Jordahl et al v. Brnovich et al
Plaintiff: Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC and Mikkel Jordahl
Defendant: Jim Parks, Mark Brnovich, Matt Ryan, Jim Driscoll, Sarah Benatar, Lena Fowler, Art Babbott and Elizabeth Archuleta
Amicus Curiae: Agudath Israel of America, American Center for Law & Justice, Israel Emergency Alliance, Texas, State of, Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated, Nevada, State of, Zachor Legal Institute and American Jewish Committee
Intervenor Defendant: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 3:2017cv08263
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER approving the #98 Stipulation. Plaintiffs shall have until May 15, 2020 to file their Petition for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses. Defendants shall have until June 19, 2020 to file their response. Plaintiffs shall have until July 10, 2020 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/31/2020. (LFIG)
March 30, 2020 Filing 98 STIPULATION Regarding Attorneys' Fees by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hauss, Brian)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: For good cause showing, IT IS ORDERED the parties' Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Plaintiff's Petition for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Doc. #96 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall filed their Petition for Attorneys; Fees, Costs, and Expenses no later than April 2, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/27/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 26, 2020 Filing 96 STIPULATION to Extend Fee Petition Deadline by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hauss, Brian)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER approving the #93 Stipulation and allowing Plaintiffs up to and including March 3, 2020 to file their Petition for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/6/2020. (LFIG)
February 6, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #93 Stipulation filed by Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC, Mikkel Jordahl. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings, attorney filing information must be typed in upper left corner.. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
February 5, 2020 Filing 93 STIPULATION to Extend Fee Petition Deadline by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hauss, Brian)
February 5, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Molly Brizgys filed by Casey Arellano. (Arellano, Casey)
February 5, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Arellano on behalf of Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Arellano, Casey)
February 5, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Brunn Wall Roysden, III. (Roysden, Brunn)
February 5, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Aaron Duell filed by Brunn Wall Roysden, III. (Roysden, Brunn)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER of USCA (18-16896) Appellees' unopposed motion to transfer consideration of attorneys' fees on appeal to the district court is GRANTED re: #65 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Brnovich, Arizona, State of. (GMP)
January 28, 2020 Filing 87 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed January 28, 2020, judgment of dismissal is entered and this action is hereby terminated. (LFIG)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that Plaintiffs' claims for declaratory and injunctive relief are moot and therefore are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/28/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
January 28, 2020 Filing 85 MANDATE of USCA vacating and remanding with instructions, re: 18-16896, #65 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Brnovich, Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(EJA)
January 24, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Keith J. Miller filed by Keith Joseph Miller. (Miller, Keith)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting the #82 Motion and any fee petition for work performed in this Court must be filed no later than 14 days after final judgment is entered by this Court on Plaintiffs' claims. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/23/2020. (LFIG)
January 21, 2020 Filing 82 First MOTION Set Fee Petition Deadline by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hauss, Brian)
December 4, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Marty Lieberman filed by Molly Patricia Brizgys. (Brizgys, Molly)
December 4, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Patricia Brizgys on behalf of Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Brizgys, Molly)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER of USCA (18-16986) - Arizona's renewed motion for a stay of the preliminary injunction pending appeal is granted re: #65 Notice of Appeal filed by Mark Brnovich, Arizona, State of. (GMP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Kathleen E. Brody filed by Martin Lieberman. (Lieberman, Martin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Lieberman on behalf of Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Lieberman, Martin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 75 *NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel - Darrell L. Hill by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC . (Brody, Kathleen) *Modified text on 1/16/2019 (SLQ).
