Schad v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Edward Harold Schad, Jr.
Defendant: Brian Livingston, Scott Smith, Janice K Brewer, Jack Lasota, Ellen Kirschbaum and Donna Harris
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert Glen Jones, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01962
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Plaintiffs' Rule 59 Motion for Reconsideration of order denying preliminary injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 10/4/2013.(ROS, kb)
October 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion for TRO; granting 14 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss Motion for TRO. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 10/1/2013.(ROS, kb)
September 27, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or a Preliminary Injunction no later than 9:00 a.m. on Monday, September 30, 2013. Defendants' response should be accompanied by the appro priate affidavits and should indicate whether Defendants are willing to reschedule Plaintiff's reprieve/commutation hearing for a date later than October 2, 2013, but prior to October 9, 2013. The response should also indicate which Defendants are available to testify on September 30, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. No reply is permitted absent further order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's motion will be held on Monday, September 30, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6 04. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall forthwith email a copy of this Order as well as Plaintiffs Complaint for Equitable, Injunctive and Declaratory Relief (Doc. 1) and Plaintiff' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or a Prelimin ary Injunction (Doc. 6 ), to Joseph Sciarrotta, Jr., General Counsel, Office of the Governor; Kelly Gillilan-Gibson, Assistant Arizona Attorney General, Arizona Board of Executive Clemency; and Brian Luse, Assistant Arizona Attorney General, Arizona Board of Executive Clemency. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/27/13. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schad v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Livingston
Represented By: Kelly Elaine Gillilan-Gibson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Represented By: Kelly Elaine Gillilan-Gibson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Kelly Elaine Gillilan-Gibson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Lasota
Represented By: Kelly Elaine Gillilan-Gibson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Kirschbaum
Represented By: Kelly Elaine Gillilan-Gibson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Harris
Represented By: Kelly Elaine Gillilan-Gibson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Luse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Harold Schad, Jr.
Represented By: Denise I Young
Represented By: Kelley J Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert Glen Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Dale A Baich(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Represented By: Timothy Michael Gabrielsen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stone(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?