Cox v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Hillary K Cox
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2009cv08177
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in the amount of $7,210.75. Counsel shall refund the previously awarded EAJA fee of $5,572.85 to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/16/2013.(LFIG)
January 6, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiff is awarded $5,572.85 pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 1/6/12.(LSP)
March 18, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the final decision of the Commissioner is VACATED, and this matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for a determination of benefits. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/18/11. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary K Cox
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?