Isaacson et al v. Brnovich et al Featured Case

A case challenging two Arizona laws that would grant new "personhood" rights for fetuses, embryos and fertilized eggs.

Plaintiff: Paul A Isaacson, Eric M Reuss, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Arizona National Organization For Women and Arizona Medical Association
Defendant: Mark Brnovich, Michael Whiting, Brian McIntyre, William Ring, Bradley Beauchamp, Scott Bennett, Jeremy Ford, Tony Rogers, Allister Adel, Matthew Smith, Brad Carlyon, Laura Conover, Kent Volkmer, George Silva, Sheila Polk, Jon Smith, Arizona Medical Board, Patricia McSorley, R Screven Farmer, James M Gillard, Lois Krahn, Jodi A Bain, Bruce Bethancourt, David C Beyer, Laura Dorrell, Gary Figge, Pamela E Jones, Eileen M Oswald, Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara M Christ and Don Herrington
Intervenor Defendant: Sharing Down Syndrome Arizona
Case Number: 2:2021cv01417
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 118 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Oral Argument re: 107 Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 7/8/2022. After hearing oral argument from the parties, the Court takes this matter under advisement. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jessica Sklarsky, Jen Rasay, Victoria Lopez, Alexa Kolbi-Molinas, Gail Deady, Jared Keenan, Anastasia Pastan, and Ralia Polechronis for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Katlyn Davis, Kate Sawyer, Carrie Smith, Aubrey Corcoran, Brun Roysden, and Kevin Ray for Defendants. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 10:01 am to 11:14 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
July 7, 2022 Filing 117 NOTICE RE: Oral Argument Topics: In addition to any prepared remarks, the Court asks the parties to come to the July 8, 2022 telephonic oral argument prepared to discuss the following (see attached Notice). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/7/2022. (MMO)
July 6, 2022 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Sklarsky, Jessica)
July 1, 2022 Filing 115 WRIT OF CERTIORARI ISSUED by US Supreme Court re: 56 Notice of Appeal, 65 Notice of Appeal. The Court today entered the following order in the above-entitled case: The application for stay (21A222) presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The 9/28/21 order of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit with instructions to remand to the District Court for further consideration in light of Dobbs v. Jackson Womens Health Organization, 597 U. S. ___ (2022). (BAC)
July 1, 2022 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
June 30, 2022 Filing 114 MANDATE of USCA re: 56 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Brnovich, 65 Notice of Appeal filed by Paul A Isaacson, Arizona National Organization For Women, Arizona Medical Association, Eric M Reuss, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. In light of the Supreme Court's 6/30/22, order vacating the district court's 9/28/21, order and remanding with instructions to remand to the district court for further proceedings in light of Dobbs v. Jackson Womens Health Organization, 597 U.S. ___ (2022), the order requesting supplemental briefing (Dkt. 84 in 21-16645 and Dkt. 78 in 21-16711) is vacated. The case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings in accordance with the Supreme Court's order. The mandate shall issue forthwith. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(BAC)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for an injunction pending appeal under Rule 62(d) (Doc. 107 ) will be treated as a renewed motion for preliminary injunction under Rule 65. The current briefing and hearing schedule remain in effect. See attached document for complete information. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/30/22. (SMH)
June 30, 2022 Filing 111 *RESPONSE re: 110 Notice of Supreme Court Order and Suggestion of Mootness by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Sklarsky, Jessica) *Modified to correct event type on 7/1/2022.
June 30, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE re: U.S. Supreme Court Order and Suggestion of Mootness by Mark Brnovich re: 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Exhibit A - U.S. Supreme Court Order)(Catlett, Michael)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMENDED ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, as to Plaintiffs' 107 Emergency Motion for an Injunction of Interpretation Policy Pending Appeal, setting the following briefing schedule: Defendants' response shall be due no later than 5:00 PM on 7/1/2022. Plaintiffs' reply in support shall be due no later than 5:00 PM on 7/6/2022. Telephonic Oral Argument set for 7/8/2022 at 10:00AM. The parties will be provided call-in information via separate email. To assist the court reporter, the parties shall prepare and submit to chambers prior to the oral argument a Table of Authorities, in alphabetical order, which includes all of the authorities on which the parties will rely at the oral argument. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/27/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)(Amending the Court's Order at Doc. 108 to reflect the Response and Reply briefs are due by 5:00 PM on their respective due dates.)
