Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust v. New Vision Health LLC et al
Debtor: Gilbert Hospital LLC
Appellant: David Gottlieb and Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust
Appellee: United States Trustee, New Vision Health, LLC and New Vision Health LLC
Not Classified By Court: Microsoft Corporation, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Yourcareuniverse Incorporated, David S Wanger, General Electric Capital Corporation, GE Healthcare, Kevin T Ahern, Maricopa County Treasurer, Official Joint Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Indigo-DLI Holdings I LLC, Salt River Project, Medhost Direct Incorporated, Apheresis Care Group Incorporated, Argo Partners, Neil Kramer, Somerset Leasing Corporation VIII, Philips Healthcare, Schmidt Westergard & Company PLLC, Jim Doyle, Gateway Anesthesia Associates PLLC, Bank SNB NA, Shelly Schafer, Christopher Schafer, Principal Financial Group Incorporated, Microsoft Licensing GP, Macerich Company, Medhost of Tennessee Incorporated, Arizona Health Care Cost Containment Administration, Jolene Miller, Manewitz Weiker Associates LLC, Equity Security Holders Committee, Executive Health Resources Incorporated, Ivan Esteban, Southwest Medical Services Incorporated, MPT of Gilbert LLC, Richard Kohan, Duane Crist, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Jackson White PC, Brownstein Hyatt & Farber PC, Equity Security Holders, Michael W. Carmel Limited, Florence Hospital at Anthem LLC, Aetna Incorporated, National Labor Relations Board, Andante Law Group, Timothy Johns, Randall Calvert, Apheresis Care Group Incorporated doing business as Phoenix Metro Inpatient Service and Healthcare Management Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv02706
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Appellant's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal #9 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/16/2018. (REK)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mark D Svejda. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Forwarding Time Expired. Document number 8. Please Note: AZ Bar still lists address as: 14300 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 204. (REK)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellant's Motion For Voluntary Dismissal Of Appeal) by Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust. (Salerno, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The substation of Thomas J. Salerno and Christopher C. Simpson of the firm of Stinson Leonard Street, LLP, as counsel for the Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust, Peter Kravitz, Successor Trustee in place of Daren R. Brinkman, Laura J. Portello and Kevin C. Ronk of the firm of Brinkman Portillo Ronk, APC in the above-captioned matter is approved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Daren R. Brinkman, Laura J. Portello and Kevin C. Ronk are permitted to withdraw as counsel in this case. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/01/2018. (REK)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Application For Order Substituting Counsel For Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust, Peter Kravitz, Successor Trustee by Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salerno, Thomas)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Attorney Mark D Svejda. Reason for return: No Such Number/Unable to Forward. Document number #2 and #3 . (DXD)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southwest Medical Services Incorporated. (Jerome, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Incorporated. (Duddlesten, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Aetna Incorporated, Andante Law Group, Apheresis Care Group Incorporated, Argo Partners, Bank SNB NA, Brownstein Hyatt & Farber PC, Equity Security Holders, Equity Security Holders Committee, Executive Health Resources Incorporated, Florence Hospital at Anthem LLC, GE Healthcare, Gateway Anesthesia Associates PLLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Gilbert Hospital LLC, Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust, Indigo-DLI Holdings I LLC, Jackson White PC, MPT of Gilbert LLC, Macerich Company, Manewitz Weiker Associates LLC, Medhost Direct Incorporated, Medhost of Tennessee Incorporated, Michael W. Carmel Limited, Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Licensing GP, New Vision Health LLC, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Official Joint Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Philips Healthcare, Principal Financial Group Incorporated, Salt River Project, Schmidt Westergard & Company PLLC, Somerset Leasing Corporation VIII, Southwest Medical Services Incorporated, Yourcareuniverse Incorporated. (REK)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust v. New Vision Health LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gilbert Hospital LLC
Represented By: Brian M Blum
Represented By: Gerald L Shelley
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Represented By: Joseph Eldon Cotterman
Represented By: Roger R Foote
Represented By: Daniel E Garrison
Represented By: Fay W Bidlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Gottlieb
Represented By: Daren Reece Brinkman, Sr.