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying the State's #67 Emergency Motion to Stay the Court's September 27, 2018, Order Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/19/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
October 12, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE re: Stay Request by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich . (Ensign, Drew)
October 8, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #67 Emergency MOTION to Stay re: #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jimenez Declaration)(Ensign, Drew)
October 5, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #67 Emergency MOTION to Stay re: #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Hauss, Brian)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 the State's Emergency, Unopposed Motion to Expedite Briefing on the State's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal and to Stay the Deadline to File an Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a Response to the State's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal #67 by 2:00 p.m. MST or 5:00 p.m. Eastern Time on Friday, 10/5/2018. The State shall file a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response by 10:00 a.m. MST or 1:00 p.m. Eastern Time on Monday, 10/8/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the State's deadline to file an Answer in this matter is extended until 21 days of issuance of the Ninth Circuit's mandate. Signed by Judge Diane J. Humetewa on 10/4/2018. (RMW)
October 3, 2018 Filing 69 USCA Case Number re: #65 Notice of Appeal. Case number 18-16896, Ninth Circuit. (DXD)
October 2, 2018 Filing 68 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing On The State's Motion For A Stay Pending Appeal , MOTION To Stay The Deadline To File An Answer by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 67 Emergency MOTION to Stay re: #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying the "State's Emergency Request for a 15-Minute Telephonic Hearing for Purposes of Making an Oral Motion to Stay the Court's September 27, 2018 Order Pending Appeal" #64 . See order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/1/2018. (LMR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 65 * NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #63 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #48 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae, Order on Motion for Hearing by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-16024217. (Ensign, Drew) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 10/2/2018 (LAD).
September 28, 2018 Filing 64 * EMERGENCY MOTION (REQUEST) FOR A 15-MINUTE TELEPHONIC HEARING FOR PURPOSES OF MAKING AN ORAL MOTION TO STAY THE COURTS SEPTEMBER 27, 2018 ORDER PENDING APPEAL by Intervenor Defendant Arizona, State of, Defendant Mark Brnovich. (Skinner, Oramel) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 10/1/2018 (LAD).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is granted. Until further order of the Court, Defendants are enjoined from enforcing A.R.S. 35-393.01(A). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' #28 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint is denied. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/27/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
September 14, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE re: #61 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Hauss, Brian)
September 12, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Ensign, Drew)
June 15, 2018 Filing 60 *RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Post-Argument Notice #58 (Ensign, Drew) *Modified on 6/18/2018 to Correct Event Type (MSA).
June 15, 2018 Filing 59 *NOTICE regarding Citation of Legislative History by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC re: #58 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Brody, Kathleen) *Modified on 6/18/2018 to remove duplicative text (MSA).
June 8, 2018 Filing 58 *NOTICE Regarding Misstatement of Law at Oral Argument by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brody, Kathleen) *Modified on 6/18/2018 to remove duplicative text (MSA).
May 28, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT proceedings held on 05/23/2018, before Judge Diane J. Humetewa. (Court Reporter: Jennifer A. Pancratz). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2018. (RAP)
May 25, 2018 Filing 56 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 54 Notice of Deficiency by Mark Brnovich for proceedings held on May 23, 2018, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Roysden, Brunn)
May 24, 2018 Filing 55 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 53 Notice of Deficiency by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC for proceedings held on May 23, 2018, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Brody, Kathleen)
May 24, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO435 #52 Transcript Request filed by Mark Brnovich. Item 16 ORDER FOR - Applicable Box(es) Not Checked: NON-APPEAL. Item 18 - ORDER: (CATEGORY) A box under ORIGINAL + 1 was incorrectly checked. The original has been previously ordered. 18 - ORDER: (DELIVERY INSTRUCTIONS) E-mail address not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: 1) Please refile with box(es) checked in Item 16 as described above. 2) Please refile with the appropriate box checked under the FIRST COPY column only. 3) Please refile and provide an email address for delivery. All Deficiencies must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
May 24, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO435 #51 Transcript Request filed by Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. Item(s) were not completed (left blank): 13. CASE NAME, Item 16 ORDER FOR - Applicable Box(es) Not Checked: NON-APPEAL, Item 18 - ORDER: (CATEGORY) A box under FIRST COPY was incorrectly checked. An original has not yet been ordered and prepared, and an E-mail address was not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: 1) Please refile with blank item(s) described above completed. 2) Please refile with box(es) checked in Item 16 as described above. 3) Please refile with the appropriate box checked under the ORIGINAL + 1column. 4) Please refile and provide an email address for delivery. All Deficiencies must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
May 24, 2018 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mark Brnovich for proceedings held on May 23, 2018, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Roysden, Brunn)
May 24, 2018 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC for proceedings held on May 23, 2018, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Brody, Kathleen)
May 23, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/23/2018: Oral Argument heard as to Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and as to Intervenor Defendant State of Arizona's #28 Motion to Dismiss. The Court takes these matters under advisement. APPEARANCES: Brian Hauss, Kathleen Brody and Vera Eidelman for Plaintiffs. Drew Ensign, Brunn Roysden, III, Oramel Skinner for for Intervenor Defendant State of Arizona. Rose Winkeler for Coconino County Defendants. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:00 PM to 3:15 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 3, 2018 Filing 49 *NOTICE of Withdrawal re: Attorney Mandi Vuinovich by Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan . (Vuinovich, Mandi) *Modified text on 4/4/2018 for clarification (ATD).