June 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, as to Plaintiffs' 107 Emergency Motion for an Injunction of Interpretation Policy Pending Appeal, setting the following briefing schedule: Defendants' response shall be due no later than 7/1/2022. Plaintiffs' reply in support shall be due no later than 7/6/2022. Telephonic Oral Argument set for 7/8/2022 at 10:00AM. The parties will be provided call-in information via separate email. To assist the court reporter, the parties shall prepare and submit to chambers prior to the oral argument a Table of Authorities, in alphabetical order, which includes all of the authorities on which the parties will rely at the oral argument. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/26/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
June 25, 2022 Filing 107 *EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, Declarations, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sklarsky, Jessica) *Modified docket text to include emergency on 6/27/2022. (SMH)
June 24, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared G Keenan on behalf of Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Keenan, Jared)
June 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anastasia Pastan, Ralia E Polechronis, Beth A Wilkinson on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 17, 2022 Filing 104 DEFENDANT ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES AND DEFENDANT DON HERRINGTONS ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Arizona Department of Health Services, Don Herrington.(Corcoran, Aubrey)
March 17, 2022 Filing 103 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Mark Brnovich.(Catlett, Michael)
March 16, 2022 Filing 102 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Arizona Medical Board, Patricia McSorley.(Williams, Mary)
March 16, 2022 Filing 101 *WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims by Defendant Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael) *Modified to correct event type on 3/17/2022. (SMH)
March 9, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings held on 02/24/2022, before Judge DOUGLAS L. RAYES. [Court Reporter: Elva Cruz-Lauer, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7261. Amended to correct judicial information on title page only. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2022. (RAP)
February 28, 2022 Filing 100 *(AMENDED TRANSCRIPT FILED AT DOC. 105 ) - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings held on 02/24/2022, before Judge DOUGLAS R. RAYES. [Court Reporter: Elva Cruz-Lauer, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7261]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2022. (RAP) *Modified to reference amended version and create docket entry relationship on 3/24/2022 (RAP).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2023. Dispositive motions due by 7/14/2023. See document for additional deadlines and complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/24/2022. (RMV)
February 25, 2022 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss for proceedings held on February 24, 2022, Judge Douglas L Rayes hearing judge(s). (Lopez, Victoria)
February 24, 2022 Filing 97 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Scheduling Conference held on 2/24/2022. Case management deadlines are set. Written order to issue. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jessica Sklarsky, Jen Rasay, Victoria Lopez, Catherine Coquillette, Alexa Kolbi-Molinas, and Rebecca Chan for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Michael Catlett, Katlyn Davis, Kate Sawyer, Mary Williams, Carrie Smith, and Kevin Ray for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 1:46 pm to 2:02 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
February 18, 2022 Filing 96 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Sklarsky, Jessica)
February 11, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
February 11, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Sklarsky, Jessica)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for 2/25/2022 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 2/24/2022 at 01:45 PM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The Court anticipates this hearing will be held telephonically. The parties will be provided with call-in information via separate email. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes. (MMO)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
February 7, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Department of Health Services, Arizona Medical Board, Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
February 4, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Sklarsky, Jessica)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 87 Motion to Continue. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/26/2022. (RMV)
January 25, 2022 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 87 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Sklarsky, Jessica)
January 24, 2022 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 87 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference filed by Arizona Department of Health Services, Arizona Medical Board, Mark Brnovich. (Divis, Katlyn)
January 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexa Kolbi-Molinas on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Medical Association, Eric M Reuss. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 10, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sklarsky, Jessica)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' 85 Motion to Withdraw Ruth E. Harlow as Counsel for Plaintiffs. Attorney Ruth Harlow shall be terminated as counsel of record for the Plaintiffs Eric. M. Reuss, M.D., M.P.H., and the Arizona Medical Association. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/5/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 5, 2022 Filing 85 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ruth E. Harlow by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Victoria)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that Plaintiffs' motion to stay briefing and consideration of Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 73 ) is GRANTED. The Court will hold Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 68 ) in abeyance pending resolution of Plaintiffs' interlocutory appeal. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/22/2021. (RMV)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 62 Sharing Down Syndrome's Motion to Intervene. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/19/2021. (RMV)
November 19, 2021 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 73 MOTION to Stay re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Deady, Gail)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' 78 Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Currently scheduled for Defendant 22, 2021. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/22/2021 is vacated and reset for 2/25/2022 at 10:00 AM. The Court anticipates this hearing will be held telephonically. Call-in information will be provided to the parties via separate email. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/15/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' 75 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to file Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' 68 Motion to Dismiss is extended to 14 days after a stay, if granted, is lifted, or 14 days after the Motion to Stay is denied, if that should occur. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/15/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
November 15, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Catherine Coquillette on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 73 MOTION to Stay re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims filed by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference set for December 22, 2021 (Doc. 54) by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Victoria)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' 76 Motion to Withdraw Emily Nestler as Counsel for Plaintiffs. Attorney Emily Nestler is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Paul A Isaacson, Arizona National Organization for Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated and Arizona National Organization for Women. Plaintiffs continue to be represented by attorneys Jessica Sklarsky, Gail Deady and Jen Samantha D. Rasay along with other co-counsel of record. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/9/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
November 9, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw Emily Nestler as counsel for Plaintiffs by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Victoria)
November 8, 2021 Filing 75 *Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event on 11/9/2021 (WLP).
