Francois v. Beers et al

Defendant: John M Ramirez, Alejandro Mayorkas, Rand Beers, John Sandweg, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr. and Unknown Parties
Plaintiff: Sabina Carol Francois
Case Number: 2:2013cv01964
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/2/2014.(LMR)
May 20, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/20/2014.(LMR)
May 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/12/2014.(LMR)
April 22, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 26 Defendant's Motion to Hold Plaintiff's Cross-Motion in Abeyance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this action. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/21/2014.(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. Beers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rand Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sandweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Himpton Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabina Carol Francois
Represented By: Maria Bettwy Wolfinger(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?