Strojnik v. HPTRI Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Defendant: HPTRI Corporation doing business as Residence Inn by Marriott Scottsdale Paradise Valley and Marriott International Incorporated
Counter Claimant: HPTRI Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01868
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED remanding this action to state court sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Counts 6, 7, and 8 Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) (Doc. #14 ) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to the Maricopa County Superior Court and terminate this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court will not rule on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims (Doc. #15 ) and it shall be administratively terminated by the Clerk of Court. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (SST)
November 18, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counterclaim filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counterclaim filed by HPTRI Corporation, Marriott International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Leavitt, Lindsay)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw with Consent. Attorney Mary G Isban and the law firm of Campbell, Yost, Clare & Norell, P.C. are hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/13/2020. (LMR)
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Marriott International Incorporated, HPTRI Corporation. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
November 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HPTRI Corporation, Marriott International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isban, Mary)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #16 : Defendants shall have until November 16, 2020, to file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/9/2020. (LMR)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court "Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Counts 6, 7, 8 Pursurant to U.S.C. 1447(c) " filed by HPTRI Corporation, Marriott International Incorporated. (Leavitt, Lindsay)
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counterclaim "Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time" First Request by HPTRI Corporation, Marriott International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Leavitt, Lindsay)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counterclaim by Peter Strojnik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strojnik, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Peter Strojnik. (Strojnik, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/26/20. (SLQ)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 12/1/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 "Defendants' Answer and Counterclaim" ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Peter Strojnik by Marriott International Incorporated, HPTRI Corporation.(Leavitt, Lindsay)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Peter Strojnik. (WLP)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/29/2020. (LMR)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-1868-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18708001. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01868-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (REK)
September 25, 2020 ***State Court record received on 9/25/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Peter Strojnik: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Cover Sheet upon HPTRI Corporation on 8/31/2020.***Affidavit of Process Server filed in State Court on 8/31/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 9/25/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 25, 2020 ***State Court record received on 9/25/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Peter Strojnik: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Marriott International Incorporated on 8/20/2020.***Declaration of Service by a Private Process Server filed in State Court on 8/21/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 9/25/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HPTRI Corporation, Marriott International Incorporated. (submitted by Lindsay Leavitt) (REK)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054785. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18708001 filed by HPTRI Corporation. (submitted by Lindsay Leavitt) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strojnik v. HPTRI Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPTRI Corporation doing business as Residence Inn by Marriott Scottsdale Paradise Valley
Represented By: Lindsay G Leavitt
Represented By: Mary G Isban
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Incorporated
Represented By: Lindsay G Leavitt
Represented By: Mary G Isban
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: HPTRI Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay G Leavitt
Represented By: Mary G Isban
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?