C.M. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: M.R., V.C., C.M., L.G. and O.A.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05217
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Davis MacWilliams on behalf of United States of America. (MacWilliams, Philip)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore William Atkinson on behalf of United States of America. (Atkinson, Theodore)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extension to Respond to Complaint and MOTION for Enlargement of Page Limits by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacWilliams, Philip) *Modified to correct and add event; attorney noticed on 11/14/2019 (SLQ).
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Charles Hunt on behalf of C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., V.C.. (Hunt, Travis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Erik Walsh. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. Document number 7. (REK)
October 4, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mary Kenney on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 2, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Emily Anne Reeder on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 2, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel F Jacobson, Erik Christopher Walsh, and Kaitlyn Schaeffer on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 30, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Claudia Valenzuela and Tanya Eleni Kalivas on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., V.C.: Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and for a Protective Order upon US Attorney General and US Attorney for District of Arizona on 9/28/19 and 9/30/19. (Rosenbaum, David)
September 30, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Diana E Reiter on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 27, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert Stanton Jones, and Lucy Sarah McMillan on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 25, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jonathan Howard Feinberg on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Pro hac vice incorrectly filed into civil case without fee. Correctly Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., V.C.: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms and for Protective Order with proposed Order granting same upon U.S. Attorney for District of Arizona (Michael Bailey) and U.S. Attorney General (William Barr) on 9/23/2019. (Rosenbaum, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jonathan H. Feinberg by C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., V.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Feinberg, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mark Michael Fleming, Katherine Melloy Goettel, and Trina Realmuto on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROTECTIVE ORDER and ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/23/19. (MAW)
September 20, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Emma Curtis Winger on behalf of Plaintiffs C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., and V.C.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 *MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonyms by C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., V.C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenbaum, David). *Added MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonyms on 9/20/2019 (REK).
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17417079. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5217-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by C.M., L.G., M.R., O.A., V.C.. (Rosenbaum, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17417079 filed by O.A., C.M., M.R., L.G., V.C..(Rosenbaum, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.M. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Mary Kenney
Represented By: Mark Michael Fleming
Represented By: Lucy McMillan
Represented By: Erik Walsh
Represented By: Tanya Kalivas
Represented By: Kaitlyn Schaeffer
Represented By: Emily Reeder
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Emma Curtis Winger
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Represented By: Emma Jane Cone-Roddy
Represented By: Jonathan H Feinberg
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Feinberg
Represented By: Tanya Eleni Kalivas
Represented By: Emily Anne Reeder
Represented By: Diana E Reiter
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: Erik Christopher Walsh
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.C.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Mary Kenney
Represented By: Mark Michael Fleming
Represented By: Lucy McMillan
Represented By: Erik Walsh
Represented By: Tanya Kalivas
Represented By: Kaitlyn Schaeffer
Represented By: Emily Reeder
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Emma Curtis Winger
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Represented By: Emma Jane Cone-Roddy
Represented By: Jonathan H Feinberg
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Feinberg
Represented By: Tanya Eleni Kalivas
Represented By: Emily Anne Reeder
Represented By: Diana E Reiter
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: Erik Christopher Walsh
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Mary Kenney
Represented By: Mark Michael Fleming
Represented By: Lucy McMillan
Represented By: Erik Walsh
Represented By: Tanya Kalivas
Represented By: Kaitlyn Schaeffer
Represented By: Emily Reeder
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Emma Curtis Winger
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Represented By: Emma Jane Cone-Roddy
Represented By: Jonathan H Feinberg
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Feinberg
Represented By: Tanya Eleni Kalivas
Represented By: Emily Anne Reeder
Represented By: Diana E Reiter
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: Erik Christopher Walsh
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.G.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Mary Kenney
Represented By: Mark Michael Fleming
Represented By: Lucy McMillan
Represented By: Erik Walsh
Represented By: Tanya Kalivas
Represented By: Kaitlyn Schaeffer
Represented By: Emily Reeder
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Emma Curtis Winger
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Represented By: Emma Jane Cone-Roddy
Represented By: Jonathan H Feinberg
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Feinberg
Represented By: Tanya Eleni Kalivas
Represented By: Emily Anne Reeder
Represented By: Diana E Reiter
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: Erik Christopher Walsh
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.A.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Mary Kenney
Represented By: Mark Michael Fleming
Represented By: Lucy McMillan
Represented By: Erik Walsh
Represented By: Tanya Kalivas
Represented By: Kaitlyn Schaeffer
Represented By: Emily Reeder
Represented By: Katherine Melloy Goettel
Represented By: Diana Reiter
Represented By: Emma Curtis Winger
Represented By: Claudia Valenzuela
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Represented By: Emma Jane Cone-Roddy
Represented By: Jonathan H Feinberg
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Feinberg
Represented By: Tanya Eleni Kalivas
Represented By: Emily Anne Reeder
Represented By: Diana E Reiter
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: Erik Christopher Walsh
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Theodore William Atkinson
Represented By: Philip Davis MacWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?