November 3, 2021 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 62 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sharing Down Syndrome Arizona. (Connelly, Kenneth)
November 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jessica Leah Sklarsky on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 28, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION to Stay re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Victoria)
October 27, 2021 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Lopez, Victoria)
October 27, 2021 Filing 71 RESPONSE to Motion re: 62 MOTION to Intervene filed by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Arizona Medical Board Defendants. The individual members of the Arizona Medical Board, including R. Screven Farmer, M.D., James M. Gillard, M.D., Jodi A. Bain, M.A., J.D., Bruce Bethancourt, M.D., David Beyer, M.D., Laura Dorrell, M.S.N., R.N., Gary R. Figge, M.D., Pamela E. Jones, Lois Krahn, M.D., and Eileen M. Oswald, M.P.H. are hereby dismissed without prejudice. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/25/2021. (RMV)
October 20, 2021 Filing 69 STIPULATION To Dismiss Board Members by Arizona Medical Board. (Williams, Mary)
October 19, 2021 Filing 68 * MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Count V of the Complaint by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael) Modified to correct event on 10/22/2021. (SMH)
October 18, 2021 Filing 67 USCA Case Number re: 65 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-16711, Ninth Circuit. (KAH)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 57 Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/18/2021. (RMV)
October 18, 2021 Filing 65 *NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19972847. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified text to include "interlocutory" on 10/19/2021. (SMH)
October 15, 2021 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 57 Emergency MOTION to Stay re: 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 57 Emergency MOTION to Stay re: 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Lopez, Victoria)
October 13, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION to Intervene by Sharing Down Syndrome Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Virginia Johnson, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Connelly, Kenneth)
October 13, 2021 Filing 60 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Mark Brnovich re: 56 Notice of Appeal. (Catlett, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Filing 59 USCA Case Number re: 56 Notice of Appeal. Case number 21-16645, Ninth Circuit. (KAH)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, as to the State Defendants' 57 Emergency Motion to Stay, Plaintiffs' response shall be due no later than 10/13/2021. State Defendants' optional reply shall be due no later than 10/15/2021. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/6/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
October 5, 2021 Filing 57 Emergency MOTION to Stay re: 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Brnovich. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-19933106. (Catlett, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE re: Notice of Appeal by Mark Brnovich re: 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Catlett, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 12/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/1/2021. (RMV)
October 1, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Helen Smith on behalf of Arizona Medical Board. (Smith, Carrie)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 VACATED by doc. 115 . ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. 10 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as explained herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are preliminarily enjoined from enforcing the following provisions of Arizona Senate Bill 1457: 1. Section 2, to be codified as A.R.S. § 13-3603.02(A)(2), (B)(2), (D) (as it applies to subsections (A)(2) and (B)(2)), and (E) (as it applies to subsections (A)(2), (B)(2)); 2. Section 10, to be codified as A.R.S. § 36-2157(A)(1) (as it applies to genetic abnormalities); 3. Section 11, to be codified as A.R.S. § 36-2158(A)(2) (d) (as it applies to genetic abnormalities); and 4. Section 13, to be codified as A.R.S. § 36-2161(A)(25). See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/28/21. (SMH) Modified on 7/5/2022 (BAC).
September 28, 2021 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3RD PARTY) by Matthew Reiser of the Center for Reproductive Rights for proceedings held on 09/22/2021, Judge Douglas L Rayes hearing judge(s). (RAP)
September 27, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC ORAL ARGUMENT proceedings held on 09/22/2021, before Judge DOUGLAS L. RAYES. [Court Reporter: Jennifer A. Pancratz, RMR, CRR, FCRR, CRC, Telephone number (602) 322-7198]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2022. (RAP) *Modified to correct date filed to match court reporter delivery date on 10/13/2021 (RAP).