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendant State of Arizona's Motion to Intervene (Doc. #24 ). ORDERED denying the Motions to File Amicus Curiae filed by the American Jewish Committee (Doc. #30 ), the States of Nevada and Texas (Doc. #32 ), the Zachor Legal Institute (Doc. #33 ), the Israel Emergency Alliance (Doc. #35 ), the Louis D. Brandeis Center Incorporated (Doc. #37 ), and the American Center for Law & Justice (Doc. #41 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) and Defendant State of Arizona's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #28 ) is hereby scheduled for May 23, 2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street in Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Each side will be permitted thirty (30) minutes to address the Court. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/28/2018. (LFIG)
March 23, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Joint Motion Requesting Hearing Date for Pending Motions by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Kathleen)
March 15, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew)
March 8, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Marc A Greendorfer on behalf of amicus curiae Zachor Legal Institute. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Upon review by the Court, with good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion (Doc. #43 ) is GRANTED and the State Defendants shall have until March 15, 2018 to file a reply brief in support of the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #28 ). ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/21/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 20, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Brody, Kathleen)
February 20, 2018 Filing 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
February 16, 2018 Filing 42 DENIED by Doc. #48 LODGED Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae re: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by American Center for Law & Justice. (Gammill, Carly) Modified on 3/28/2018 (LFIG).
February 16, 2018 Filing 41 *MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by American Center for Law & Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gammill, Carly) *Modified to correct event type on 2/20/2018 (KAS).
February 16, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Carly F Gammill on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Center for Law & Justice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 16, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan. (Vuinovich, Mandi)
February 15, 2018 Filing 39 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party , REPLY to Response to Motion re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Hauss)(Hauss, Brian) *Modified document links on 2/16/2018 (KAS).
February 9, 2018 Filing 38 DENIED by Doc. #48 LODGED Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae The Louis D. Brandeis Center, Inc. re: #37 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated. (Eisinger, Vincent) Modified on 3/28/2018 (LFIG).
February 9, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisinger, Vincent)
February 9, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Lawrence Zweifach and Akiva Shapiro on behalf of amicus curiae Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 9, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Matthew Greenfield on behalf of amicus curaie Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 9, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Vincent Robert Eisinger on behalf of amicus curaie Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 8, 2018 Filing 36 DENIED by Doc. #48 LODGED Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae the States of Texas and Nevada re: #32 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Nevada, State of, Texas, State of. (Hacker, David) Modified on 3/28/2018 (LFIG).
February 8, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Israel Emergency Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Curiae Brief of StandWithUs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rotter, Jonathan)
February 8, 2018 Filing 34 DENIED by Doc. #48 LODGED Proposed Amicus Brief of Zachor Legal Institute. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Zachor Legal Institute. (Greendorfer, Marc) Modified on 3/28/2018 (LFIG).
February 8, 2018 Filing 33 *MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Zachor Legal Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Proposed Amicus Brief of Zachor Legal Institute, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Greendorfer, Marc) *Modified text on 2/8/2018 per attorney's request (EJA). *Modified to correct event type n 2/9/2018 (KAS).
