Johnson v. Brady et al

Plaintiff: Derrick Johnson
Defendant: Robert Brady, Jesse Newton, Tony Rogers, Samuel Vederman, La Paz, County of, Quartzsite, Town of and La Paz County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 2:2014cv01875
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP status is revoked for this appeal. The Clerk shall transmit this order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (re: 9CCA 16-15420) Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2016. (REK)
February 16, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. This action is dismissed without prejudice. 2. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 78 ) and Plaintiff's motions to stay (Docs. 85 , 88 ) are denied as moot. 3. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter and enter judgment accordingly. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/16/16. (LAD)
October 23, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' motion for entry of final judgment (Doc. 69 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/23/2015. (REK)
June 17, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants Vederman, La Paz County, and Puchek's motions to dismiss (Docs. 49 , 50 ) are granted. Defendants Brady, Newton, and Town of Quartzsite's motion to dismiss (Doc. 51 ) is granted in part. Defendants Brady, Newton, and Town of Quartzsite's motion to extend time to answer (Doc. 52 ) is granted. Plaintiff's motions to strike and compel (Docs. 57 , 64 ) are denied. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Vederman, Rogers, Puchek, Welch, Town of Quartzsite, La Paz County, and La Paz County Board of Supervisors are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 06/17/2015. (ATD)
January 28, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendants Brady, Newton, and Town of Quartzsite's motion to dismiss (Doc. 20 ) is granted in part. 2. Defendants Vederman, Rogers, Puchek, La Paz County, and La Paz County Board of Supervisors' motions to dismiss (Docs. 11 , 22 ) are granted. 3. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Samuel Vederman and Tony Rogers, and his § 1983 claim against Defendant Puchek, are dismissed with prejudice. 4. Plaintiff's motion to stay (Doc. 28 ) is denied . 5. Plaintiffs motion for temporary address change (Doc. 32 ) is granted. 6. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before March 16, 2015 (45 days from the date of this Order). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/15.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Brady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Vederman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Paz, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quartzsite, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Paz County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?