Taylor v. Autozone, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael L Taylor
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv08125
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2015 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 359 Stipulation, 358 Stipulation, it is ORDERED: 1. Decertifying this as a representative action under §216(b); 2. Dismissing this action with prejudice as to the named plaintiffs (Taylor, Khan, Glover-Hale and Montoy a), each party to bear its own fees and costs; and, 3. Dismissing this action without prejudice as to all of the opt-in plaintiffs (whose consents have been filed), each party to bear its own fees and costs. 4. Pursuant to LR Civ 40.2(c), the name d plaintiffs and the defendants shall pay, in equal shares, to the clerk of court one day's jury fees for their failure to give notice of their settlement five days before the first day of trial. The clerk is directed to enter final judgment concluding this action pursuant to this order. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/20/15. (LAD)
January 7, 2015 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 320 Motion to Take Preservation Deposition of Edward Lewis. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/7/2015.(LMR)
November 12, 2014 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 312 Plaintiffs' motion to confirm collective class certification. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/10/2014.(ALS)
September 14, 2012 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs' counsel shall pay $5,985.00 as a sanction to the clerk of this court no later than ten days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/12. (TLJ)
June 20, 2012 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 292 plaintiffs' MOTION to review clerk's taxation of costs. The Clerk's taxation judgment of $66,599.02 against plaintiffs (doc. 291) is AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part 297 plaintiff's Moti on to Seal. Pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(e), the lodged document (doc. 298) will not be filed. Instead, within five days of the date of this order plaintiffs shall file copies of the fee agreements with their social security numbers, telephone numbers, and addresses redacted. See PDF document for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/20/12.(LSP)
June 11, 2012 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 10 days of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall submit (1) a sworn declaration or affidavit from plaintiffs' counsel affirmatively stating who is responsible for payment of the costs taxed by the Clerk under the fee arrange ment; (2) a copy of the fee arrangement between the named plaintiffs and counsel; and (3) a sworn declaration or affidavit from the four named plaintiffs explicitly stating whether they will be personally responsible for payment of the costs taxed by the Clerk re 292 Motion to Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/8/12.(TLJ)
January 27, 2012 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 219 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/26/12.(TLJ)
June 14, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify (reconsider); denying 80 defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. ORDER amending or Order of May 24, 2011 67 (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/13/11.(TLJ)
June 10, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Paragraph 6 of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order (doc. 22) is amended to provide that all discovery must be completed by October 21, 2011. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/10/11.(LAD)
May 24, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for conditional FLSA class certification 28 . ORDER that this action is conditionally certified as a representative collective action. ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for judicial notice 33 (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/24/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L Taylor
Represented By: Mark D Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?