TGP Communications LLC et al v. Sellers et al
Plaintiff: TGP Communications LLC a Missouri limited liability company doing business as Gateway Pundit and Jordan Conradson
Defendant: Jack Sellers, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Clint Hickman, Steve Gallardo, Stephen Richer, Rey Valenzuela, Scott Jarrett, Megan Gilbertson and Marcus Milam
Case Number: 2:2022cv01925
Filed: November 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/10/2023. (JAMA)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand [Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint] by Steve Gallardo, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Megan Gilbertson, Clint Hickman, Scott Jarrett, Marcus Milam, Stephen Richer, Jack Sellers, Rey Valenzuela.(Trullinger, Charles)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Early Discovery #30 . See document for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/14/2022. (REK)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #30 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Early Discovery) filed by TGP Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails with U.S. Marshalls)(Randazza, Marc)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re: #30 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Early Discovery) [Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Early Discovery] filed by Steve Gallardo, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Megan Gilbertson, Clint Hickman, Scott Jarrett, Marcus Milam, Stephen Richer, Jack Sellers, Rey Valenzuela. (Trullinger, Charles)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Early Discovery (Doc. #30 ) no later than 12:00 PM (Arizona time), December 13, 2022. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/9/2022. (JAMA)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Discovery (Limited Early Discovery) by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Comments, #2 Exhibit 2 - TGP Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Disqus Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - Emails re Request for Threat, #5 Proposed Order)(Randazza, Marc)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 USCA Case Number re: #28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Case number 22-16826, Ninth Circuit. (BAC)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #27 Order on Motion for TRO by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number AAZDC-21348287. (Randazza, Marc)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jonathon Christian Burns on behalf of Plaintiffs Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Emergency Ex Parte #7 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 11/23/2022. (ESG)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/21/2022. (JAMA)
November 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING proceedings held on 11/17/2022, before Judge JOHN J. TUCHI. [Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper, RDR, CRR, CCP, Telephone number (602) 322-7245]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 12/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2023. (RAP)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE re: Filing Exhibit by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Twitter Post, #2 Declaration of Trey A. Rothell)(Randazza, Marc)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 23 Notice of Deficiency by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC for proceedings held on 11/17/2022, Judge John J Tuchi hearing judge(s). (Randazza, Marc)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 Transcript Request filed by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by Jonathon C. Burns but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to Marc Randazza. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile Transcript Request with name/signature (sections 1 & 19 of the AO435 form) matching the name of the ECF registered user under whose credentials the document will be re-submitted under. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC for proceedings held on 11/17/2022, Judge John J Tuchi hearing judge(s). (Randazza, Marc)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Plaintiff/Defendant Witness List.(JAMA)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 11/17/2022. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking this matter under advisement. Formal order to issue. (See attachment). (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 10:03 AM to 12:34 PM.(JAMA)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. Amendment to #18 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint), #12 Notice (Other) List of Witnesses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Glasser CV, #2 Exhibit 2 - Glasser Columbia Bio, #3 Exhibit 3 - Gregg Leslie CV, #4 Exhibit 4 - Leslie ASU Profile)(Randazza, Marc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. Amendment to #12 Notice (Other) List of Witnesses. (Randazza, Marc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order CORRECTED [Maricopa County Defendant's Response to Corrected Emergency Exparte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order] filed by Steve Gallardo, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Megan Gilbertson, Clint Hickman, Scott Jarrett, Marcus Milam, Stephen Richer, Jack Sellers, Rey Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-9, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 10-17, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 18-20)(Trullinger, Charles)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E Trullinger on behalf of Steve Gallardo, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Megan Gilbertson, Clint Hickman, Scott Jarrett, Marcus Milam, Stephen Richer, Jack Sellers, Rey Valenzuela. (Trullinger, Charles)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, and Corrected Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order upon Rey Valenzuela, Megan Gilbertson, and Marcus Milam on 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from MCAO)(Randazza, Marc)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, and Corrected Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order upon Steve Gallardo, Clint Hickman, Scott Jarrett, Bill Gates, Thomas Galvin, Jack Sellers, and Stephen Richer on 11/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Hickman, #2 Proof of Service - Jarrett, #3 Proof of Service - Gates, #4 Proof of Service - Galvin, #5 Proof of Service - Sellers, #6 Proof of Service - Richer)(Randazza, Marc)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE re: Filing Exhibits and Request for Judicial Notice by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order CORRECTED . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #6 Exhibit 6 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #7 Exhibit 7 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #8 Exhibit 8 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #9 Exhibit 9 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #10 Exhibit 10 - The Gateway Pundit Article, #11 Affidavit of Cassidy S. Curran Authenticating Exhibits)(Randazza, Marc)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE re: Filing List of Witnesses by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC . (Randazza, Marc)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC re: #10 Order,,, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email to MCAO)(Randazza, Marc)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiff's Corrected Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #7 ) by no later than 5:00 PM (Arizona time), November 16, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing on the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order for Thursday, November 17, 2022, at 10:00 AM (Arizona time) in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J. Tuchi. Each side shall have 60 minutes to present whatever evidence or arguments they wish to present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel for Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants forthwith. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/14/2022. (JAMA)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE re: Second Certificate of Service by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email to Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email to MCAO, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email to MCAO)(Randazza, Marc)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. (Randazza, Marc)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order CORRECTED by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Denial and Appeal Email, #2 Attachment Conradson Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Attachment Hoft Declaration in Support of Motion, #4 Attachment Corrected Certificate of Service)(Randazza, Marc)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Steve Gallardo, Thomas Galvin, Bill Gates, Megan Gilbertson, Clint Hickman, Scott Jarrett, Marcus Milam, Stephen Richer, Jack Sellers, Rey Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21303598. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01925-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
November 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. (Randazza, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(BAC)
November 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TGP Communications LLC. (Randazza, Marc) (BAC)
November 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. (Randazza, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to TRO Motion - Denial and Appeal Email, #2 Conradson Declaration in Support of TRO Motion, #3 Hoft Declaration in Support of TRO Motion, #4 Certificate of Service)(BAC)
November 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21303598 filed by Jordan Conradson, TGP Communications LLC. (Randazza, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Press Pass Page, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Press Pass Application, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Registration Form, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint - Denial and Appeal Email, #6 Exhibit 5 to Complaint - Burns Letter)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TGP Communications LLC et al v. Sellers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGP Communications LLC a Missouri limited liability company doing business as Gateway Pundit
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Represented By: John C Burns
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Represented By: Jonathon Christian Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Conradson
Represented By: David Scott Gingras
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Represented By: John C Burns
Represented By: Jonathon Christian Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Sellers
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Galvin
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gates
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Hickman
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gallardo
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Richer
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rey Valenzuela
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jarrett
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Gilbertson
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Milam
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Joseph James Branco
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Pamela Alma Hostallero
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?