September 24, 2021 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mark Brnovich for proceedings held on 09-22-2021, Judge Douglas L Rayes hearing judge(s). (Roysden, Brunn)
September 22, 2021 Filing 49 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Oral Argument held on 9/22/2021. Discussion and oral argument is held regarding 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court takes the matter under advisement. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Emily Nestler, Rebecca Chan, Ruth Harlow, Victoria Lopez, Gail Deady, and Jen Rasay for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Michael Catlett, Katlyn Davis, Brunn Roysden, and Kate Sawyer for Defendants. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:01 pm to 4:25 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
September 17, 2021 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Lopez, Victoria)
September 15, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D Ray on behalf of Arizona Department of Health Services, Cara M Christ. (Ray, Kevin)
September 9, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Catlett, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian McCormack Bergin on behalf of Gary Figge, David C Beyer. (Bergin, Brian) *Modified filers per help desk call on 9/2/2021 (WLP).
August 27, 2021 Filing 44 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 26, 2021 to Gary Figge, M.D. . (Lopez, Victoria)
August 27, 2021 Filing 43 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 26, 2021 to David C. Beyer, M.D. . (Lopez, Victoria)
August 27, 2021 Filing 42 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 18, 2021 to Michael Whiting, Apache County Attorney . (Lopez, Victoria)
August 27, 2021 Filing 41 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 18, 2021 to Laura Conover, Pima County Attorney . (Lopez, Victoria)
August 23, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Brunn Wall Roysden, III on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Roysden, Brunn)
August 23, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Shawn Catlett on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Catlett, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Blakeley Sawyer on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Sawyer, Kate)
August 23, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Katlyn Jo Divis on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Divis, Katlyn)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - Defendant Mark Brnovich, in his official capacity as Arizona Attorney General, is designated as the single representative to coordinate arguments. By stipulation of the parties, the fifteen County Attorney Defendants (Michael Whiting, Brian McIntyre, William Ring, Bradley Beauchamp, Scott Bennett, Jeremy Ford, Tony Rogers, Allister Adel, Matthew Smith, Brad Carlyon, Laura Conover, Kent Volkmer, George Silva, Sheila Polk, and Jon Smith) are excused from answering the complaint, participating in proceedings in this matter, and from presenting arguments or filing responsive pleadings in this case. If any County Attorney Defendant wishes to file an answer or other responsive pleading, the respective County Attorney Defendant will do so only after consulting with Plaintiffs' counsel. Attorney General Brnovich shall file a Joint Defense Response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction by no later than September 9, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file their reply memorandum by no later than September 17, 2021. The parties shall appear and participate in a telephonic oral argument on September 22, 2021 at 2:00 PM. If the parties reach an agreement regarding the enforcement of the challenged provisions pending the outcome of this litigation that would obviate the need for a preliminary injunction, they shall jointly notify the Court by no later than September 20, 2021. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/23/2021. (LAD)
August 23, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 25 Notice (Other), 20 Notice (Other), 24 Notice (Other), 28 Notice (Other), 23 Notice (Other), 34 Notice (Other), 27 Notice (Other), 29 Notice (Other), 32 Notice (Other), 26 Notice (Other), 19 Notice (Other), 30 Notice (Other), 22 Notice (Other), 33 Notice (Other), 21 Notice (Other) and 31 Notice (Other) filed by Paul A Isaacson, Arizona National Organization For Women, Arizona Medical Association, Eric M Reuss, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. Incorrect event selected: Notice, Other found in the Other Filings, Notices category. Correct event: Service Executed found in the Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process category. Please note for future filings. No further action is required. The clerk has modified the entries to reflect the correct event. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
August 20, 2021 Filing 34 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Kent Volkmer. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 33 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to George Silva. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 32 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Tony Rogers. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 31 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to William Ring. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 30 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Sheila Polk. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 29 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Brian McIntyre (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 28 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Matthew Smith (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 27 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Jon Smith. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 26 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Jeremy Ford. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 25 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Brad Carlyon. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 24 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/17/2021 to Mark Brnovich. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 23 **SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Scott Bennett. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Bradley Beauchamp. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Dr. Cara M. Christ.(Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Patricia McSorley. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/18/2021 to Allister Adel. (Lopez, Victoria) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 8/23/2021 (LAD).
