP)
September 16, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference, or in the Alternative, to Appear Telephonically. Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2013 is vacated. Defendant shall lodge the Administrative Record in electronic form no later than 11/27/2013. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment no later than 2/28/2014. See order for additional case management deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/16/2013.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Lauren M Rule
Represented By: Erik Bowers Ryberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Lauren M Rule
Represented By: Erik Bowers Ryberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?