Dlubak Glass Company v. Cabrera et al
Plaintiff: Dlubak Glass Company a Pennsylvania corporation and Dlubak Glass Company
Defendant: Misael Cabrera, Bradley Baker and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv00095
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eric J Wu on behalf of Plaintiff Dlubak Glass Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 25, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven M Taber on behalf of Plaintiff Dlubak Glass Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Michael T Liburdi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-0095-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dlubak Glass Company. (Post, Christopher) *Modified text on 2/23/2021 (REK).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing on or before March 1, 2021 why it should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to title 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff complies with Rule 3.7(b) on or before March 1, 2021, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 2/22/21. (MAP)
February 3, 2021 Remark: Out of state attorneys Fadi K Rasheed, Steven M Taber and Eric J Wu terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel of record. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bradley Baker, Misael Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Dlubak Glass Company. (Post, Christopher)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Dlubak Glass Company. (Post, Christopher)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Incomplete Summons Forms submitted. Summons Forms missing case caption names, defendant's name, address and plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney name, address for answer or motion. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REM)
January 18, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19068939. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00095-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (REM)
January 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Dlubak Glass Company a Pennsylvania corporation.(Post, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REM)
January 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Dlubak Glass Company a Pennsylvania corporation. (REM)
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19068939 filed by Dlubak Glass Company a Pennsylvania corporation.(Post, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dlubak Glass Company v. Cabrera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misael Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dlubak Glass Company a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Christopher Post
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dlubak Glass Company
Represented By: Christopher Post
Represented By: J Tyrrell Taber
Represented By: Steven M Taber
Represented By: Fadi K Rasheed
Represented By: Eric J Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?