Represented By: Laura J Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gilbert Hospital Unsecured Creditors Trust
Represented By: Daren Reece Brinkman, Sr.
Represented By: Laura J Portillo
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Kevin C Ronk
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Edward Kenneth Bernatavicius
Represented By: Elizabeth C Amorosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Vision Health, LLC
Represented By: Gerald L Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: New Vision Health LLC
Represented By: Gerald L Shelley
Represented By: Nancy J March
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Joseph E Shickich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Ronald Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Yourcareuniverse Incorporated
Represented By: Dale C Schian
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David S Wanger
Represented By: Louis Daniel Lopez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: General Electric Capital Corporation
Represented By: Lisa M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GE Healthcare
Represented By: Patrick B Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kevin T Ahern
Represented By: Dean M Dinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Maricopa County Treasurer
Represented By: Klaus Peter Muthig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Joint Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Laura J Portillo
Represented By: William Wilson Fife, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Indigo-DLI Holdings I LLC
Represented By: Kyle Sylvan Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Salt River Project
Represented By: Carolyn J Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Medhost Direct Incorporated
Represented By: Dale C Schian
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apheresis Care Group Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Harnisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Argo Partners
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Anderson Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Neil Kramer
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Represented By: Ryan James Lorenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Somerset Leasing Corporation VIII
Represented By: Lawrence D Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Philips Healthcare
Represented By: Bruce J Borrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Schmidt Westergard & Company PLLC
Represented By: Robert Anthony Justman
Represented By: Kurt M Zitzer
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jim Doyle
Represented By: Dean M Dinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gateway Anesthesia Associates PLLC
Represented By: Thomas C Axelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bank SNB NA
Represented By: Kyle Sylvan Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shelly Schafer
Represented By: Carlos Manuel Arboleda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Christopher Schafer
Represented By: Robert Patrick Harris
Represented By: Carlos Manuel Arboleda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Principal Financial Group Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Matthew Kort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Microsoft Licensing GP
Represented By: Joseph E Shickich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Macerich Company
Represented By: Grant L Cartwright
Represented By: Brian David Huben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Medhost of Tennessee Incorporated
Represented By: Dale C Schian
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment Administration
Represented By: Wesley S Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jolene Miller
Represented By: Donald W Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Manewitz Weiker Associates LLC
Represented By: Scott B Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Equity Security Holders Committee
Represented By: Dean M Dinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Executive Health Resources Incorporated
Represented By: Adam D Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ivan Esteban
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Southwest Medical Services Incorporated
Represented By: Steven D Jerome
Represented By: Jill Leeann Perrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MPT of Gilbert LLC
Represented By: Robert Patrick Harris
Represented By: Walter Joseph Ashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard Kohan
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Represented By: Mark D Svejda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Duane Crist
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Represented By: Ryan James Lorenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Carolyn J Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jackson White PC
Represented By: Bradley D Weech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Brownstein Hyatt & Farber PC
Represented By: Jonathan Philip Ibsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Equity Security Holders
Represented By: Dean M Dinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael W. Carmel Limited
Represented By: Michael W Carmel
Represented By: Pernell Whynn McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Florence Hospital at Anthem LLC
Represented By: Nancy J March
Represented By: Philip R Rudd
Represented By: Wesley Denton Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Aetna Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin Michael Duddlesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Alexander James Gancayco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Andante Law Group
Represented By: Daniel E Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Timothy Johns
Represented By: Larry E Palles
Represented By: Keith Lorin Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Randall Calvert
Represented By: David I Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apheresis Care Group Incorporated doing business as Phoenix Metro Inpatient Service
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Harnisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Healthcare Management Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Dale C Schian
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?