February 8, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Nevada, State of, Texas, State of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hacker, David)
February 7, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by David Jonathan Hacker. (Hacker, David)
February 6, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Gregory E Ostfeld on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Jewish Committee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 5, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jonathan M Rotter on behalf of amicus party Israel Emergency Alliance dba StandWithUs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 5, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of Amicus parties State of Nevada and State of Texas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 2, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by American Jewish Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schulman, Brian)
February 2, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Stephen R Blacklocks on behalf of amicus curiae Agudath Israel of America. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 18, 2018 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Drew C. Ensign re: #28 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendant Arizona, State of, Defendant Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew)
January 18, 2018 Filing 28 *RESPONSE in Opposition re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Brnovich filed by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew) *Modified to add Motion on 1/19/2018 (KAS).
January 18, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan. (Winkeler, Rose)
January 18, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan.(Winkeler, Rose)
January 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mandi Anne Vuinovich on behalf of Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan. (Vuinovich, Mandi)
January 18, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene by State of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
January 18, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Brody, Kathleen)
January 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (KAS)
January 17, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint)(Brody, Kathleen)
January 17, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Mark Brnovich, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan filed by Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC, Mikkel Jordahl.(Brody, Kathleen)
January 10, 2018 Filing 19 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties' #16 Joint Motion to Extend/Accelerate Deadlines, Consolidate Briefs, and Expand Page Limits. ORDERED establishing the briefing schedule as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the parties' request to expand page limits. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/4/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
December 28, 2017 Remark: Pro hac motion granted for Vera Eidelman on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 27, 2017 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Consolidated Briefs and Other Relief by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
December 21, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew)
December 20, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mark Brnovich. (Skinner, Oramel)
December 20, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Oramel Horace Skinner on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Skinner, Oramel)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 1/24/2018 for Defendants to respond to the complaint and until 1/10/2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/18/2017. (LFIG)
December 18, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Marie Winkeler on behalf of Elizabeth Archuleta, Art Babbott, Sarah Benatar, Jim Driscoll, Lena Fowler, Jim Parks, Matt Ryan. (Winkeler, Rose)
December 18, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Guy Daniels on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Daniels, Evan)
December 18, 2017 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Benjamin Wizner on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 15, 2017 Filing 9 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint and MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response/Reply re: #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew) *Modified to correct event type and add motion on 12/18/2017 (KAS).
December 15, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Curtis Ensign on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew)
December 15, 2017 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Marc A Greendorfer on behalf of amicus curiae Zachor Legal Institute. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 8, 2017 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian Hauss on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 7, 2017 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: This matter has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future filings shall reflect the following complete case number: CV-17-08263-PCT-DJH. Pending: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
December 7, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikkel Jordahl, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Kathleen)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 6, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DXD)
December 6, 2017 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14937634. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-08263-PCT-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (DXD)
December 6, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mikkel Jordahl, Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC (submitted by Kathleen Brody). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (DXD)
December 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14937634 filed by Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC, Mikkel Jordahl (submitted by Kathleen Brody). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordahl et al v. Brnovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikkel (Mik) Jordahl PC
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Brian Matthew Hauss
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Molly Patricia Brizgys
Represented By: Casey Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikkel Jordahl
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Ben Wizner
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Brian Matthew Hauss
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Molly Patricia Brizgys
Represented By: Casey Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Parks
Represented By: Mandi Anne Vuinovich
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Evan Guy Daniels
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Oramel Horace Skinner
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Ryan
Represented By: Mandi Anne Vuinovich
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Driscoll
Represented By: Mandi Anne Vuinovich
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Benatar
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lena Fowler
Represented By: Mandi Anne Vuinovich
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Babbott
Represented By: Mandi Anne Vuinovich
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Archuleta
Represented By: Mandi Anne Vuinovich
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Agudath Israel of America
Represented By: Stephen Roy Blacklocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Center for Law & Justice
Represented By: Carly F Gammill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Israel Emergency Alliance
Represented By: Jonathan M Rotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louis D Brandeis Center Incorporated
Represented By: Vincent Robert Eisinger, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Zweifach
Represented By: Matthew Greenfield
Represented By: Akiva Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nevada, State of
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Zachor Legal Institute
Represented By: Marc A Greendorfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Jewish Committee
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: Gregory E Ostfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Evan Guy Daniels
Represented By: Aaron Michael Duell
Represented By: Keith Joseph Miller
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Oramel Horace Skinner
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?