Barton & Associates Incorporated v. Trainor et al
Plaintiff: Barton & Associates Incorporated
Defendant: Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone, AB Staffing Solutions LLC and Jamie Trainor
Case Number: 2:2020cv01560
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Godbout's and Guaglianone's Response filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (Balitis, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and ABSS's Response filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (Balitis, John)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is set for 10/14/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Steven P. Logan. The Hearing shall be held telephonically. The parties shall jointly email Judge Logan's chambers by October 9, 2020 to obtain the call-in information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/2/2020. (LMR)
September 30, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AB Staffing Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Samuels, Bruce)
September 30, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andre Godbout, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kendall Guaglianone)(Dowell, Leigh)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration #32 is granted. Defendants AB Staffing Solutions, Andre Godbout, and Kendall Guaglianone shall have until September 30, 2020 to file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall have until October 7, 2020 to file a Reply. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/29/2020. (LMR)
September 28, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE re: Defendants' Notice for Oral Argument by Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone re: #31 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (Clees, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE re: re: Evidentiary Hearing not needed by Barton & Associates Incorporated re: #31 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (Balitis, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (Balitis, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #31 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AB Staffing Solutions LLC, Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Samuels, Bruce)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Defendants' third Unopposed Motion for Extension #28 is denied as moot. The parties shall notify the Court by September 28, 2020 whether they anticipate the need for an evidentiary hearing as opposed to an oral argument. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/24/2020. (LMR)
September 23, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendant Jamie Trainor's Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jamie Trainor. (Griffin, Thomas)
September 23, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AB Staffing Solutions LLC. (Samuels, Bruce)
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dowell, Leigh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AB Staffing Solutions LLC.(Samuels, Bruce)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone.(Clees, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jamie Trainor.(Griffin, Thomas)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Thomas Timothy Griffin. (Griffin, Thomas)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion for Extension: Defendants shall have until September 23, 2020 to file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall have until September 28, 2020 to file a Reply. Defendants shall have until September 22, 2020, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties shall notify the Court by September 23, 2020 whether they anticipate the need for an evidentiary hearing as opposed to an oral argument. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/8/2020. (LMR)
September 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Marc D Freedman on behalf of Defendant AB Staffing Solutions LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Extensions to (1) Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) File Responsive Pleadings by AB Staffing Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Samuels, Bruce)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend. Defendants shall have until September 8, 2020, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/2/2020. (LMR)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension #18 is granted. Defendants shall have until September 9, 2020 to file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall have until September 14, 2020 to file a Reply. The parties shall notify the Court by September 9, 2020 whether they anticipate the need for an evidentiary hearing as opposed to an oral argument. Signed by Judge Steven P.Logan on 9/1/2020. (LMR)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AB Staffing Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Samuels, Bruce) *Modified to correct motion type on 9/1/2020 (REK).
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AB Staffing Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Samuels, Bruce) *Modified to correct text and document link on 9/1/2020 (REK).
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Timothy Griffin on behalf of Jamie Trainor. (Griffin, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Service of Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and Order by Barton & Associates Incorporated re: #14 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings . (Acken, Julia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Edward Samuels on behalf of AB Staffing Solutions LLC. (Samuels, Bruce)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Plaintiff shall provide Defendants a copy of the following: (1) the Complaint; (2) the Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and (3) this Order no later than Friday, August 28, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. and shall file with the Court a notice indicating when and how notice was provided. Defendant shall have until Wednesday, September 2, 2020 at 11:59 p.m. to file a Response. Plaintiff shall have until Monday, September 7, 2020 at 11:59 p.m. to file a Reply. The parties shall notify the Court by Wednesday, September 2, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. whether they anticipate the need for an evidentiary hearing as opposed to an oral argument. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 8/26/2020. (LMR)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Acken, Julia)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel Bassani, #2 Exhibit A through I, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(Acken, Julia)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT Verification of Complaint re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Barton & Associates Incorporated. (Acken, Julia)
August 24, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lucia A Passanisi on behalf of Plaintiff Barton & Associates Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 21, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher Reade O'Hara on behalf of Plaintiff Barton & Associates Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure, Preliminary Order upon Jamie Trainor on August 18, 2020. (Acken, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure and Preliminary Order upon AB Staffing Solutions, LLC on August 11, 2020. (Acken, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure and Preliminary Order upon Andre Godbout on August 8, 2020. (Acken, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure and Preliminary Order upon Kendall Guaglianone on August 9, 2020. (Acken, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 3, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/6/2020. (LMR)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AB Staffing Solutions LLC, Andre Godbout, Kendall Guaglianone, Jamie Trainor. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18544589. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01560-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (submitted by Julia Acken) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (REK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (submitted by Julia Acken) (REK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18544589 filed by Barton & Associates Incorporated. (submitted by Julia Acken) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton & Associates Incorporated v. Trainor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barton & Associates Incorporated
Represented By: Julia Sibert Acken
Represented By: John J Balitis, Jr.
Represented By: Lucia A Passanisi
Represented By: Christopher Reade O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Godbout
Represented By: Joseph T Clees
Represented By: Leigh Eric Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Guaglianone
Represented By: Joseph T Clees
Represented By: Leigh Eric Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AB Staffing Solutions LLC
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Represented By: Laura Mary Pasqualone
Represented By: Marc D Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Trainor
Represented By: Thomas Timothy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?