Grand Canyon Trust et al v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Trust, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club and Havasupai Tribe
Defendant: Michael Williams and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 3:2013cv08045
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2015 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 169 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 177 Motion injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/26/2015.(DGC, nvo)
April 7, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' motions for summary judgment are granted on all counts. Docs. 146 , 147 . 2. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied. Doc. 140 . 3. The Clerk shall enter judgment and terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/15. (LAD)
August 7, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/7/2014.(DGC, nvo)
April 7, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re privileged documents provided for in camera review. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/2014. (DGC, nvo)
December 16, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2013.(DGC, nvo)
September 9, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/2013.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Canyon Trust et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Trust
Represented By: Marc D Fink(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard Warren Hughes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Neil Levine(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Marc D Fink(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard Warren Hughes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Neil Levine(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Marc D Fink(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard Warren Hughes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Neil Levine(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havasupai Tribe
Represented By: Marc D Fink(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard Warren Hughes(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Neil Levine(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Williams
Represented By: Beverly F Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Beverly F Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?