August 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Proposed Briefing and Hearing Schedule by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss re: 11 Order . (Rasay, Jen)
August 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Stanley Moore on behalf of Brad Carlyon. (Moore, Jason)
August 20, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Emily Brooke Nestler on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 19, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gail Marie Deady, Jen Samantha D Rasay on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Ford. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Lopez, Victoria)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 12 Summons Submitted filed by Paul A Isaacson, Arizona National Organization For Women, Arizona Medical Association, Eric M Reuss, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. Defendant name for Jeremy Ford does not match docket. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Allister Adel, Bradley Beauchamp, Scott Bennett, Brad Carlyon, Laura Conover, Brian McIntyre, Sheila Polk, William Ring, Tony Rogers, George Silva, Jon Smith, Matthew Smith, Kent Volkmer, Michael Whiting. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 18, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ruth Harlow, Rebecca Chan on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Medical Association, Eric M Reuss. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Bradley Beauchamp, Gila County Attorney, # 2 Summons Scott Bennett, Graham County Attorney, # 3 Summons Brad Carlyon, Navajo County Attorney, # 4 Summons Laura Conover, Pima County Attorey, # 5 Summons Jeremey Ford, Greenlee County Attorney, # 6 Summons Brian McIntyre, Cochise County Attorney, # 7 Summons Sheila Polk, Yavapai County Attorney, # 8 Summons William Ring, Coconino County Attorney, # 9 Summons Tony Rogers, La Paz County Attorney, # 10 Summons George Silva, Santa Cruz County Attorney, # 11 Summons Jon Smith, Yuma County Attorney, # 12 Summons Matthew Smith, Mohave County Attorney, # 13 Summons Kent Volkmer, Pinal County Attorney, # 14 Summons Michael Whiting, Apache County Attorney)(Lopez, Victoria)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with the summons, complaint, preliminary injunction motion, and a copy of this order as soon as practicable. The parties are directed to meet and confer and, by no later than August 20, 2021, submit to the Court a joint proposed briefing and hearing schedule. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/17/2021. (RMV)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1-6, # 3 Proposed Order)(WLP)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff shall be allowed an additional 5 pages for their Motion for Preliminary Injunction and accompanying Memorandum of Law. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and accompanying Memorandum of Law lodged on the Court's docket at Doc. 7 . Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/17/2021. (WLP)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file notice of service with the Court. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/17/2021. (WLP)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 *Filed at 10 pursuant to 9 Order -- LODGED Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1-6, # 3 Proposed Order)(JAM) *Modified on 8/17/2021 (WLP).
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Arizona Medical Association, Arizona National Organization For Women, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Eric M Reuss. (Lopez, Victoria) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19771685. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1417-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated. (JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona National Organization For Women. (JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Medical Association. (JAM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19771685 filed by Eric M Reuss, Paul A Isaacson, National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated, Arizona National Organization For Women, Arizona Medical Association. (Lopez, Victoria) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaacson et al v. Brnovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Isaacson
Represented By: Emily Nestler
Represented By: Gail Deady
Represented By: Jen Samantha D Rasay
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: Gail Marie Deady
Represented By: Emily Brooke Nestler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric M Reuss
Represented By: Gail Deady
Represented By: Rebecca Chan
Represented By: Ruth E Harlow
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: Gail Marie Deady
Represented By: Ruth Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Council of Jewish Women (Arizona Section) Incorporated
Represented By: Emily Nestler
Represented By: Gail Deady
Represented By: Jen Samantha D Rasay
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: Emily Brooke Nestler
Represented By: Gail Marie Deady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona National Organization For Women
Represented By: Emily Nestler
Represented By: Gail Deady
Represented By: Jen Samantha D Rasay
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: Emily Brooke Nestler
Represented By: Gail Marie Deady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Medical Association
Represented By: Rebecca Chan
Represented By: Ruth E Harlow
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: Ruth Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Michael Shawn Catlett
Represented By: Kate Blakeley Sawyer
Represented By: Katlyn Jo Divis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allister Adel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Carlyon
Represented By: Jason Stanley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Volkmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Medical Board
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia McSorley
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Screven Farmer
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Gillard
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Krahn
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi A Bain
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bethancourt
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C Beyer
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Dorrell
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Figge
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela E Jones
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen M Oswald
Represented By: Carrie Helen Smith
Represented By: Mary DeLaat Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Health Services
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara M Christ
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Herrington
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Sharing Down Syndrome Arizona
Represented By: Kevin Hayden Theriot
Represented By: Kenneth John Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?