Navajo Nation et al v. Reagan et al
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation, Dale Smith, Ashley Atene, Sr., Joyce Nez, Bonnie Tsosie, Denise Johnson and Irene Roy
Defendant: Edison J Wauneka, Michele Reagan, Patty Hansen, Rayleen Richards, Doris Clark, Angela Romero, Mark Mayrand, Alton Joe Shepherd, Coconino County Board of Supervisors, Apache County Board of Supervisors, Jesse Thompson, Art Babbott and Navajo County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 3:2018cv08329
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal filed by Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Parties' Joint Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings (Doc. #35 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned case is stayed until May 2, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall file a joint status report and proposed scheduling order by April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/2/19. (MAW)
December 24, 2018 Filing 35 *Joint MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS by Navajo Nation, Bonnie Tsosie, Denise Johnson, Dale Smith, Joyce Nez, Ashley Atene, Sr, Irene Roy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified to add filers on 12/26/2018 (DXD).
December 21, 2018 Filing 34 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/17/2018 to Coconino County Board of Supervisors and Art Babbott. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified text on 12/26/2018 (DXD).
December 21, 2018 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/20/2018 to Apache County Board of Supervisors and Alton Joe Shepherd. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified text on 12/26/2018 (DXD).
December 21, 2018 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/17/2018 to Navajo County Board of Supervisors. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified text on 12/26/2018 (DXD).
December 13, 2018 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Apache County Board of Supervisors, Art Babbott, Coconino County Board of Supervisors, Navajo County Board of Supervisors, Alton Joe Shepherd, Jesse Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 12, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Submitted by Navajo Nation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
December 11, 2018 Filing 29 *First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Navajo Nation, Bonnie Tsosie, Denise Johnson, Dale Smith, Joyce Nez, Ashley Atene, Sr, Irene Roy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified to add filers on 12/12/2018 (DXD).
December 11, 2018 Filing 28 *NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Navajo Nation, Bonnie Tsosie, Denise Johnson, Dale Smith, Joyce Nez, Ashley Atene, Sr, Irene Roy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified to add filers on 12/12/2018 (DXD).
November 27, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE re: of Service of Order re: #25 Order by Navajo Nation. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified linkage on 11/28/2018 (DXD).
November 27, 2018 Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Michele Reagan on 11/21/2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on February 20, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dominic W Lanza: Motion Hearing held on 11/26/2018 re: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Set Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). Discussion held. Without objection by Defense counsel, IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Set Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Set Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 10:07 AM to 10:16 AM.(MAW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Coconino County Elections Director on 11/20/2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Coconino County Recorder. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified to reflect document does not include service date on 11/27/2018 (DXD).
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Coconino County Attorney on 11/20/2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Navajo County Elections Director. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) *Modified to reflect document does not include service date on 11/27/2018 (DXD).
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Navajo County Attorney on 11/20/2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Navajo County Recorder on 11/20/2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Eva Marquez for Apache County Attorney on 11/20/2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Angela Romero on 11-20-2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Navajo Nation: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Edison Wauneka on 11-21-2018. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to vacate the November 26, 2018 hearing (Doc. #13 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw the TRO (Doc. #13 ) will be addressed at the hearing. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/26/18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 25, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND TO VACATE HEARING SET FOR NOVEMBER 26, 2018. by Navajo Nation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia)
November 25, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Inunction filed by Doris Clark, Rayleen Richards. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit or Doris Clark in Opposition to Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction)(Moore, Jason)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pending before the Court is an emergency motion for a temporary restraining order and motion to set hearing on preliminary injunction. (Doc. #2 .) The Court will set a hearing for Monday, November 26, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. The parties should be prepared the address the issues identified above. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall provide notice of this hearing to all parties and their counsel and shall also complete service of the complaint, TRO request, and all attachments thereto by the close of business on Wednesday, November 21, 2018 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/18. (MAW)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Marie Winkeler on behalf of Patty Hansen, Mark Mayrand. (Winkeler, Rose)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Eugene LaRue on behalf of Michele Reagan. (LaRue, Joseph)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Stanley Moore on behalf of Doris Clark, Rayleen Richards. (Moore, Jason)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Doris Clark, Patty Hansen, Mark Mayrand, Michele Reagan, Rayleen Richards, Angela Romero, Edison J Wauneka. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16218817. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-08329-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Ashley Atene, Sr, Denise Johnson, Navajo Nation, Joyce Nez, Irene Roy, Dale Smith, Bonnie Tsosie. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(BAR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashley Atene, Sr, Denise Johnson, Navajo Nation, Joyce Nez, Irene Roy, Dale Smith, Bonnie Tsosie. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) (BAR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 *WITHDRAWN by Doc. #24 * MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Set Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by Ashley Atene, Sr, Denise Johnson, Navajo Nation, Joyce Nez, Irene Roy, Dale Smith, Bonnie Tsosie. (Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BAR) Modified on 11/26/2018 (MAW).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16218817 filed by Bonnie Tsosie, Denise Johnson, Dale Smith, Joyce Nez, Ashley Atene, Sr, Navajo Nation, Irene Roy. )(Ferguson-Bohnee, Patricia) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navajo Nation et al v. Reagan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navajo Nation
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Smith
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Atene, Sr.
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Nez
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Tsosie
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Johnson
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Roy
Represented By: Judith M Dworkin
Represented By: Ethel Billie Branch
Represented By: Paul Wesley Spruhan
Represented By: Joe W Keene
Represented By: Patricia Ferguson-Bohnee
Represented By: Joe Wiley Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison J Wauneka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Reagan
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Hansen
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Represented By: William P Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayleen Richards
Represented By: Jason Stanley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Clark
Represented By: Jason Stanley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mayrand
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Represented By: William P Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Joe Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coconino County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Babbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navajo County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?