Greenway, et al v. Stewart, et al

Petitioner: Richard Harley Greenway
Respondent: Terry Stewart, Ernest Trujillo and Dora B Schriro
Case Number: 4:1998cv00025
Filed: January 14, 1998
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED denying on the merits Petitioners claims alleging ineffectiveassistance of counsel during trial and on direct appeal. Denying Petitioners Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 61); Clerk to enter Judgment. Denying 183 Motion to Stay. Granting a certificate of appealability on the issues stated within this Order. The Clerk of Court send a courtesy copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 11/27/13.(SMBE)
December 13, 2012 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Petitioner's Merits Brief. The reply shall be filed no later than January 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 12/13/12.(KAH)
August 23, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 170 Motion to File Non-Electronic Exhibit by Richard Harley Greenway. Petitioner shall file said exhibit directly with the Clerk of Court and provide a copy to the Court's Capital Case Staff Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall substitute Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, as Respondent in place of his predecessor, Dora B. Schriro, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d)(1). Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 8/22/2012.(GCP)
January 5, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Petitioner shall file a brief addressing the merits of his trial and appeal ineffectiveness claims by 3/9/2012. Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's merits brief by 5/4/2012. Petitioner shall file a reply by 5/25/2012. (see attached pdf for complete information) Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 1/4/2012. (GCP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenway, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Harley Greenway
Represented By: Therese Michelle Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Stewart
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ernest Trujillo
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: Alan Liardon Amann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?