Sweet v. Brailsford et al
Plaintiff: Laney Sweet
Defendant: Philip Mitchell Brailsford and Corinne Elizabeth Brailsford
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv05831
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Oral Argument: IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Reference to Adversary Proceeding to Allow Claims to Proceed in District Court Case No. CV-17-00152-GMS (Doc. #2 ) presently set for 3/5/2020 is RESET for Monday, 3/23/2020 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 504. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/24/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 *MOTION to Continue Oral Argument (Tiled: NOTICE re: Conflict Regarding Date of Oral Argument) by Laney Sweet . (Richards, William) *Modified to correct event on 1/23/2020 (REK).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED setting in-person oral argument on the Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Reference to Adversary Proceeding to Allow Claims to Proceed in District Court Case No. CV-17-00152-GMS (Doc. #2 ) for 3/5/2020 at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 504. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Stipulation to Extend Time for Sweet Plaintiffs to File Reply to Motion to Withdraw Reference (Doc. #9 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/21/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Laney Sweet filed by Laney Sweet. (Stuart, Shayna)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Sweet Plaintiffs to File Reply to Motion to Withdraw Reference by Laney Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stuart, Shayna)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time for Sweet Plaintiffs to File Reply to Motion to Withdraw Reference. The deadline for Plaintiff Laney Sweet, for herself and as representative of the Estate of Daniel Shaver, and as guardian of her minor children, N.S. and E.S., to file a reply in support of the Motion to Withdraw Reference (Doc. #2 ) is extended to 1/17/2020. There will be no further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 1/8/2020. (RMW)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Sweet Plaintiffs to File Reply to Motion to Withdraw Reference (Second Request) by Laney Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stuart, Shayna)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time for Sweet Plaintiffs to File Reply to Motion to Withdraw Reference. The deadline for Plaintiff Laney Sweet, for herself and as representative of the Estate of Daniel Shaver, and as guardian of her minor children, N.S. and E.S., to file a reply in support of the Motion to Withdraw Reference (Doc. #2 ) is extended to 1/8/2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 12/30/2019. (RMW)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Sweet Plaintiffs to File Reply to Motion to Withdraw Reference (First Request) by Laney Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stuart, Shayna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Laney Sweet filed by Corinne Elizabeth Brailsford, Philip Mitchell Brailsford. (Worth, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Matter. (REK)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Laney Sweet. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Laney Sweet. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet v. Brailsford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Mitchell Brailsford
Represented By: John Richard Worth
Represented By: Byron Harrison Forrester
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Represented By: Stephen Cary Forrester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinne Elizabeth Brailsford
Represented By: John Richard Worth
Represented By: Byron Harrison Forrester
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Finch
Represented By: Stephen Cary Forrester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laney Sweet
Represented By: William August Richards
Represented By: Shayna Gabrielle Stuart
Represented By: Alan Scott Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?